Eric Smith v. Gina M Raimondo
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong |
Referred: | Jean P Rosenbluth |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-02009 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2023 |
Terminated: | Mar 22, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 9:59 AM PDT |
Defendant
Gina Marie Raimondo
|
|
Plaintiff
Eric Smith
44829 Mumm Street
Temecula, CA 92592 |
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
order
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 03/23 11:47 AM
ORDER ON REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (NON-PRISONER CASE) by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong: denyinge APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis3 . IT IS THEREFORE that: As explained in the attached statement, the Request is DENIED because: The action fails to a claim upon which relief may be granted, this case is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated.) (et) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Mon 03/20 5:11 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) |
|
5 | 5
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 5:11 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 5:10 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (lh) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 03/20 5:08 PM
APPLICATION to Proceed In District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Short Form) filed by Plaintiff Eric Smith. (lh) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 03/20 5:01 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Eric Smith, (lh) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Mon 03/20 4:59 PM
COMPLAINT against Defendant Gina Marie Raimondo. Case assigned to Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. Filed by Plaintiff Eric Smith. (lh) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Att: 2 Summons Request |