Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Robert D Mariani
Case #: 3:23-cv-00492
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2023
Terminated:Aug 09, 2024
Case in other court:Pennsylvania Western, 2:23-cv-00231
Last checked: Sunday Sep 17, 2023 7:45 AM EDT
Defendant
LVNV Funding LLC
Represented By
Lauren M. Burnette
Messer Strickler, Ltd.
contact info
Spencer M Schulz
Sessions, Israel & Shartle, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Robbin Sicher
Represented By
Brett M. Freeman
Freeman Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, August 09, 2024
18 18 1 pgs order Order Terminating Case Fri 08/09 10:51 AM
ORDER TERMINATING CASE - The Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice is approved. This matter is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own fees and costs. The Clerk of Court is directed to dismiss this case. Signed by Honorable Robert D Mariani on 8/9/24. (ao)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
17 17 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 08/08 11:28 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Robbin Sicher.(Freeman, Brett)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order Approving Stipulation Wed 04/17 3:21 PM
Order approving15 Stipulation as set forth herein. All fact discovery shall be completed by 6/28/24. All other deadlines set forth in the Court's June 12, 2023 scheduling order13 remain in place. Signed by Honorable Robert D Mariani on 4/17/24. (dw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
15 15 misc Stipulation Tue 04/16 5:18 PM
STIPULATION to Extend Deadlines by Robbin Sicher. (Freeman, Brett)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 12, 2023
13 13 order Case Management Order - Standard Track Mon 06/12 2:43 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - STANDARD CASE MANAGEMENT TRACK. ORDERED THAT: Motions to join additional parties and/or amend pleadings due 2/29/24. Fact discovery completed by 4/26/24. Dispositive motions filed by 9/27/24. See Order for additional deadlines and details. Signed by Honorable Robert D Mariani on 6/12/23. (jam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 07, 2023
12 12 misc Case Management Plan Wed 06/07 10:28 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN Joint Case Management Plan by Robbin Sicher. (Freeman, Brett)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 26, 2023
11 11 order Scheduling Order Fri 05/26 4:14 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference VIA TELEPHONE set for 6/12/2023 12:00 PM before Honorable Robert D Mariani.The placement of the telephone conference call is the responsibility of the plaintiff. The completed Joint Case Management Plan must be filed at least 3 business days prior to the Case Management Conference. Signed by Honorable Robert D Mariani on 5/25/23. (jam)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 10, 2023
10 10 order Special Admissions Form Approved Mon 04/10 4:26 PM
SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Spencer M. Schulz, Esq. Signed by Honorable Robert D Mariani on 4/10/23. (jam)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 07, 2023
9 9 misc Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/07 3:10 PM
PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Lauren M. Burnette on behalf of LVNV Funding LLC Attorney Spencer Schulz is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-6252916.. (Burnette, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 31, 2023
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 03/31 2:59 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by LVNV Funding LLC.(Burnette, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
7 7 2 pgs order Order Re: Case Assignment and Procedures Wed 03/22 5:36 PM
ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Robert D Mariani on 3/22/23. (jam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
6 6 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Tue 03/21 11:47 AM
Case transferred electronically in from District of Pennsylvania Western; Case Number 2:23-cv-00231 containing electronic documents. jw
Related: [-]
Friday, February 17, 2023
5 5 ORDER re4 Stipulation filed by LVNV FUNDING, LLC. The Clerk is instructed to TRANSFER this case to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania forthwith, and to CLOSE this case in this Court upon the completion of such transfer. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 2/17/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lar) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 3/21/2023.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 16, 2023
4 4 STIPULATION TO TRANSFER TO THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA by LVNV FUNDING, LLC. (Burnette, Lauren) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 3/21/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 14, 2023
3 3 ORDER Re: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 2/14/23. (ms) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 3/21/2023.]
Related: [-]
2 2 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (ms) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 3/21/2023.]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 13, 2023
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Luzerne County, case number 202300272. Copies attached: state court record (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7537072), filed by LVNV FUNDING, LLC. (keh) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Western on 3/21/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet