New York Southern District Court
Judge:Vincent L Briccetti
Case #: 7:23-cv-02480
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Mar 23, 2023
Terminated:Jul 19, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Sep 21, 2023 10:06 AM EDT
Defendant
Michael Harrison
Attorney at Law, ID#016121977 3155 Route 10 E. Suite 214
Denville, NJ 07834
Plaintiff
Mirl Brach
Represented By
Kenneth Willard
Stein Saks PLLC
contact info
Robert Thomas Yusko
Stein Saks, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, July 19, 2023
11 11 order Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal 1 - Terminate Hearings Wed 07/19 11:42 AM
JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the Plaintiff Mirl Brach and the Defendant that whereas no party hereto is an infant, incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed or conservatee, and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of the action, that this action is dismissed with prejudice and without costs to either party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. SO ORDERED: The conference scheduled for 7/19/23 at 3:30pm is CANCELED. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 7/19/2023) (mml)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 18, 2023
10 10 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 07/18 5:47 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Michael Harrison pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Mirl Brach. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Willard, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 07/18 12:59 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kenneth Willard on behalf of Mirl Brach..(Willard, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2023
8 8 order Order Mon 07/17 4:11 PM
ORDER: On 5/12/2023, the Court ordered the parties to file a proposed Civil Case Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by 7/12/2023. (Doc. #7). The parties have not done so. Accordingly, the Court sua sponte extends to 7/18/2023 at 12:00 p.m. the parties' deadline to file their proposed Civil Case Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti) (Text Only Order) (KEM)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 12, 2023
7 7 notice Notice of Hearing Fri 05/12 12:25 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 7/19/2023 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 620, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. (mml)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 11, 2023
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 05/11 3:59 PM
ANSWER WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT MICHAEL HARRISON, ATTORNEY AT LAW, Re: to1 Complaint. Document filed by Michael Harrison.(sc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 02, 2023
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 05/02 7:17 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Michael Harrison served on 4/25/2023, answer due 5/16/2023. Document filed by Mirl Brach..(Yusko, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 24, 2023
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 03/24 10:08 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael Harrison..(jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Fri 03/24 10:01 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Robert Thomas Yusko. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Orange;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Fri 03/24 10:04 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Robert Thomas Yusko. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Mirl Brach; Michael Harrison. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias was removed and added as party text. (jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 03/24 10:05 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 03/24 10:06 AM
Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 03/24 10:07 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 23, 2023
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 03/23 5:05 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Yusko, Robert)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 03/23 5:04 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michael Harrison, Attorney at Law, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Mirl Brach..(Yusko, Robert)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 03/23 5:00 PM
COMPLAINT against Michael Harrison. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27511076)Document filed by Mirl Brach..(Yusko, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A