Case Filed:Mar 22, 2023
Last checked: Friday Mar 24, 2023 3:23 AM EDT
Defendant
Bradley Charles Reckert, Jr. (1)
Represented By
S. Andrew Arnold
Arnold & Bailey, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Eleanor F. Hurney
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Mrt.
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/24/2023 4:00 AM EDT
Thursday, November 17, 2022
2 2 ** SEALED ** CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Bradley Reckert, Jr. Copy to FPD with Target letter per Standing Order. (cmd) [3:22-mj-00112-RWT]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 22, 2022
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING CJA PANEL ATTORNEY AS COUNSEL as to Bradley Reckert, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 11/22/2022. Copy to USP,USM, USA, FPD, mailed to dft. (cmd) [3:22-mj-00112-RWT]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
Case unsealed as to Bradley Reckert, Jr. (cwm) [3:22-mj-00112-RWT]
Related: [-]
4 4 INDICTMENT WITH FORFEITURE ALLEGATION as to Bradley Reckert, Jr. (1): count 1. (cwm)
Related: [-]
5 5 *SEALED* Indictment - Unredacted re:4 Indictment as to Bradley Charles Reckert, Jr. (1). (Attachment: #1 Grand Jury Docket Sheet) (cwm)
Related: [-]