Original Case: 1:21-cv-03079

Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-01525
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Case Filed:Mar 20, 2023
Terminated:Sep 15, 2023
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2023 3:29 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
HEALTHPLEX ASSOCIATES, INC.
Represented By
Rosemary L. Borek
STEPHENSON MOROW & SEMLER
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ADNAN HYDER
Represented By
Rosemary L. Borek
STEPHENSON MOROW & SEMLER
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
RENEE CLARK-MCDONALD
Represented By
Rosemary L. Borek
STEPHENSON MOROW & SEMLER
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
BRYANT L. GRAHAM
Represented By
Bryant L. Graham
contact info

GPO Sep 15 2023
Filed Nonprecedential Disposition PER CURIAM. AFFIRMED. Frank H. Easterbrook, Circuit Judge; Ilana Diamond Rovner, Circuit Judge and Thomas L. Kirsch II, Circuit Judge. [7335888-1] [7335888] [23-1525]

Docket last updated: 09/18/2023 3:27 AM CDT
Monday, March 20, 2023
1 1 Private civil case docketed. IFP pending in the District Court. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Bryant L. Graham by 03/24/2023. Transcript information sheet due by 04/03/2023. [1] [7298840] 23-1525 (PS) [Entered: 03/21/2023 12:28 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 23 pgs Civil Case
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court