California Central District Court
Judge:Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpo
Referred: Sheri Pym
Case #: 5:23-cv-00476
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Mar 18, 2023
Terminated:Mar 19, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 3:02 AM PDT
Defendant
Warren Grant
Plaintiff
Evgenia H. Quaid
PO Box 199
Bristol, VT 05443
Plaintiff
Randy Rudy Quaid
an individual PO Box 199
Bristol, VT 05443


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
7 7 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Fri 03/21 4:46 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING Action for Failure to Diligently Prosecute by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. Quaid has failed to diligently prosecute this action by failing to serve Defendant for more than a year and has failed to abide by the Court's Orders at ECF No. [6.] The Court therefore DISMISSES this action for failure to diligently prosecute and failure to follow an Order of the Court. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case file. (See document for further details) (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (yl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
6 6 1 pgs order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 06/27 1:34 PM
(IN CHAMBERS)ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BEDISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court, on its own motion, hereby orders plaintiff (s) to show cause in writing no later than JULY 3, 2023, why this action should not be dismissed as to all remaining defendants for lack of prosecution. As an alternative to a written response by plaintiff(s), the Court will accept one of the following as an appropriate response to this OSC if it is filed on or before the above date, as evidence that the matter is being prosecuted diligently: Plaintiff filing Proofs of Service of the First Amended Complaint on ALL Defendants. (See document for further details) (yl)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 03, 2023
5 5 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Mon 04/03 5:04 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: This matter has been assigned to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's website under Judge Frimpong's Procedures and Schedules. Please read the Standing Order carefully. It is the responsibilities of the parties to maintain familiarly with the Standing Order and any future amendments that the Court may issue by periodically checking the Court's website for the operative version of the Standing Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
4 4 1 pgs notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 03/22 2:55 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
3 3 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 03/22 2:54 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 03/22 2:53 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (car)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 18, 2023
1 1 5 pgs cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Wed 03/22 2:37 PM
COMPLAINT against Defendant Warren Grant. Case assigned to Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym.(Filing fee $ 402 PAID), filed by Plaintiffs Randy Rudy Quaid, Evgenia H. Quaid. (car)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet