Wayne H. Norman v. Experian
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Wesley L Hsu |
Referred: | John D Early |
Case #: | 8:23-cv-00478 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 7:15 AM PDT |
Defendant
Experian
|
Represented By
|
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Jeffrey Kravitz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wayne H. Norman
109 North Main Street, No. 602
Memphis, TN 38103 |
Docket last updated: 10 minutes ago |
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
![]() Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Defendant Experian.(Moulin, Michael) |
|
Friday, February 09, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Fri 02/09 2:19 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE AND (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL by Judge Wesley L. Hsu: On 2/8/24, Defendant filed Notice of Settlement (Dkt.33 ). Upon review of the Notice of Settlement, the Court sets an Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for 4/12/2024 at 1:00 p.m. If the parties file a dismissal or response to OSC by 4/5/2024, the matter will be taken off calendar and no appearance by counsel will be required. All scheduled dates and deadlines are hereby VACATED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (hc) |
|
Thursday, February 08, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
![]() NOTICE of Settlement filed by Defendant Experian. (Moulin, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, February 07, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 02/07 2:40 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DIRECTING COUNSEL TO ADHERE TO COURT'S ORDER AND FILE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OR JOINT REPORT by Judge Wesley L. Hsu: On 7/20/2023, the Court ordered the parties to file a notice of settlement or a joint report regarding the status of settlement within 7 days of settlement proceedings being held. Dkt.21 . ADR Proceeding were held December 5, 2023. Counsel shall file the notice or report no later than 2/12/2024. Counsel are reminded to adhere to the deadlines set by the Court. Any future failure to do so may result in the imposition of sanctions. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (hc) |
|
Wednesday, December 13, 2023 | ||
31 | 31
![]() NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Mediation Report (ADR-3) Completely Settled30 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect case number indicated in caption of attached document. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bm) |
|
Tuesday, December 12, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
![]() MEDIATION REPORT Filed by Mediator (ADR Panel) Jeffrey Kravitz: Mediation held on 12/05/2023 and the case has been completely settled. With the filing of this Report, the parties are advised that they must notify the trial judge's deputy courtroom clerk of the fact of settlement and to promptly file documents regarding the final disposition of the case. Counsel: Please evaluate the effectiveness of the ADR Program by completing a survey on your mediation experience. To access the survey, click on the following link:[LINK:MediationParticipantSurvey] (Kravitz, Jeffrey) |
|
Wednesday, November 22, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
![]() Mail Returned addressed to Wayne H. Norman re Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12)21 . (lom) |
|
Friday, October 06, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
![]() Mail Returned addressed to Wayne H Norman, Return to Sender, Doesn't live at this address, re Text Only Scheduling Notice 20 (bm) |
|
Thursday, September 14, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
![]() Mail Returned addressed to Wayne H. Norman re Order23 . (lom) |
|
26 | 26
![]() Mail Returned addressed to Wayne H. Norman re Order22 . (lom) |
|
Thursday, September 07, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Jeffrey Kravitz has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst) |
|
Wednesday, August 09, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
![]() INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE WESLEY L. HSU. (hc) |
|
Thursday, July 20, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
![]() STANDING ORDER FOR MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (lom) |
|
22 | 22
![]() CIVIL PRETRIAL SCHEDULE AND TRIAL ORDER by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. The Scheduling Conference scheduled for July 21, 2023 is hereby VACATED. The pretrial schedule governing this case is set forth in the far right column labeled "Court Order" located on the parties' Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet, which accompanies this Order. If the parties wish to set additional or alternative dates, they must file a stipulation and proposed order setting forth the dates requested and demonstrating good cause. Please refer to the Court's Standing Order for Newly Assigned Civil Cases for requirements for specific motions, discovery, certain types of filings, courtesy copies, emailing signature items to chambers, settlement, and other matters pertaining to all civil cases. Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/20/2024 03:00 PM; Jury Trial set for 10/8/2024 09:00 AM. See order for additional deadlines and information. (lom) |
|
21 | 21
![]() ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 06/28/2024. (hc) |
|
Wednesday, July 19, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 07/19 3:59 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE AND (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Wesley L. Hsu: The Court has reviewed the Joint Rule 26(f) Report submitted by the parties and determines that an in-person scheduling conference is unnecessary. Accordingly, the Court VACATES the July 21, 2023, Scheduling Conference. No appearance by counsel is necessary. A separate order will issue setting the deadlines and dates for this case. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (hc) |
|
Friday, July 07, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
![]() JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan -Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.'s Portion of Joint Rule 26(f) Report ; estimated length of trial 3-4 days, filed by Defendant Experian.. (Moulin, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael Scott Moulin counsel for Defendant Experian. Adding Michael Scott Moulin as counsel of record for Experian for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Experian. (Attorney Michael Scott Moulin added to party Experian(pty:dft))(Moulin, Michael) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 06/29 8:33 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE AND (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DIRECTING COUNSEL TO ADHERE TO COURT'S ORDER AND FILE JOINT REPORT by Judge Wesley L. Hsu: On May 9, 2023, the Court ordered the parties to file a Joint Report by June 23, 2023, regarding Pretrial and Trial dates. Dkt.12 . Counsel shall file the report no later than July 7, 2023. The parties are also directed to review the Standing Order Setting Schedule Conference on the Judges Procedures and Schedules webpage for instructions on filing and submitting the Joint 26(f) Report and Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet. The Court CONTINUES the Scheduling Conference to July 21, 2023 at 1:00 p.m.Counsel are reminded to adhere to the deadlines set by the Court. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (hc) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
![]() ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#23-046) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Wesley L. Hsu, this case is transferred from Judge John W. Holcomb to the calendar of Judge Wesley L. Hsu for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:23-cv-00478 WLH(JDEx). (rn) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Mail Returned addressed to Wayne H. Norman re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form5 (rolm) |
|
Wednesday, May 17, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Mail Returned addressed to Wayne Norman re Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge6 (twdb) |
|
13 | 13
![]() PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Wayne H. Norman, upon Defendant Experian served on 3/16/2023, answer due 4/6/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon no name, in compliance with statute not specified by personal service. Certified receipt signed by an agent PB on 4/18/23. (twdb) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
![]() ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John W. Holcomb. Scheduling Conference set for 7/7/2023 at 11:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (cla) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
![]() NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Experian, identifying Experian plc, Central Source LLC, Online Data Exchange LLC, New Management Services LLC, VantageScore Solutions LLC, Opt-Out Services LLC. (Albright, Kelly) |
|
10 | 10
![]() ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery)1 filed by Defendant Experian.(Attorney Kelly Christine Albright added to party Experian(pty:dft))(Albright, Kelly) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
![]() SELF-REPRESENTATION ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (yl) |
|
7 | 7
![]() STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (cla) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
![]() ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: granting3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (yl) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) |
|
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) |
|
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (sh) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
![]() REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Wayne H. Norman. (sh) |
|
2 | 2
![]() CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Wayne H. Norman, (sh) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Defendant Experian. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Wayne H. Norman. (sh) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |