Georgia Middle District Court
Judge:Clay D Land
Case #: 4:23-cv-00057
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 22, 2023
Terminated:May 09, 2024
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2023 4:54 AM EDT
Defendant
ASI HOME INSURANCE CORP
Represented By
CHRISTOPHER MEEKS
contact info
SETH MICHAEL FRIEDMAN
contact info
Plaintiff
ABM ENTERPRISE LLC
Represented By
ROBERT T TRAMMELL, JR
contact info
DUSTIN T BROWN
contact info
Plaintiff
BRUCE ANDERSON
Represented By
ROBERT T TRAMMELL, JR
contact info
DUSTIN T BROWN
contact info
Plaintiff
JAMES BODDIE
Represented By
ROBERT T TRAMMELL, JR
contact info
DUSTIN T BROWN
contact info
Plaintiff
DEREKA BROWN
Represented By
ROBERT T TRAMMELL, JR
contact info
DUSTIN T BROWN
contact info

GPO Apr 03 2024
STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER as to 28 Motion for Protective Order Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D. LAND on 4/3/2024 (tlf).

Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 09, 2024
32 32 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 05/09 10:27 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal by ASI HOME INSURANCE CORP as to All Parties (MEEKS, CHRISTOPHER) Modified on 5/9/2024 to change to correct event (tlf)
Related: [-]
utility REMARK Thu 05/09 11:37 AM
REMARK : In light of32 Stipulation of Dismissal, this case has been closed (tlf)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency Thu 05/09 1:25 PM
Notice of Deficiency ; Related document:32 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by ASI HOME INSURANCE CORP; Wrong event used. Please do not re-file , corrected by case manager. The correct event which should have been used is Civil Events, Other Filings, Other Documents, Stipulation of Dismissal (tlf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
31 31 order Order Tue 04/09 2:38 PM
This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER . In their joint notice of settlement, the parties represented that they had reached a settlement and that they would file a dismissal of all claims within the next 30 days. Accordingly, the Court stays the scheduling order deadlines for 30 days. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 4/9/2024. (kat)
Related: [-]
30 30 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 04/09 9:04 AM
NOTICE of Settlement Joint Notice of Settlement by ASI HOME INSURANCE CORP(MEEKS, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
29 29 7 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Wed 04/03 10:08 AM
STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER as to28 Motion for Protective Order Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D. LAND on 4/3/2024 (tlf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
28 28 motion Protective Order Tue 03/26 11:35 AM
JOINT MOTION for Protective Order by ASI HOME INSURANCE CORP filed by CHRISTOPHER MEEKS.(MEEKS, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Stipulated Confidentiality and Protective Order
Thursday, February 15, 2024
notice Notice of Deficiency Thu 02/15 7:59 AM
Notice of Deficiency ; Related document:27 Notice (Other), filed by ASI HOME INSURANCE CORP; Discovery is not filed in the Middle District of Georgia. Please do not file discovery in the future. Neither should notices or certificates regarding discovery be filed. See Local Rule 5.1 and the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures (tlf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
27 27 notice Notice (Other) Wed 02/14 3:50 PM
NOTICE Notice of Filing Subpoenas to Serve by ASI HOME INSURANCE CORP(MEEKS, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Subpoena ABM Enterprises,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Subpoena James Curtis Boddie,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Subpoena BHE Boddie Home Enterprise, LLC,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Subpoena Bruce Anderson
Monday, January 22, 2024
26 26 order Scheduling/Discovery Order Mon 01/22 1:46 PM
SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER : Discovery to be complete by 7/18/2024 . Dispositive motions due by 9/3/2024 . Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D. LAND on 1/22/2024 (tlf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
25 25 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 01/18 3:29 PM
ANSWER to17 Amended Complaint/Petition by ASI HOME INSURANCE CORP.(FRIEDMAN, SETH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
24 24 misc Stipulation Wed 01/03 6:38 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to File Responsive Pleading to First Amended Complaint by ASI HOME INSURANCE CORP (MEEKS, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
23 23 order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 12/21 10:03 AM
This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER denying18 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff's complaint clearly states plausible claims for relief. Accordingly, the motion to dismiss is denied. The stay in this action is lifted, and the parties shall comply with the previously issued Rules 16/26 Order by submitting a joint proposed scheduling order to the Court within 28 days of today's order. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on December 21, 2023 (CDL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
22 22 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 08/08 4:23 PM
REPLY to Response filed by ASI HOME INSURANCE CORP re18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM First Amended Complaint (FRIEDMAN, SETH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 25, 2023
21 21 respm Response to Motion Tue 07/25 4:07 PM
RESPONSE filed by DEREKA BROWN re18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM First Amended Complaint (BROWN, DUSTIN)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 07, 2023
20 20 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Fri 07/07 3:39 PM
ORDER granting19 Motion to Stay. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 7/7/2023 (esl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 06, 2023
19 19 motion Stay Thu 07/06 9:09 AM
JOINT MOTION to Stay Pending Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by ASI HOME INSURANCE CORP filed by CHRISTOPHER MEEKS.(MEEKS, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A - Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
18 18 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 07/05 5:10 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM First Amended Complaint by ASI HOME INSURANCE CORP filed by CHRISTOPHER MEEKS.(MEEKS, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint
Wednesday, June 21, 2023
17 17 cmp Amended Complaint/Petition Wed 06/21 4:48 PM
AMENDED1 Complaint, against ASI HOME INSURANCE CORP by DEREKA BROWN(BROWN, DUSTIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Policy,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Demand Letter
order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion for Leave to File Wed 06/21 3:36 PM
This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER finding as moot9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting15 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Because Plaintiffs moved for leave to amend within 21 days of Defendant's filing of its Motion to Dismiss, Plaintiffs may amend their complaint as a matter of course. Accordingly, Defendant's motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' original complaint is moot. Plaintiffs must file their amended complaint within 7 days of today's order. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 6/21/2023 (kat)
Related: [-]
utility REMARK Wed 06/21 5:04 PM
REMARK : In light of the Courts finding that the motion to dismiss is moot, the stay of discovery is hereby lifted. The scheduling order deadline of July 11, 2023 is reinstated (tlf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2023
15 15 motion Leave to File Wed 06/14 4:27 PM
MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by ABM ENTERPRISE LLC, BRUCE ANDERSON, JAMES BODDIE, DEREKA BROWN filed by DUSTIN T BROWN.(BROWN, DUSTIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - proposed First Amended Complaint
14 14 respm Response to Motion Wed 06/14 4:25 PM
RESPONSE filed by ABM ENTERPRISE LLC, BRUCE ANDERSON, JAMES BODDIE, DEREKA BROWN re9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM(BROWN, DUSTIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - proposed First Amended Complaint
Thursday, June 08, 2023
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Thu 06/08 10:12 AM
ORDER granting12 Motion to Stay. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 6/8/2023 (tlf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 07, 2023
12 12 motion Stay Wed 06/07 2:42 PM
JOINT MOTION to Stay Discovery and Related Deadlines by ASI HOME INSURANCE CORP filed by CHRISTOPHER MEEKS.(MEEKS, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Ex. A - Proposed Order
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
11 11 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 05/31 9:10 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by SETH MICHAEL FRIEDMAN on behalf of ASI HOME INSURANCE CORP Attorney SETH MICHAEL FRIEDMAN added to party ASI HOME INSURANCE CORP(pty:dft)(FRIEDMAN, SETH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
10 10 11 pgs order Order - Rules 16/26 Tue 05/30 11:01 AM
RULES 16/26 ORDER : Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 7/11/2023 . Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D. LAND on 5/30/2023 (tlf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 25, 2023
9 9 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 05/25 5:50 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by ASI HOME INSURANCE CORP filed by CHRISTOPHER MEEKS.(MEEKS, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss
8 8 misc Jurisdictional Statement Thu 05/25 5:43 PM
Jurisdictional Statement by ASI HOME INSURANCE CORP (MEEKS, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 05/25 5:41 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by ASI HOME INSURANCE CORP identifying Corporate Parent THE PROGRESSIVE CORPORATION, Other Affiliate ARX HOLDING CORP for ASI HOME INSURANCE CORP. (MEEKS, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 21, 2023
6 6 misc Stipulation Fri 04/21 8:14 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by ASI HOME INSURANCE CORP (MEEKS, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 10, 2023
5 5 service Certificate of Service Mon 04/10 12:14 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ABM ENTERPRISE LLC, BRUCE ANDERSON, JAMES BODDIE, DEREKA BROWN re4 Jurisdictional Statement,2 Summons Issued,1 Complaint,3 Corporate Disclosure Statement (BROWN, DUSTIN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
4 4 misc Jurisdictional Statement Wed 03/22 1:49 PM
Jurisdictional Statement by ABM ENTERPRISE LLC, BRUCE ANDERSON, JAMES BODDIE, DEREKA BROWN (BROWN, DUSTIN)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 03/22 1:40 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by ABM ENTERPRISE LLC, BRUCE ANDERSON, JAMES BODDIE, DEREKA BROWN (BROWN, DUSTIN)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 03/22 1:36 PM
Summons issued as to ASI HOME INSURANCE CORP. (tlf)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Complaint Wed 03/22 1:21 PM
COMPLAINT against ASI HOME INSURANCE CORP Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-4328178, $402 filed by All Plaintiffs(BROWN, DUSTIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A (COMPLAINT) - Policy-GAA307907,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. B (COMPLAINT) - Demand Ltr with RRs,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Summons Summons