California Central District Court
Judge:Fred W Slaughter
Referred: Autumn D Spaeth
Case #: 8:23-cv-00506
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Mar 20, 2023
Terminated:Aug 17, 2023
Case in other court:Orange County Superior Court, 30-02023-01306366
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 3:05 AM PDT
Defendant
Abraham Gaytan
Represented By
Susan W Pangborn
Kilpatrick Townsend And Stockton LLP
contact info
Defendant
Travis Hoar
Represented By
Susan W Pangborn
Kilpatrick Townsend And Stockton LLP
contact info
Defendant
IQVIA Holdings Inc.
Represented By
Susan W Pangborn
Kilpatrick Townsend And Stockton LLP
contact info
Kayla M Frederickson
Kilpatrick Townsend And Stockton LLP
contact info
Kendra Charell Chapman
Kilpatrick Townsend And Stockton LLP
contact info
Defendant
Q Squared Solutions LLC
Represented By
Susan W Pangborn
Kilpatrick Townsend And Stockton LLP
contact info
Kayla M Frederickson
Kilpatrick Townsend And Stockton LLP
contact info
Kendra Charell Chapman
Kilpatrick Townsend And Stockton LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Katrina Wright
Represented By
Travis Beck
Reisner And King LLP
contact info
Tessa King
Reisner And King LLP
contact info
Adam J Reisner
Reisner And King LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
41 41 misc Receipt Thu 08/31 9:52 AM
Receipt of Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court. (jp)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 18, 2023
40 40 misc Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form Fri 08/18 10:19 AM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Orange County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Orange County Superior Court - Central Justice Center. Case number: 30-02023 01306366-CU-WT-CJC. (jp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2023
39 39 order Remand Case to State Court Fri 08/18 10:17 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and REMANDING Action to Orange County Superior Court9 by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: The Motion is GRANTED and the action is REMANDED to Orange County Superior Court. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this matter. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
38 38 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Wed 06/28 8:09 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: The court is in receipt of Defendant Abraham Gaytans Request to have Non-Lead Trial Counsel Participate at Hearing (Dkt.36 ) (the Request). In the Request, Defendant requests that Kendra Chapman be able to appear at the June 29, 2023, hearing on the Motion to Dismiss (Dkt.31 ) (the Motion). (See Dkt.36 at 2.) On June 27, 2023, the court took the June 29, 2023, hearing on the Motion under submission and vacated the June 29, 2023, hearing. (Dkt. 37 .) In light of the court vacating the June 29, 2023, hearing, the Request is DENIED AS MOOT. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
37 37 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 06/27 11:13 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: Before the court is Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Abraham Gaytan31 . The court finds this matter appropriate for decision without oral argument. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. Cal. R. 7-15. Accordingly, the hearing set for June 29, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. is VACATED/OFF CALENDAR and the court takes the matter UNDER SUBMISSION. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 22, 2023
36 36 misc Miscellaneous Document Thu 06/22 3:59 PM
Request to Have Non-Lead Trial Counsel Participate at Hearing filed by Defendant Abraham Gaytan re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Abraham Gaytan 31(Pangborn, Susan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, June 15, 2023
35 35 respm Reply (Motion related) Thu 06/15 12:54 PM
REPLY support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Abraham Gaytan 31 filed by Defendant Abraham Gaytan. (Pangborn, Susan)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 12, 2023
34 34 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Mon 06/12 5:31 PM
Opposition In Opposition To re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Abraham Gaytan 31 filed by Plaintiff Katrina Wright. (King, Tessa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
33 33 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 05/30 5:20 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Abraham Gaytan, (Pangborn, Susan)
Related: [-]
32 32 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 05/30 5:17 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Abraham Gaytan (Pangborn, Susan)
Related: [-]
31 31 motion Dismiss Party Tue 05/30 5:15 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Abraham Gaytan filed by Defendant Abraham Gaytan. Motion set for hearing on 6/29/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (Attorney Susan W Pangborn added to party Abraham Gaytan(pty:dft)) (Pangborn, Susan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Declaration Kendra C. Chapman in Support of Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Kendra Chapman in Support of Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 4 Proposed Order
30 30 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 05/30 11:00 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: Before the court is Defendant's Motion to Dismiss15 . The court finds this matter appropriate for decision without oral argument. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. Cal. R. 7-15. Accordingly, the hearing set for June 1, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. is VACATED/OFF CALENDAR and the court takes the matter UNDER SUBMISSION. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 25, 2023
29 29 2 pgs order Order Thu 05/25 4:26 PM
ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter GRANTING Defendant Travis Hoar's Request to Have Non-Lead Trial Counsel Participate at Hearing28 . (See document for further information). (jp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
28 28 misc Miscellaneous Document Wed 05/24 3:16 PM
Request to Have Non-Lead Trial Counsel Participate at Hearing re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Travis Hoar (Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6)) 15(Pangborn, Susan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, May 18, 2023
27 27 respm Reply (Motion related) Thu 05/18 4:33 PM
REPLY Reply in Support of Motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Travis Hoar (Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6)) 15 filed by Defendant Travis Hoar. (Pangborn, Susan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 11, 2023
26 26 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Thu 05/11 4:05 PM
Opposition Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Travis Hoar (Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6)) 15 filed by Plaintiff Katrina Wright. (King, Tessa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 09, 2023
25 25 respm Supplement (Motion related) Tue 05/09 2:15 PM
SUPPLEMENT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange Superior Court9 Supplemental Declaration of Travis Beck, Esq. Re Defendant Abraham Gaytan in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and Request for Attorney Fees and Sanctions filed by Plaintiff Katrina Wright. (King, Tessa)
Related: [-]
24 24 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 05/09 10:12 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: Before the court is Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Case to Orange County Superior Court9 . The court finds this matter appropriate for decision without oral argument. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. Cal. R. 7-15. Accordingly, the hearing set for May 11, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. is VACATED/OFF CALENDAR and the court takes the matter UNDER SUBMISSION. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Tue 05/09 9:10 AM
ORDER ON PRETRIAL AND TRIAL PROCEDURES (CIVIL CASES) by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (ev)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 08, 2023
22 22 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Mon 05/08 5:56 PM
MINUTES SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: The Court, having reviewed the pleadings and the parties' submissions pursuant to FRCP 26(f), VACATES the Scheduling Conference set for 5/18/2023, and sets the following schedule: Jury Trial set for 8/13/2024 at 8:30 AM. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 7/25/2024 at 8:30 AM. Last Date to Hear Motion to Amend Pleadings/Add Parties: 7/13/2023. Non-Expert Discovery Cut-Off: 1/24/2024. Last Date to Hear Motions: 5/2/2024. Deadline to Complete Settlement Conference: 5/15/2024. Motions in Limine with Proposed Orders: 7/4/2024. Joint Proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order: 7/11/2024. (See document for further information). (jp)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Report Mon 05/08 2:50 PM
SCHEDULING REPORT of Joint Rule Scheduling Conference Report filed by Plaintiff Katrina Wright. (King, Tessa)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 05, 2023
20 20 2 pgs order Order Fri 05/05 3:57 PM
ORDER RE GRANTING Defendants' Request to Have Lead Trial Counsel Participate Remotely at Hearing on Motion to Remand or, in the Alternative, to Have Non-Lead Trial Counsel Participate at Hearing18 by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (See document for further information). (jp)
Related: [-]
19 19 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Fri 05/05 2:32 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: The court is in receipt of the parties Joint Stipulation and Order to Continue Initial Discovery Deadline (Dkt.17 ) (the Stipulation), filed on May 4, 2023. Based on the state of the record, as applied to the applicable law, the court finds the parties have made an insufficient showing for the court to grant the relief requested in the Stipulation. Therefore, the Stipulation is DENIED. The parties shall review and comply with: (a) the courts Civil Standing Order7 , and (b) the courts Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference8 , including the requirements of the contents of the Joint Rule 26(f) Report to be filed. **The parties shall file a Joint Rule 26(f) Report no later than Monday, May 8, 2023, at 5:00 p.m.** THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mku)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 04, 2023
18 18 misc Miscellaneous Document Thu 05/04 5:15 PM
Request for Remote Appearance filed by Defendants Travis Hoar, IQVIA Holdings Inc., Q Squared Solutions LLC re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange Superior Court9(Pangborn, Susan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Susan W. Pangborn Declaration,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
17 17 stip Discovery Thu 05/04 11:22 AM
Joint STIPULATION for Discovery as to Initial Deadline filed by Plaintiff Katrina Wright.(King, Tessa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Joint Stipulation and Order to Continue Initial Discovery Deadline [Proposed Order]
Thursday, April 27, 2023
16 16 respm Reply (Motion related) Thu 04/27 5:35 PM
REPLY In Support of a Motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange Superior Court9 filed by Plaintiff Katrina Wright.(King, Tessa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Travis Beck In Support of Plaintiff's Reply
Monday, April 24, 2023
15 15 motion Dismiss Party Mon 04/24 8:28 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Travis Hoar (Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6)) filed by Defendant Travis Hoar. Motion set for hearing on 6/1/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (Pangborn, Susan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities,
Att: 2 Declaration of Chapman in Support,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
14 14 misc Disclosure Mon 04/24 8:19 PM
DISCLOSURE of Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7-1 filed by Defendant Travis Hoar (Pangborn, Susan)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 04/24 7:50 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Travis Hoar, (Attorney Susan W Pangborn added to party Travis Hoar(pty:dft))(Pangborn, Susan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 20, 2023
12 12 22 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Thu 04/20 4:43 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange Superior Court9 filed by Defendants IQVIA Holdings Inc., Q Squared Solutions LLC.(Pangborn, Susan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Kendra Chapman,
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Chapman Decl,
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Chapman Decl,
Att: 4 Exhibit C to Chapman Decl,
Att: 5 Exhibit D to Chapman Decl,
Att: 6 Declaration of Travis Hoar,
Att: 7 Proposed Order
Monday, March 27, 2023
11 11 misc Miscellaneous Document Mon 03/27 10:40 AM
Demand for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiff Katrina Wright (King, Tessa)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 03/27 10:33 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Katrina Wright, identifying Plaintiff Katrina Wright, Defendant Q Squared Solutions, LLC, Defendant IQVIA Holdings, Inc., Defendant Travis Hoar, Defendant Abraham Gaytan, Counsel for Plaintiff, Reisner & King LLP; Adam Reisner, Esq., and Tessa King Esq.. (King, Tessa)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Remand Case to State Court Mon 03/27 10:19 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Orange Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Katrina Wright. Motion set for hearing on 5/11/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (King, Tessa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration
Friday, March 24, 2023
8 8 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Fri 03/24 10:18 AM
ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. Scheduling Conference set for 5/18/2023 at 9:00 AS.M. See Order for details. (mku)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 23, 2023
7 7 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 03/23 10:07 AM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (mku)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 03/22 12:35 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 03/22 12:35 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 03/22 12:35 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fred W. Slaughter and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (car)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2023
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 03/20 8:37 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants IQVIA Holdings Inc., Q Squared Solutions LLC identifying IQVIA Holdings Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Pangborn, Susan)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 03/20 8:35 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants IQVIA Holdings Inc., Q Squared Solutions LLC. (Pangborn, Susan)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 03/20 8:33 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange, case number 30-2023 01306366 Receipt No: ACACDC-34990170 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Q Squared Solutions LLC, IQVIA Holdings Inc.. (Attorney Susan W Pangborn added to party IQVIA Holdings Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Susan W Pangborn added to party Q Squared Solutions LLC(pty:dft))(Pangborn, Susan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Kendra C. Chapman in Support of Notice of Removal,
Att: 2 65 pgs Exhibit A - Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Proof of Service - IQVIA,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Proof of Service - Q Squared Solutions,
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Register of Actions,
Att: 6 Exhibit E - Answer to Complaint,
Att: 7 Exhibit F - Notice of Removal to Superior Court,
Att: 8 Exhibit G - Notice to Adverse Party of Removal
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Wed 03/22 1:09 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 100, inclusive, Abraham Gaytan, Travis Hoar, IQVIA Holdings Inc., Q Squared Laboratory Solutions LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Katrina Wright. Filed in State Court on 2/7/2023 Submitted with Attachment 2 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal1 (car)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 03/22 1:13 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Katrina Wright, upon Defendant IQVIA Holdings Inc. served on 2/17/2023, answer due 3/10/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 2/22/2023 Submitted with Attachment 3 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal1 (car)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 03/22 1:19 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Katrina Wright, upon Defendant Q Squared Laboratory Solutions LLC served on 2/17/2023, answer due 3/10/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Nicole Stauss - authorized to accept in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy. Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 2/27/2023 Submitted with Attachment 4 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal1 (car)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Wed 03/22 1:22 PM
NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants IQVIA Holdings Inc., Q Squared Solutions LLC. Submitted with Attachment 6 Exhibit E to Notice of Removal1 (car)
Related: [-]