California Central District Court
Judge:Josephine L Staton
Referred: Shashi H Kewalramani
Case #: 2:23-cv-02050
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause28:1983 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 17, 2023
Re-opened:May 08, 2023
Terminated:Mar 28, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Thursday, March 28, 2024
23 23 judgmentCV Judgment Fri 03/29 9:52 AM
JUDGMENT by Judge Josephine L. Staton, Related to: Order Dismissing Case22 . IT IS HEREBY ADJUDGED that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (hr)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Dismissing Case Fri 03/29 9:46 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Josephine L. Staton, re MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees18 , Complaint1 . IT IS ORDERED THAT Judgment be entered DISMISSING this case without prejudice. (see document for further details) (hr)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
21 21 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 02/23 4:51 PM
(IN CHAMBERS): ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. Plaintiff shall have up to and including March 7, 2024, to respond to this Order or file a FAC. (see document for further details) (hr)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
20 20 14 pgs order Order Mon 01/22 4:36 PM
ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani, re Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights)1 (dc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Blank CV Righs form,
Att: 2 Voluntary Notice
Friday, January 12, 2024
19 19 respm Declaration (Motion related) Wed 01/17 4:37 PM
DECLARATION in Support of MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees18 filed by Plaintiff Yahshalom B.J. Gray. (hr)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees (CV-60P) Wed 01/17 4:34 PM
MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Yahshalom B.J. Gray. (hr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
17 17 order Extension of Time to File a Document Tue 12/05 2:20 PM
MINUTES (In Chambers): ORDER GRANTING Additional Time to Pay Initial Partial Filing Fee by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court construes the filing as a request for an extension of time to pay the initial partial filing fee16 . So construed, the request is GRANTED. Within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall pay the initial partial filing fee of $2.50. Thereafter, monthly payments toward the total $350 filing fee still owed must be forwarded to the Court as provided by 28 USC section 1915(b)(2). See document for further information. (jp)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
16 16 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 09/20 10:48 AM
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, OR ORDER JAIL TO CHARGE PLAINTIFF'S TRUST ACCOUNT FOR FILING FEES filed by Plaintiff Yahshalom B.J. Gray. (et)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 03, 2023
15 15 misc Mail Returned Thu 08/03 4:47 PM
Mail Returned Undeliverable addressed to Yahshalom B.J. Gray re Order re Civil Right Case11 . (jp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 12, 2023
14 14 cs_rasgn Chief Magistrate Judge Transferring Case (non-consent) Thu 07/13 1:11 PM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF MAGISTRATE JUDGE - OCMJ# 23-087 by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the RETIREMENT of Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon, this case is transferred from the calendar of Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon to the calendar of Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for all further proceedings. All documents subsequently filed shall bear this new case designation 2:23-cv-02050-JLS-SHK. (ap)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 10, 2023
13 13 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Mon 07/10 4:10 PM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS): Plaintiff's Change of Address by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: The Court is in receipt of plaintiff's notice of change of address. The Clerk shall also send to plaintiff the two most recent court orders: Order Granting Request to Proceed Without Payment of Filing Fee, filed June 14, 2023 (ECF No. 10). Order re Civil Rights Case, filed June 29, 2023 (ECF No. 11). [See document for further information.] (es)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment 1 of 2,
Att: 2 Attachment 2 of 2
Friday, June 30, 2023
12 12 attorney Change of Address Thu 07/06 10:27 AM
NOTICE of Change of address Changing attorneys address to Yahshalom B.J. Gray BK No. 6623869, Terminal Annex, PO Box 86164, Los Angeles, CA. 90086. Filed by Plaintiff Yahshalom B.J. Gray. (et)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 29, 2023
11 11 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 06/29 1:23 PM
ORDER RE CIVIL RIGHTS CASE by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. Plaintiff is advised that the Court is presently screening the complaint in this action, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). Until the complaint has been screened and the Court has ordered that service of process may occur, plaintiff may not proceed with service of process upon defendant(s). Should the Court determine that the complaint may be served upon defendant(s), the Court will provide plaintiff with instructions regarding service of process. [SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.] (es)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2023
10 10 order Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fees (CV 60P) Thu 06/15 1:02 PM
ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton GRANTING REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support9 . It is further ORDERED that the prisoner-plaintiff owes the Court the initial filing fee of $350.00. An initial partial filing fee of $2.50 must be paid within 30 days of the date of this order. Thereafter, monthly payments shall be forwarded to the Court in accordance with this order. (jp)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 22, 2023
9 9 motion Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees (CV-60P) Thu 05/25 2:23 PM
REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Yahshalom B.J. Gray. (et)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 08, 2023
8 8 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Mon 05/08 3:44 PM
NOTICE FROM THE CLERK: A copy of ORDER ON REQUEST TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES (PRISONER NON-HABEAS CASE)4 was served via First Class U.S. Mail on Yahshalom B.J. Gray, MID 2726115 Unit 413, Metropolitan State Hospital, 11401 South Bloomfield Avenue, Norwalk, CA 90650 on May 8, 2023.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vv)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Reopening Case Mon 05/08 12:39 PM
MINUTE (In Chambers) Order Vacating Dismissal Order and Extending Time in Which to Comply With Court Order by Judge Josephine L. Staton: Plaintiff is ORDERED to comply with the Court's 3/22/2023 Order no later than 6/2/2023. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of Plaintiff's Complaint. (Made JS-5, Case reopened.) (jp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2023
6 6 order Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fees (CV 60P) Thu 04/27 3:11 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. The Request to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fees2 is DENIED and the case is DISMISSED without prejudice. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated.) See document for further information. (jp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 11, 2023
5 5 misc Mail Returned Wed 04/12 9:18 AM
Mail Returned addressed to Yahshalom B.J. Gray re Order4 . Related [+] (et)
Related: [-] ason: Released
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
4 4 1 pgs order Order Wed 03/22 3:52 PM
ORDER ON REQUEST TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES (PRISONER NON-HABEAS CASE)2 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: Within 30 days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff must do the following: Refile the IFP application using the current form. Plaintiff must complete section 1, including a declaration under penalty of perjury and an authorization to have the full filing fee deducted from his prison trust account over time. The appropriate official must complete section 2. The IFP application must include a copy of Plaintiffs prison trust account statement for the past six months. (lom) (lom)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (3/22/2023) Attachment 1
Monday, March 20, 2023
3 3 notice Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form Mon 03/20 11:44 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and referred to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (lh)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 17, 2023
2 2 motion Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees (CV-60P) Mon 03/20 11:43 AM
REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Yahshalom B.J. Gray. (lh)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint - (Prisoner Civil Rights) Mon 03/20 11:37 AM
CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendants Jane Doe(Medical Staff at L.A. County Jail, official capacity), Jane Doe(Medical Staff at L.A. County Jail, individual), John Doe One(Sheriff Sergent L.A. County Jail, individual), John Doe One(Sheriff Sergent L.A. County Jail, official capacity), John Doe Two(Medical Staff at L.A. County Jail, official capacity), John Doe Two(Medical Staff at L.A. County Jail, individual), Robbert Luna(Head Watch Commander of L.A. County Jail, official capacity), Robbert Luna(Head Watch Commander of L.A. County Jail, individual), Wright(Sheriff Officer at L.A. County Jail, individual), Wright(Sheriff Officer at L.A. County Jail, official capacity) pursuant to 42:1983. Case assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton and referred to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. Filed by Plaintiff Yahshalom B.J. Gray. (lh)
Related: [-]