Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Sean D Jordan
Case #: 4:23-cv-00233
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 22, 2023
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2023 5:49 AM CDT
Defendant
8Tech Innovate LLC
Represented By
Warren Ross Markowitz
Markowitz Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Jacques Poujade
Represented By
Warren Ross Markowitz
Markowitz Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Crest Industries LLC
Represented By
Timothy Micah Dortch
Dortch Lindstrom Livingston Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, February 10, 2025
order 1 - Terminate Hearings Mon 02/10 11:45 AM
NOTICE: The Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/12/2025 is cancelled pending further order of the Court. (ldm)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 02/07 10:58 AM
ORDER denying22 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice. Counsel may refile the motion with an amended certificate of conference which complies with the requirements of Local Rule CV-7(i) no later than February 14, 2025. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 2/7/2025. (CLC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
22 22 motion Dismiss Thu 02/06 6:23 PM
MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice by Crest Industries LLC.(Dortch, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
21 21 misc Suggestion of Bankruptcy Wed 04/03 5:40 PM
FIRST SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Jacques Poujade by Jacques Poujade. (Markowitz, Warren)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 25, 2024
20 20 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Sun 02/25 8:24 PM
First ANSWER to12 Amended Complaint by 8Tech Innovate LLC, Jacques Poujade.(Markowitz, Warren)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Order on Motion for Leave to File Fri 02/09 8:52 AM
ORDER. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff Crest Industries LLC's Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint, (Dkt. #11 ), is GRANTED. Accordingly, Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint, (Dkt. #12 ), is deemed properly filed, and is now the operative complaint in this matter. It is further ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, (Dkt. #10 ), is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 2/9/2024. (jmb, )
Related: [-]
18 18 order Scheduling Order/Docket Control Order Fri 02/09 8:48 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference SET for 2/12/2025 at 09:00 AM in Ctrm 105 (Plano) before District Judge Sean D. Jordan. Joinder of Parties due by 3/20/2024. Designation of Mediator due by 7/10/2024. Discovery due by 7/24/2024. Motions due by 8/14/2024. Mediation Completion due by 8/21/2024. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/13/2025. Jury Instructions due by 1/29/2025. Proposed Findings of Fact due by 1/29/2025. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 2/9/2024. (jmb, )
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 02/02 3:57 PM
NOTICE: The Rule 16 management conference set for 2/7/2024 is cancelled. The Court will issue a scheduling order. (ldm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
17 17 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Wed 01/10 6:27 PM
JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Dortch, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
16 16 11 pgs order Order Governing Proceedings Wed 12/06 4:11 PM
ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/12/2024. Rule 16 Management Conference SET for 2/7/2024 at 11:00 AM in Ctrm 105 (Plano) before District Judge Sean D. Jordan. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 12/6/2023. (jmb, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 30, 2023
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Wed 08/30 4:11 PM
NOTICE by Crest Industries LLC re13 Response to Motion Supplemental Evidence in Support(Dortch, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Copy of Plea Agreement
Friday, June 02, 2023
14 14 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 06/02 1:54 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re10 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by 8Tech Innovate LLC, Jacques Poujade .(Markowitz, Warren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit/Declaration declaration jacques poujade,
Att: 2 Affidavit/Declaration declaration atty kinney
Friday, May 26, 2023
13 13 8 pgs respm Response to Motion Fri 05/26 12:01 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re10 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Crest Industries LLC .(Dortch, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Jason Adams,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 23, 2023
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 05/23 12:11 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT (Third) against 8Tech Innovate LLC, Jacques Poujade, filed by Crest Industries LLC.(Dortch, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 22, 2023
11 11 motion Leave to File Document Mon 05/22 1:06 PM
Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint by Crest Industries LLC.(Dortch, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit proposed Amendment,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Friday, May 12, 2023
10 10 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Fri 05/12 11:29 AM
First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by 8Tech Innovate LLC, Jacques Poujade.(Markowitz, Warren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo in support
Friday, May 05, 2023
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 05/05 2:00 PM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against 8Tech Innovate LLC, Jacques Poujade, filed by Crest Industries LLC.(Dortch, Timothy) Modified text on 5/5/2023 (mcg, )
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Fri 05/05 1:59 PM
NOTICE by Crest Industries LLC of New Firm Affiliation (Dortch, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 24, 2023
7 7 5 pgs order Order Mon 04/24 4:47 PM
ORDER. The Court ORDERS that, by no later than Monday, May 8, 2023, Crest must file a second amended complaint that alleges facts sufficient to invoke this Courts jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 4/24/2023. (rpc, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 19, 2023
6 6 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 04/19 2:44 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Warren Ross Markowitz on behalf of 8Tech Innovate LLC, Jacques Poujade (Markowitz, Warren)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 10, 2023
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 04/10 5:56 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against 8Tech Innovate LLC, Jacques Poujade, filed by Crest Industries LLC.(Dortch, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 03, 2023
4 4 4 pgs order Order Mon 04/03 2:23 PM
ORDER. The Court ORDERS that, by no later than Monday, April 10, 2023, Crest must file an amended complaint that alleges facts sufficient to invoke this Court's jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 4/3/2023. (mcg, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 27, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 03/27 3:02 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Jacques Poujade. (jmb, )
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 03/27 3:01 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to 8Tech Innovate LLC. (jmb, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/22 4:57 PM
COMPLAINT against 8TECH INNOVATIVE LLC, JACQUES POUJADE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9416666.), filed by CREST INDUSTRIES LLC.(Dortch, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 03/23 8:39 AM
Case Assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (mcg, )
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Availability Thu 03/23 8:39 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (mcg, )
Related: [-]