Nebraska District Court
Case #: 8:23-cr-00063
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2023
Last checked: Friday Mar 24, 2023 2:47 AM CDT
Defendant
Luis Duran (1)
Represented By
Christopher J. Roth
Roth Weinstein Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Lecia E. Wright
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Omaha
contact info

GPO Mar 20 2023
ORDER ISSUED PURSUANT TO THE DUE PROCESS PROTECTION ACT as to defendant Luis Duran. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SLP)[8:23-mj-00179-MDN]
GPO Mar 29 2023
ORDER of Detention pending trial as to defendant Luis Duran. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SLP)
GPO May 18 2023
ORDER granting 29 Motion to Continue Trial as to Luis Duran. Jury Trial continued to 6/20/2023 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 4, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter Jr. The time between today's date and the anticipated trial is excluded for purposes of computing the limits under the Speedy Trial Act. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (MLF)
GPO Jun 07 2023
ORDER granting 34 Motion to Continue Trial as to Luis Duran. Jury Trial continued to 8/14/2023 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 4, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter Jr. The time between today's date and the anticipated trial is excluded for purposes of computing the limits under the Speedy Trial Act. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (MLF)
GPO Aug 02 2023
ORDER granting 36 Motion to Continue Trial as to Luis Duran. Jury Trial continued to 10/23/2023 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 4, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter Jr. The time between today's date and the anticipated trial is excluded for purposes of computing the limits under the Speedy Trial Act. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (MLF)

Docket last updated: 03/24/2023 3:31 AM CDT
Friday, March 17, 2023
Remark - Public: Case filed under seal on 3/17/2023 and unsealed on 3/20/2023 pursuant to memorandum as to defendant Luis Duran. (MKR) [8:23-mj-00179-MDN]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson as to defendant Luis Duran. (MKR) [8:23-mj-00179-MDN]
Related: [-]
2 2 CRIMINAL COVER SHEET as to defendant Luis Duran. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 49.1(a). ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD IN MULTI-DEFENDANT CASES MAY ACCESS THIS DOCUMENT. (MKR) [8:23-mj-00179-MDN]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2023
4 4 NOTICE (MEMORANDUM) TO UNSEAL MAGISTRATE CASE by Attorney Lecia E. Wright as to defendant Luis Duran. (MKR) [8:23-mj-00179-MDN]
Related: [-]
5 5 TEXT ORDER SETTING HEARING as to defendant Luis Duran. Initial Appearance set for 3/20/2023 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 6, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SLP) [8:23-mj-00179-MDN]
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE RETAINED by Attorney Christopher J. Roth as to defendant(s) Luis Duran. (Roth, Christopher) [8:23-mj-00179-MDN]
Related: [-]
8 8 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held on 3/20/2023 before Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson as to defendant Luis Duran. Initial Appearance on Criminal Complaint held. Initial Appearance held on 3/20/2023. Combined Detention and Preliminary Hearing set for 3/29/2023 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. Oral order issued to counsel pursuant to Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f)(1). Government's oral motion for detention is pending as to flight and danger. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal to be detained pending further order of the court. Hearing held in Omaha, NE. Appearance for Plaintiff: Kelli L. Ceraolo for Lecia E. Wright, USA; Appearance for Defendant: Christopher J. Roth, Retained; Appearance for Pretrial Services: Matt Curry; Courtroom Deputy: Sara Pankoke; Court Reporter: Digital Recorder. No interpreter used during hearing. Time Start: 2:55 PM; Time Stop: 3:03 PM; Time in Court: 8 Minutes. (SLP) [8:23-mj-00179-MDN]
Related: [-]
9 9 TEXT ORAL MOTION - for detention by Attorney Lecia E. Wright as to defendant Luis Duran. (SLP) [8:23-mj-00179-MDN]
Related: [-]
10 10 AUDIO FILE. Audio as to Defendant (1) Luis Duran. Court Date & Time [ 3/20/2023 2:55:55 PM ]. File Size [ 1763 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:07:21 ]. (Initial Appearance). (auto-docket). [8:23-mj-00179-MDN]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER ISSUED PURSUANT TO THE DUE PROCESS PROTECTION ACT as to defendant Luis Duran. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SLP) [8:23-mj-00179-MDN]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
12 12 PART 1 OF 2 - INDICTMENT with foreperson's signature redacted pursuant to the E-Government Actas to defendant Luis Duran. (LRM)
Related: [-]
13 13 PART 2 OF 2 - FOREPERSON'S SIGNATURE PAGE regarding Indictment12 as to defendant Luis Duran. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 49.1(e). ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD IN MULTI-DEFENDANT CASES MAY ACCESS THIS DOCUMENT. (LRM)
Related: [-]
14 14 CRIMINAL COVER SHEET as to defendant Luis Duran. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 49.1(a). ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD IN MULTI-DEFENDANT CASES MAY ACCESS THIS DOCUMENT. (LRM)
Related: [-]