Florida Middle District Court
Case #: 6:23-cr-00038
Case Filed:Mar 20, 2023
Terminated:Mar 20, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 21, 2023 3:17 AM EDT
Plaintiff
USA
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Jordan Jomar Obregon-Virola (1)
Terminated: 03/20/2023


Docket last updated: 03/21/2023 3:24 AM EDT
Monday, March 20, 2023
1 1 TRANSFER OF JURISDICTION documents for Supervised Release received as to Jordan Jomar Obregon-Virola from District of Puerto Rico.(SRD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Docket Sheet,
Att: 2 Indictment,
Att: 3 Judgment