Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 6:22-bk-60447

Texas Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joshua P Searcy
Case #: 6:23-ap-06002
Nature of Suit65 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - other
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2023
Terminated:Nov 02, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Prosper Marketplace, Inc.
211 E. 7th Street Suite 620
Austin, TX 78701
Represented By
Prosper Marketplace, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Jondra F. Latham
470 CR 1150
Quitman, TX 75783
Represented By
Charles Anthony Newton
Newtons Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Thursday, November 02, 2023
21 21 court Certificate of Mailing Thu 11/02 11:32 PM
Certificate Of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 11/02/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20 Order Closing Due to Stipulated Dismissal (RE: related document(s)19 Notice of Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Jondra F. Latham (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor Jondra F. Latham , Plaintiff Jondra F. Latham). (sr)
court Close Adversary Case Thu 11/02 7:58 AM
Adversary Case Number 23-6002 Closed. (bd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
20 20 1 pgs order Order Tue 10/31 3:25 PM
Order Closing Due to Stipulated Dismissal Related [+]. (sr)
Related: [-] 19 Notice of Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Jondra F. Latham (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor Jondra F. Latham , Plaintiff Jondra F. Latham
19 19 notice Notice of Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Case Tue 10/31 10:32 AM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Jondra F. Latham(Newton, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Saturday, August 05, 2023
18 18 court Certificate of Mailing Sat 08/05 11:26 PM
Certificate Of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 08/05/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Notice and Order Regarding Initial Pre-Trial Procedures in Adversary Proceeding and Scheduling of Telephonic Management Conference. (RE: related document(s)1 COMPLAINT: (91 (Declaratory judgment)),(65 (Dischargeability - other)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)): filed by Debtor Jondra F. Latham , Plaintiff Jondra F. Latham). Telephonic Management Conference scheduled for 10/31/2023. A precise time for this telephonic management conference will be assigned and transmitted to all parties at the time of their respective communications with the Courtroom Deputy. (jd)
Thursday, August 03, 2023
17 17 court Certificate of Mailing Thu 08/03 11:35 PM
Certificate Of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 08/03/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order Setting Aside Entry of Default. (vh)
16 16 court Certificate of Mailing Thu 08/03 11:35 PM
Certificate Of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 08/03/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Order Denying Amended Motion to Enforce Settlement (RE: related document(s)8 Amended Motion to Enforce Settlement Filed by Brandon K. Bains on behalf of Prosper Marketplace, Inc. (RE: related document(s)7 Motion to Enforce Settlement Filed by Prosper Marketplace, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit 2 # 3 Exhibit 3 # 4 Exhibit 4) filed by Defendant Prosper Marketplace, Inc.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit 2 # 3 Exhibit 3 # 4 Exhibit 4 # 5 Proposed Order) filed by Defendant Prosper Marketplace, Inc.). (vh)
15 15 3 pgs order Order and Notice of Hearing (Telephonic Management Conference) Thu 08/03 12:02 PM
Notice and Order Regarding Initial Pre-Trial Procedures in Adversary Proceeding and Scheduling of Telephonic Management Conference. Related [+]. Telephonic Management Conference scheduled for 10/31/2023. A precise time for this telephonic management conference will be assigned and transmitted to all parties at the time of their respective communications with the Courtroom Deputy. (jd)
Related: [-] 1 COMPLAINT: (91 (Declaratory judgment)),(65 (Dischargeability - other)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)): filed by Debtor Jondra F. Latham , Plaintiff Jondra F. Latham
Wednesday, August 02, 2023
14 14 notice Notice of Initial Disclosure Wed 08/02 8:54 AM
Notice of Initial Disclosure Filed by Jondra F. Latham (Newton, Charles)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
13 13 order Entry of Default by Court Tue 08/01 9:59 AM
Order Setting Aside Entry of Default. (vh)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Generic Order Tue 08/01 9:57 AM
Order Denying Amended Motion to Enforce Settlement Related [+]. (vh)
Related: [-] 8 Amended Motion to Enforce Settlement Filed by Brandon K. Bains on behalf of Prosper Marketplace, Inc. (RE: related document(s)7 Motion to Enforce Settlement Filed by Prosper Marketplace, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit 2 # 3 Exhibit 3 # 4 Exhibit 4) filed by Defendant Prosper Marketplace, Inc.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit 2 # 3 Exhibit 3 # 4 Exhibit 4 # 5 Proposed Order) filed by Defendant Prosper Marketplace, Inc.
Monday, July 31, 2023
court Hearing Held (Evidentiary) Mon 07/31 3:53 PM
Evidentiary Hearing Held: Motion Denied. Related [+]
Related: [-] 8 Amended Motion to Enforce Settlement Filed by Brandon K. Bains on behalf of Prosper Marketplace, Inc. (RE: related document(s)7 Motion to Enforce Settlement Filed by Prosper Marketplace, Inc. . (jd
Friday, June 23, 2023
11 11 court Certificate of Mailing Fri 06/23 11:32 PM
Certificate Of Mailing Related [+]
Related: [-] 10 Virtual Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)8 Amended Motion to Enforce Settlement Filed by Brandon K. Bains on behalf of Prosper Marketplace, Inc. (RE: related document(s)7 Motion to Enforce Settlement Filed by Defendant Prosper Marketplace, Inc.).. Hearing scheduled for 7/31/2023 at 02:00 PM at Virtual Hearing Location (TYR July 31). (jd)). Notice Date 06/23/2023. (Admin.
Wednesday, June 21, 2023
10 10 court Hearing Set - With Form Wed 06/21 12:54 PM
Virtual Hearing Set Related [+]
Related: [-] 8 Amended Motion to Enforce Settlement Filed by Brandon K. Bains on behalf of Prosper Marketplace, Inc. (RE: related document(s)7 Motion to Enforce Settlement Filed by Defendant Prosper Marketplace, Inc.). . Hearing scheduled for 7/31/2023 at 02:00 PM at Virtual Hearing Location (TYR July 31). (jd
Saturday, June 17, 2023
9 9 answer Objection Sat 06/17 9:19 PM
Objection Filed by Jondra F. Latham Related [+]. (Newton, Charles)
Related: [-] 8 Amended Motion to Enforce Settlement Filed by Brandon K. Bains on behalf of Prosper Marketplace, Inc. (RE: related document(s)7 Motion to Enforce Settlement Filed by Prosper Marketplace, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit 2 # 3 Exhibit 3 # 4 Exhibit 4) filed by Defendant Prosper Marketplace, Inc.). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit 2 # 3 Exhibit 3 # 4 Exhibit 4 # 5 Proposed Order) filed by Defendant Prosper Marketplace, Inc.
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Offer of Compromise
Att: 2 Exhibit B - May 10, 2023 Acceptance of Amount with Conditions
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Defense counsel request for Form W-9
Att: 4 Unsworn Declaration of Jondra F. Latham
Att: 5 Proposed Order
Monday, June 05, 2023
8 8 motion Generic Motion Mon 06/05 10:24 AM
Amended Motion to Enforce Settlement Filed by Brandon K. Bains on behalf of Prosper Marketplace, Inc. Related [+]. (Bains, Brandon)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to Enforce Settlement Filed by Prosper Marketplace, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit 2 # 3 Exhibit 3 # 4 Exhibit 4) filed by Defendant Prosper Marketplace, Inc.
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
Att: 5 Proposed Order
Friday, June 02, 2023
7 7 motion Generic Motion Fri 06/02 4:51 PM
Motion to Enforce Settlement Filed by Prosper Marketplace, Inc. (Bains, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
Friday, May 19, 2023
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/19 2:15 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Prosper Marketplace, Inc. (Bains, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 17, 2023
5 5 court Certificate of Mailing Wed 05/17 11:29 PM
Certificate Of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 05/17/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Entry of Default by Court (jd)
Monday, May 15, 2023
4 4 order Entry of Default by Court Mon 05/15 4:29 PM
Entry of Default by Court (jd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 28, 2023
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 03/28 4:12 PM
Summons Service Executed on Prosper Marketplace, Inc. 3/22/2023 (Newton, Charles)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
2 2 court Summons Issued Wed 03/22 9:04 AM
Summons Issued on Prosper Marketplace, Inc. Date Issued 3/22/2023, Answer Due 4/21/2023 and electronically transmitted back to the filer to be served upon the relevant party(s). (sr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint [COURT USE ONLY] Tue 03/21 9:28 AM
COMPLAINT: (91 (Declaratory judgment)),(65 (Dischargeability - other)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)): filed by Charles Anthony Newton on behalf of Jondra F. Latham against Prosper Marketplace, Inc.. (Newton, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 cover sheet
Att: 2 Summons