Hodges v. Hartman et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Miranda M Du |
Referred: | Carla Baldwin |
Case #: | 3:23-cv-00113 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jan 05, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Friday, January 05, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
![]() ORDER - It is therefore ordered that this action is dismissed under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(a)(1). Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/5/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS) |
|
Tuesday, October 10, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
![]() Mail Returned as Undeliverable "deceased" re22 Transcript, addressed to plaintiff. (LG) |
|
22 | 22
![]() TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings,14 Order on Motion,,,,,, Motion Hearing,,,,, held on 8-29-23, before Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kathy French, KF@nvd.uscourts.gov. Any Redaction Request is due by 10/31/2023. Release of the Transcript Restriction is set for 1/8/2024. Before release date, the transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter. After release date, it may be obtained through the court reporter or PACER. THIS TRANSCRIPT MUST NOT BE ATTACHED AS AN EXHIBIT OR MADE PART OF AN APPENDIX. See Local Rule IA 10-3.(b). (KF) |
|
Wednesday, September 27, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
![]() ORDER - It is therefore ordered that the Court will dismiss this case in 90 days if there is no motion to substitute filed under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(a)(1). Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/27/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
![]() SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Steven B. Hodges Suggestion of Death on the Record by Interested Party Nevada Deparment of Corrections.. (Rands, Douglas) |
|
Thursday, September 07, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
![]() ORDER - Plaintiff's IFP Application (ECF No.1 ) is denied . Plaintiff must pay the full filing fee of $402 to the Clerk of Court on or before October 10, 2023 . Alternatively, if Plaintiff's financial status has changed, Plaintiff must demonstrate his indigent status by submitting a new application to proceed in forma pauperis with an inmate account statement for the past six months and a properly executed financial certificate to this Court on or before October 10, 2023.The Clerk of Court is directed to send Plaintiff a new IFP Application and instructions. (Attached hereto for distribution to P via NNCC Law Library) . Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/7/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, September 06, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
![]() STATUS REPORT 90 Day Stay Report by Interested Party Nevada Deparment of Corrections.. (Munro, Keith) |
|
Tuesday, September 05, 2023 | ||
minutes
Early Mediation Conference
Wed 09/06 7:47 AM
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Virtual Early Mediation Conference held on 9/5/2023 before Mediator Lydia Nussbaum. Crtrm Administrator: Karen Walker ; Pla Counsel: Steven Hodges ; Def Counsel: Keith Munro (NDOC: Nancy Katafias and A.W. Drummond) ; Court Reporter: Liberty Court Recorder ; Time of Hearing: 1:00 p.m. ; Recording start and end times: 3:29:15 p.m. - 3:30:46 p.m. ; Courtroom: 2 . 1st mediation session. A settlement was NOT reached. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW) |
||
Wednesday, August 30, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
![]() MOTION for Rehearing Re : August 29, 2023 Motion Hearing (see ECF No.14 Minutes of Proceedings), by Plaintiff Steven Bradley Hodges. Responses due by 9/13/2023. (DRM) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Reconsider
Wed 08/30 2:07 PM
ORDER denying15 Motion for Rehearing RE: August 29, 2023 Motion Hearing. Plaintiff has not stated adequate grounds for rehearing this issue. Therefore, the Court denies Plaintiff's Motion for Rehearing RE: August 29, 2023 Motion Hearing, (ECF No.15 ). The Court will not accept further filings related to the stipulation to dismiss. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 8/30/2023. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMC) |
||
Tuesday, August 29, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
![]() MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 8/29/2023 before Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. Crtrm Administrator: LGM ; Pla Counsel: Steven Hodges (By telephone) ; Def Counsel: Keith Munro (In person) and Doug Rands (By telephone) ; Recording start and end times: 9:14:39 - 9:36:53 ; Courtroom: 1 ; The Court discusses with Mr. Munro and Mr. Rands the issues the Court has with the Defendants' Opposition to Motion for Relief from Judgment9 . Mr. Munro confirms that there is no settlement agreement between the parties in this case. The Court advises that a conversation is not a basis to file a stipulation to dismiss and that if Mr. Hodges does not want to proceed with the litigation that it is his responsibility to file a notice of voluntary dismissal. Mr. Hodges advises that he wishes to proceed with this litigation. Therefore, the Court finds that the Order granting the stipulation to dismiss8 and the Motion for Relief from Judgment9 are both WITHDRAWN.The Court further finds that the Inmate Early Mediation Conference currently set for Tuesday, September 5, 2023, at 1:00 p.m. shall proceed. See the attached order for specifications. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM) |
|
Monday, August 28, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
![]() NOTICE of Under Seal Submission by Nevada Deparment of Corrections re11 Response.. (Munro, Keith) |
|
11 | 11
![]() RESPONSE to9 Motion by Interested Party Nevada Deparment of Corrections. Replies due by 9/4/2023.(Munro, Keith) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Friday, August 25, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
![]() MOTION for Relief from Judgment - Rule 60(b) by Plaintiff Steven Bradley Hodges. Responses due by 9/8/2023. (CJS) (misc) (presiding) |
|
minord
Minute Order Setting Hearing on Motion
Fri 08/25 2:05 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 8/25/2023. By Deputy Clerk: LGM. A Motion Hearing regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Relief from Judgment9 is set for 8/29/2023 at 09:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. Mr. Munro shall appear in person for this hearing. The Attorney General's Office shall make the necessary arrangements for Plaintiff's telephonic appearance and shall advise the Courtroom Deputy, Lisa Mann at lisa_mann@nvd.uscourts.gov of the telephone number at which Mr. Hodges can be reached for this hearing. Any response to the motion shall be filed by no later than noon on Monday, August 28, 2023 . IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM) |
||
Wednesday, August 23, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
![]() ORDER granting ECF No.7 Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice.This action is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear his own costs. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/23/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS) |
|
7 | 7
![]() STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL by Interested Party Nevada Deparment of Corrections. (Munro, Keith) (dismissal) |
|
Friday, July 07, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
![]() ORDER Setting Inmate Early Mediation Conference for Tuesday, September 5, 2023, at 1:00 p.m. by video conference before Mediator Lydia Nussbaum. The parties' mediation statements must be received by the court no later than 4:00 p.m., on Tuesday, August 22, 2023. DO NOT FILE THE MEDIATION STATEMENTS; DO NOT SERVE A COPY ON OPPOSING COUNSEL. See the attached order for specifications. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 7/7/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
![]() LIMITED NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Keith G. Munro on behalf of Interested Party Nevada Deparment of Corrections. (Munro, Keith) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
![]() SCREENING ORDER. A decision on the IFP application (ECF No.1 ) is deferred . FAC (ECF No.3 ) is the operative complaint. The Complaint (ECF No.1 -1) is dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk will send P a courtesy copy of FAC (ECF No.3 ). (Attached hereto for distribution to P via NNCC Law Library). The Clerk of Court will add Dr. Halki and Dr. Barrett to the docket as defendants. Claims will proceed, or are dismissed, as detailed herein. Defendants Dr. Halki, Hartman, Marangi, Justin Pope, and William Quanga are dismissed from the case without prejudice. This action is stayed 90 days to allow parties to settle. 90-day report due by 9/10/2023. If case does not settle, Plaintiff will be required to pay the full filing fee. Clerk is directed to add the Nevada Department of Corrections to the docket as an Interested Party and e-serve a copy of this order, and copy of the FAC (ECF No.3 ) on the AG by adding to the docket. (E-service of order 6/12/2023; FAC via NEF regeneration). AG shall advise within 21 days of the date of the entry of this order (7/3/2023) re acceptance of service for the purpose of participation in the Early Mediation Program. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/12/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, March 24, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
![]() FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hartman, Marangi, Justin Pope, William Quanga, Brannon by Steven Bradley Hodges. Adds new party. (CJS) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
![]() ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (CJS) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
![]() MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Steven Bradley Hodges.(CJS) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |