South Carolina District Court
Case #: 6:23-cr-00190
Case Filed:Mar 22, 2023
Terminated:Mar 22, 2023
Last checked: Friday Mar 24, 2023 3:23 AM EDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Justin William Holloway
Us Attorneys Office (gville)
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Romaro Lanarie Foster, Sr (1)
Terminated: 03/22/2023
Represented By
Benjamin Thomas Stepp
Federal Public Defender'S Office (gvle)
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/24/2023 4:00 AM EDT
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
1 1 Rule 5c3 Documents Received as to Romaro Lanarie Foster, Sr (awil, )
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Romaro Lanarie Foster, Sr: Initial Appearance - Rule 5c3 set for 3/22/2023 02:00 PM in Greenville #3100, Carroll A Campbell Jr Courthouse, 250 East North St, Greenville before Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald. (awil, )
Related: [-]
4 4 Arrest (Rule 5) of Romaro Lanarie Foster, Sr (awil, )
Related: [-]
5 5 ORAL Order to Unseal Indictment as to all defendants on motion by the government. Entered by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 3/22/23.(awil, )
Related: [-]
6 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald: Initial Appearance in Rule 5(c)(3) Proceedings as to Romaro Lanarie Foster, Sr held on 3/22/2023. Defendant present in custody. Identity is not an issue. Federal Public Defender Stepp present and appointed. Defendant waived reading of charges and penalties. Bond is set at $100,000 unsecured with stand alone GPS monitoring. Travel is restricted to SC Related [+] and Pennsylvania (court purposes). Defendant must stay in compliance with state supervision. Defendant must appear in the charging district as instructed. Tape #Weber CourtSmart 3100. (awil, )
Related: [-] sides
7 7 TEXT ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Benjamin Thomas Stepp for Romaro Lanarie Foster, Sr. Entered by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 3/22/23.(awil, )
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Romaro Lanarie Foster Sr (1). Bond is set at $100,000 unsecured with stand alone GPS monitoring. Travel is restricted to SC Related [+] and Pennsylvania (court purposes). Defendant must stay in compliance with state supervision. Defendant must appear in the charging district as instructed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 3/22/23.(awil, )
Related: [-] sides
9 9 Unsecured Bond Entered as to Romaro Lanarie Foster, Sr in amount of $ 100,000. (awil, )
Related: [-]