North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:James C Dever, III
Referred: Robert B Jones, Jr
Case #: 5:23-cv-00140
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Mar 17, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 6:30 AM EDT
Defendant
John Does 1-10
Defendant
Insurance Toolkits, LLC
Represented By
John D. Wooten, IV
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info
John F. Morrow, Jr.
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info
Defendant
Frankie Primerano
1000 Central Avenue Apt 94A
Westfield, NJ 07090
Represented By
John D. Wooten, IV
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info
John F. Morrow, Jr.
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info
Defendant
Joseph Wahl
628 Black Gates Road
Wilmington, DE 19803
Represented By
John D. Wooten, IV
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info
John F. Morrow, Jr.
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Software Automation Holdings, LLC
5101 Dunlea Ct Suite 201C
Wilmington, NC 28405
Represented By
Sabrina Presnell Rockoff
Mcguire Wood And Bissette PA
contact info
Murphy H. Fletcher
Mcguirewood & Bisette
contact info
Peri Berger
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 51 minutes ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
76 76 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 05/05 3:50 PM
ORDER granting75 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court hereby orders that the deadline to complete fact depositions is extended up to and including May 16, 2025. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 5/5/2025. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
utility Motion Submitted Mon 05/05 10:45 AM
Motion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding75 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery for Deposition . (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
75 75 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 05/02 3:22 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery for Deposition filed by Software Automation Holdings, LLC. (Fletcher, Murphy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order on Consent Motion to Extend Time to Complete Deposition
Monday, April 28, 2025
74 74 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 04/28 5:01 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition regarding70 MOTION to Compel filed by Insurance Toolkits, LLC, Joseph Wahl. (Morrow, John)
Related: [-]
73 73 1 pgs order Order Referring Motion Mon 04/28 2:34 PM
ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr.:70 MOTION to Compel filed by Software Automation Holdings, LLC. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 4/28/2025. (Mann, Stephanie)
Related: [-]