Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Eli J Richardson
Referred: Jeffery S Frensley
Case #: 3:23-cv-00259
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 23, 2023
Defendant
(f/n/u) Hodges
Defendant
(f/n/u) Huppe
Defendant
(f/n/u) Siddal
Defendant
Crystal (l/n/u)
Defendant
Dickson County Sheriff's Office
Defendant
Josh Beckham
Defendant
Kim (l/n/u)
Defendant
Southern Medical Associates
Plaintiff
Daniel Miles

GPO Apr 28 2023
MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 4/28/2023. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg)

Docket last updated: 72 minutes ago
Monday, June 10, 2024
37 37 notice Notice (Other) Mon 06/10 11:04 AM
NOTICE by Josh Beckham, Craig Hodges, Heather Huppe, Ian Siddall (Nolan, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
36 36 misc Sealed Document Mon 12/04 1:10 PM
SEALED SUMMONS25 Returned unexecuted filed by Daniel Miles. Craig Hodges not served. (Note per U.S. Marshals: According to PACER, Notice of Appearance was filed on 10/30/2023 by attorney Daniel Nolan (Docket Entry No.29 .") (mg)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Bar Status Mon 12/04 12:58 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Daniel Mark Nolan admitted to this court . (mg)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
35 35 misc Sealed Document Fri 11/17 2:25 PM
Sealed Document filed by Dickson County Sheriff's Office. (Nolan, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
34 34 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 11/15 11:58 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Josh Beckham, Craig Hodges, Heather Huppe, Ian Siddall.(Nolan, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
33 33 2 pgs order Order Thu 11/09 9:38 AM
ORDER: The Court now ORDERS Sheriff Tim Eads or an authorized representative of the Dickson County Sheriff's Office to file a notice under seal within fourteen (14) days of this Order providing the full and complete names of Nurse Kim (l/n/u) and Nurse Crystal (l/n/u) as well as the last known addresses of these defendants. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Order to Sheriff Tim Eads, Dickson County Sheriff's Office, 140 County Jail Drive, Charlotte, TN 37036. Upon receipt of the notice with the full and complete names and addresses of Nurse Kim (l/n/u) and Nurse Crystal (l/n/u), the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to issue summonses to these defendants at the addresses provided, ensuring that any home addresses remain confidential, and to forward the summonses to the Marshals Office for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 11/9/2023. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail along with a copy to Sheriff Tim Eads. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (af)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
32 32 misc Sealed Document Fri 11/03 8:57 AM
SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Daniel Miles. Heather Huppe served on 9/30/2023 by U.S. Marshals Service. (mg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
31 31 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 10/31 1:02 PM
ORDER granting30 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re14 Amended Complaint. Josh Beckham, Craig Hodges, Heather Huppe and Ian Siddall answer is due 11/15/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 10/31/2023. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (mg)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Bar Status Tue 10/31 8:55 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Daniel Mark Nolan admitted to this court . (mg)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
30 30 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 10/30 11:58 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Josh Beckham, (f/n/u) Hodges, (f/n/u) Huppe, (f/n/u) Siddal. (Nolan, Daniel)
Related: [-]
29 29 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/30 11:06 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Mark Nolan on behalf of Josh Beckham, (f/n/u) Hodges, (f/n/u) Huppe, (f/n/u) Siddal (Nolan, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
28 28 misc Sealed Document Mon 10/16 12:08 PM
SEALED Green Card Returned re25 SEALED Summons. (mg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
27 27 misc Sealed Document Thu 10/05 4:45 PM
SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Daniel Miles. Josh Beckham served on 9/25/2023 by U.S. Marshals Service. (mg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
26 26 notice Notice of Change of Address Tue 09/12 4:15 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Daniel Miles. (Note: address has been updated for this case.) (mg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 31, 2023
25 25 misc Sealed Document Thu 08/31 9:12 AM
SEALED DOCUMENT Summons and 285 Form issued as to Josh Beckham, Ian Siddall, Craig Hodges and Heather Huppe. Service copies forwarded to the U.S. Marshal to effect service. (af)
Related: [-]
24 24 1 pgs order Order Thu 08/31 8:21 AM
ORDER: Pursuant to the Order entered on June 16, 2023 (Docket No.19 ), the Clerk received full names and last known addresses that had been requested by the Plaintiff filed under seal (Docket No.22 ). The Clerk shall issue service packets to the defendants noted therein, and the United States Marshal's Service shall effect service of these documents. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 8/31/2023. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail along with completed service packets placed in Marshal's box. ) (af)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 29, 2023
23 23 notice Notice of Change of Address Thu 06/29 2:34 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Daniel Miles. (Note: address has been updated for this action.) (mg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
22 22 misc Sealed Document Wed 06/28 11:51 AM
Sealed Document filed by Josh Beckham, Dickson County Sheriff's Office, (f/n/u) Hodges, (f/n/u) Huppe. (Nolan, Daniel)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Mail Returned Wed 06/28 10:50 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable.19 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Mail sent to Daniel Miles (ad)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 23, 2023
20 20 misc Mail Returned Fri 06/23 2:28 PM
Mail Returned as Return to Sender.18 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Mail sent to Daniel Miles (mg)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 16, 2023
19 19 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 06/16 2:57 PM
ORDER: Pending before the Court are several motions for subpoenas filed by the pro se prisoner Plaintiff in this matter. Docket Nos.2 ,12 and15 . For the reasons set forth herein, the motions are GRANTED IN PART. The Court orders Sheriff Tim Eads or an authorized representative of Dickson County Sheriff's Office to file a notice within fourteen (14) days of this Order providing the full complete name of Sgt. Siddal, Sgt. Huppe and Officer Hodges as well as the last known address of these Defendants. The Court also orders that the Dickson County Sheriff's Office provide last known address of Defendant Josh Beckham. For the reasons set forth herein, the Plaintiff's motions for subpoena (Docket No.2 and15 ) are DENIED. Plaintiff's motion for subpoena (Docket No.12 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 6/16/2023. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail as well as a copy of this Order to Sheriff Tim Eads of the Dickson County Sheriff's Office.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (mg)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 12, 2023
18 18 7 pgs order Order on Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 06/12 1:59 PM
ORDER: Based on the Court's previous order10 , the Motion11 is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 6/12/2023. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 08, 2023
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Thu 06/08 4:56 PM
NOTICE informing Court of move to Humphreys County Jail in "about 9 days" by Daniel Miles (mg)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2023
16 16 notice Notice of Change of Address Mon 06/05 7:23 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Daniel Miles. (Note: To see address, refer only to page 2 of this filing.) (mg)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 22, 2023
15 15 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 05/22 1:58 PM
MOTION For Subpoena by Daniel Miles. (mg)
Related: [-]
14 14 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 05/22 1:56 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Daniel Miles.(mg)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2023
13 13 misc Letter Mon 05/15 9:28 AM
Letter from Daniel Miles. (mg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 11, 2023
12 12 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 05/11 9:58 AM
MOTION for Court to send Subpoena to the Dickson County Jail by Daniel Miles. (mg)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 08, 2023
11 11 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 05/08 5:08 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis/Institutional Trust Fund Account Activity by Daniel Miles. (mg)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 28, 2023
10 10 4 pgs order Order Assessing Filing Fee Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Fri 04/28 11:29 AM
ORDER: Daniel Miles, an inmate in the custody of the Dickson County Jail in Charlotte, Tennessee. For the reasons explained in the accompanying Memorandum9 Opinion, Plaintiff's request to proceed as a pauper in this action is GRANTED. Accordingly, Plaintiff is hereby assessed the full $350 filing fee. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED send a copy of this Order to the administrator of inmate trust fund accounts at the Dickson County Jail. [C]laims against Southern Medical Associates and an unidentified individual fail to state colorable claims under Section 1983. Likewise, Plaintiff's claims against Lieutenant Huppe in his individual capacity fail to state colorable claims under Section 1983. Those claims and Defendants are DISMISSED. Consequently, the Clerk is instructed to send Plaintiff a service packet (a blank summons and USM 285 form) for the remaining Defendants: Nurse Kim l/n/u, Nurse Crystal l/n/u, Sergeant f/n/u Siddal, Lieutenant f/n/u Huppe, Josh Beckham, and Officer f/n/u Hodges. Plaintiff MUST complete the service packets and return them to the Clerk's Office within 30 days of the date of entry of this Order. Upon return of the service packets, PROCESS SHALL ISSUE to Defendants. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §§ 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), this action is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 4/28/2023. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail along with a service packet (a blank summonsand USM 285 form) for the six remaining Defendants.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (mg)
Related: [-]
9 9 19 pgs order Memorandum Opinion of the Court Fri 04/28 9:31 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 4/28/2023. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (mg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 26, 2023
misc Annotation - Docket Wed 04/26 12:36 PM
An AO 240 (Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Short Form) has been mailed to Plaintiff. (mg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 25, 2023
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/25 1:58 PM
NOTICE by Daniel Miles. (mg)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Docket Tue 04/25 10:56 AM
Plaintiff called Clerk's Office stating he has not received the IFP application (AO 240). Per Plaintiff, his address is 146 County Jail Drive, Charlotte, Tennessee. Address updated on docket sheet. AO 240 application resent to Plaintiff. (ln)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 18, 2023
7 7 misc Letter Tue 04/18 4:38 PM
Letter from Daniel Miles. Based on statement in Letter, an IFP application (short form) will be reissued. (mg)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 14, 2023
6 6 misc Letter Fri 04/14 3:45 PM
Letter from Daniel Miles with "Transaction for Daniel Miles" attached. (mg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 06, 2023
5 5 misc Letter Thu 04/06 3:22 PM
Letter from Daniel Miles. (kc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 30, 2023
4 4 2 pgs order Order Thu 03/30 1:16 PM
ORDER: Acting pro se, Daniel Miles, an inmate of the Dickson County Sheriff's Office in Charlotte, Tennessee, has filed a complaint 42 U.S.C. § 1983, alleging violations of his civil and constitutional rights. (Doc. No.2 ). Plaintiff also has filed a Motion to Request Subpoena. (Doc. No.2 ). To file a federal civil lawsuit, a plaintiff must submit the civil filing fee or an application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. For Plaintiff's convenience, the Clerk is DIRECTED to mail the plaintiff an Application for Leave to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs for prisoners (Short Form). Finally, Plaintiff's Motion to Request Subpoena (Doc. No.2 ) cannot be addressed until the matter of the filing fee has been resolved. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 3/30/2023. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail along with IFP application (short form).) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (mg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 23, 2023
3 3 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Thu 03/23 3:35 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 03/23 3:34 PM
MOTION to Request Subpoena by Daniel Miles. (mg)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/23 3:32 PM
COMPLAINT and "Informa Porpaups" against All Defendants, filed by Daniel Miles.(mg)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Docket Thu 03/23 3:36 PM
Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form and Notice of Consent form included.) (mg)
Related: [-]