Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Carlos E Mendoza
Referred: Robert M Norway
Case #: 6:23-cv-00551
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Case Filed:Mar 24, 2023
Re-opened:Jan 03, 2025
Terminated:Aug 08, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 20, 2023 9:11 AM EDT
Defendant
Astara Capital Partners Fund I, LP
1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Robert J. Stovash
Stovash, Case & Tingley, PA
contact info
Lars C. Golumbic
Groom Law Group, Chartered
contact info
Shaun A. Gates
Groom Law Group, Chartered
contact info
Tucker H. Byrd
Byrd Campbell, PA
contact info
Defendant
Howard Barton
6 Richmond Drive
New Smyrna Beach, FL 32169
Represented By
Tucker H. Byrd
Byrd Campbell, PA
contact info
Defendant
Charles Brinkley
3140 Porta Romano Way
Lake Mary, FL 32746
Represented By
Jillian Strasser
Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A.
contact info
Sanique J Balan
Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Diane Dello Russo
3101 Legacy View CV
Longwood, FL 32779
Represented By
Jillian Strasser
Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A.
contact info
Sanique J Balan
Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Donald Fortin
1052 Bloomsbury Run
Heathrow, FL 32746
Represented By
Jillian Strasser
Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A.
contact info
Sanique J Balan
Cole, Scott & Kissane, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
James Urbach
1690 Atlantic Beach
Atlantic Beach, FL 32233
Represented By
Jason Alec Zimmerman
Grayrobinson, PA
contact info
Richard J. Pearl
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Sophie Jane Chau
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Rick Pearl
Faegre Drinker
contact info
Plaintiff
Angel Buitrago
Tampa, FL 33602
Represented By
Marc Reed Edelman
Morgan & Morgan, PA
contact info
Carl F. Engstrom
Engstrom Lee
contact info
C. Ryan Morgan
Morgan & Morgan, PA
contact info
Mark Thomson
Engstrom Lee
contact info
James J. Henson
Morgan & Morgan, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Lynne Cassani
Tampa, FL 33602
Represented By
Marc Reed Edelman
Morgan & Morgan, PA
contact info
Carl F. Engstrom
Engstrom Lee
contact info
C. Ryan Morgan
Morgan & Morgan, PA
contact info
Mark Thomson
Engstrom Lee
contact info
James J. Henson
Morgan & Morgan, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Cynthia Medina
Tampa, FL 33602
Represented By
Marc Reed Edelman
Morgan & Morgan, PA
contact info
Carl F. Engstrom
Engstrom Lee
contact info
C. Ryan Morgan
Morgan & Morgan, PA
contact info
Mark Thomson
Engstrom Lee
contact info
James J. Henson
Morgan & Morgan, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Mize
Tampa, FL 33602
Represented By
Marc Reed Edelman
Morgan & Morgan, PA
contact info
Carl F. Engstrom
Engstrom Lee
contact info
C. Ryan Morgan
Morgan & Morgan, PA
contact info
Mark Thomson
Engstrom Lee
contact info
James J. Henson
Morgan & Morgan, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Julissa Ovalle
Represented By
Marc Reed Edelman
Morgan & Morgan, PA
contact info
Carl F. Engstrom
Engstrom Lee
contact info
C. Ryan Morgan
Morgan & Morgan, PA
contact info
Mark Thomson
Engstrom Lee
contact info
James J. Henson
Morgan & Morgan, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
95 95 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Wed 04/09 11:22 AM
ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 93 Partially Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs shall respond to Defendants' 80 81 82 83 84 Motions to Dismiss on or before May 12, 2025. The deadlines for filing Plaintiffs' opening brief, Defendants' brief, and Plaintiffs' reply brief are vacated. No other deadlines are modified. The Court will set a new briefing schedule, if necessary, after the Motions to Dismiss are adjudicated. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway on 4/9/2025. (MLS)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
94 94 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 04/04 11:14 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re93 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to81 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint & Incorporated Memorandum of Law ,83 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support ,84 MOTION t filed by Astara Capital Partners Fund I, LP, Del-Air Heating, Air Conditioning & Refrigeration, LLC, Tony Hartsgrove. (Golumbic, Lars)
Related: [-]
93 93 motion Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Fri 04/04 10:22 AM
PARTIALLY UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to81 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint & Incorporated Memorandum of Law ,83 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support ,84 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ,80 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint ,82 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint Partially Unopposed by Angel Buitrago, Thomas Cannetti, Lynne Cassani, Wiltron Diaz, Cynthia Medina, Michael Mize, Julissa Ovalle, Jerry Raymond, Angel Soto. (Lee, Jennifer) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway. Modified on 4/4/2025 to edit docket text (JDR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
92 92 motion Sealed Motion Wed 04/02 2:58 PM
SEALED MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint re 88 Sealed Order on Motion to Seal by Del-Air Heating, Air Conditioning & Refrigeration, LLC, Tony Hartsgrove (Stovash, Robert)
Related: [-]
91 91 motion Sealed Motion Wed 04/02 2:56 PM
SEALED MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint re 87 Sealed Order on Motion to Seal by Astara Capital Partners Fund I, LP (Stovash, Robert)
Related: [-]