Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Hope T Cannon
Case #: 3:23-cv-06655
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Mar 23, 2023
Re-opened:May 19, 2023
Terminated:May 05, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 20, 2023 7:54 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Plaintiff
NATHAN VICKERY
Represented By
DEBORAH K LEVY
Junelle & Associates Pllc - Houston Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, May 19, 2023
4 4 2 pgs order Order Reopening Case Fri 05/19 9:45 AM
ORDER. Consistent with the order dated May 5, 2023, ECF No. 3727, the plaintiffs' motions are GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to VACATE the prior dismissal orders and REOPEN the cases and return them to the docket of the Court. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/19/2023. (djb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, May 15, 2023
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Mon 05/15 8:29 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:3 MOTION to Reopen Case. (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 12, 2023
3 3 motion Reopen Case Fri 05/12 5:00 PM
MOTION to Reopen Case by NATHAN VICKERY. (LEVY, DEBORAH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Confirmation of Active Duty Status
Friday, May 05, 2023
2 2 30+ pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 05/09 11:49 AM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibits A and B are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with a court order. Active-duty plaintiffs and non-veterans are hereby granted leave to file a motion to reopen their case which must be accompanied by a statement clarifying their status with respect to military service. Any motion to reopen on this basis must be filed only on the individual docket for a plaintiff's case by June 5, 2023. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the main MDL docket and on the individual dockets and close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/5/2023. (erl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 23, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/23 3:48 PM
COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7783078.), filed by NATHAN VICKERY. (LEVY, DEBORAH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet