Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Ada Brown
Case #: 3:20-cv-02121
Nature of Suit376 Other Statutes - Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a))
Cause31:3730 Qui Tam False Claims Act
Case Filed:Aug 10, 2020
Terminated:Mar 24, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Mar 26, 2023 3:18 AM CDT
Defendant
Ace Medical Services LLC
Defendant
Aprea Group LLC
Defendant
Argyle Fire District
Defendant
Bexar County Emergency Services District 7 Fire & Rescue
Defendant
Bulverde Spring Branch Emergency Services
Defendant
Calhoun County Emergency Medical Services
Defendant
City of Seabrook
Defendant
City of Atlanta
Defendant
City of Bedford
Defendant
City of Bellaire
Defendant
City of Big Spring
Defendant
City of Bonham
Defendant
City of Bowie
Defendant
City of Brady Fire & EMS Department
Defendant
City of Buda
Defendant
City of Bulverde
Defendant
City of Carrollton
Defendant
City of Celina
Defendant
City of Cleburne
Defendant
City of College Station
Defendant
City of Colleyville
Defendant
City of Coppell Fire Department
Defendant
City of Corinth
Defendant
City of Deer Park
Defendant
City of Denison
Defendant
City of Dickinson
Defendant
City of El Campo
Defendant
City of Everman
Defendant
City of Farmers Branch
Defendant
City of Freeport
Defendant
City of Georgetown
Defendant
City of Glenn Hights
Defendant
City of Grapevine
Defendant
City of Groveton
Defendant
City of Hamilton
Defendant
City of Highland Village
Defendant
City of Humble
Defendant
City of Keene
Defendant
City of Keller Fire Rescue
Defendant
City of Kennedale
Defendant
City of Krum
Defendant
City of Lancaster
Defendant
City of Leon Valley
Defendant
City of Mansfield EMS
Defendant
City of Marble Falls
Defendant
City of Marshall
Defendant
City of Mathis
Defendant
City of Mineral Wells
Defendant
City of Murphy
Defendant
City of Palmview
Defendant
City of Pilot Point
Defendant
City of Port Aransas
Defendant
City of Port Isabel
Defendant
City of Roanoke
Defendant
City of Rowlett
Defendant
City of Sachse
Defendant
City of San Augustine
Defendant
City of Sanger
Defendant
City of Sinton
Defendant
City of South Padre Island
Defendant
City of Southlake
Defendant
City of Spearman
Defendant
City of Stinnett
Defendant
City of Sugar Land
Defendant
City of The Colony
Defendant
City of University Park
Defendant
City of Van Alstyne
Defendant
City of Victoria
Defendant
City of Watauga
Defendant
City of Whitewright
Defendant
City of Wolfforth
Defendant
Comal County Emergency Services District 2
Defendant
Comanche County EMS
Defendant
County of Crockett
Defendant
County of Cooke
Defendant
County of Erath
Defendant
County of Hardeman
Defendant
Eastland Memoral Hospital District
Defendant
Emergicon LLC
Defendant
Friendswood Volunteer Fire Department
Defendant
Galveston County Emergency Services District #2
Defendant
Goliad County
Defendant
Grace Ambulance Transport LLC
Defendant
Granbury/Hood County EMS Inc
Defendant
Hardin County Emergency Services District #2
Defendant
Hays County Emergency Services District 8
Defendant
Hopkins County Hospital District
Defendant
Intercity Ambulance for Emergency Medical Transport LLC
Defendant
Jackson County Hospital District EMS
Defendant
Jacksonville Fire Department
Defendant
La Salle County
Defendant
Martin County Hopital District
Defendant
Nacogdoches County Hospital District
Defendant
Nueces County Emergency Services District #1
Defendant
Parker County Hospital District
Defendant
Pecos County EMS
Defendant
Republic EMS LTD
Defendant
Robertson County EMS Inc
Defendant
Sabine County Hospital District
Defendant
Sacred Cross EMS INC
Defendant
San Marcos Hays County Emergency Medical Services District #1
Defendant
Santa Fe Fire & Rescue Inc
Defendant
Somervell County
Defendant
Teague Hospital District
Defendant
Town of Addison
Defendant
Town of Fairview
Defendant
Town of Flower Mound
Defendant
Town of Little Elm
Defendant
Town of Pantego
Defendant
Town of Prosper
Defendant
Town of Sunnyvale
Defendant
Travis County Emergency Services District #1
Defendant
Tri Couty Emergency Medical Services Inc
Defendant
Christopher Turner
Defendant
Walker County
Defendant
Wise County
Plaintiff
Travis Autery
Represented By
Charles S Siegel
Waters & Kraus LLP
contact info
Taryn Elizabeth Ourso
Condon Tobin Sladek Thornton Nerenberg PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
The State of Texas
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Andrew Stricker Robbins-DOJ
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Kimberly R McCoy-DOJ
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, March 10, 2025
31 31 utility Mail Returned (Public Entry with Option to Restrict) Tue 03/11 12:40 PM
Mail returned as undeliverable.30 Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure, received back from Travis Autery as attempted - not known; unable to forward. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (axm) Modified text on 3/11/2025 (axm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
30 30 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure Thu 02/13 3:17 PM
Order of Dismissal: Relator has not filed any notice of appearance on or before Friday, December 6, 2024. Therefore the Court DISMISSES all of Relator's claims against Defendants WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (See ECF No. 26 at 4). This is a final judgment. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 2/13/2025) (ndt)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Thu 02/13 3:19 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:30. Thu Feb 13 15:19:18 CST 2025 (crt)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
29 29 utility Mail Returned (Public Entry) Tue 12/03 4:50 PM
Mail returned as undeliverable re:26 Order on Motion to Withdraw, received back from Travis Autery as Return to Sender Unable to Forward. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (ndt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
28 28 utility Mail Returned (Public Entry) Wed 11/27 12:57 PM
Mail returned as undeliverable.26 Order on Motion to Withdraw, received back from Travis Autery as Unclaimed. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (agc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
27 27 utility Mail Returned (Public Entry) Wed 11/13 4:23 PM
Mail returned as undeliverable.26 Order on Motion to Withdraw received back from Travis Autery as no postage. The current document has been re-mailed. (cfk)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Wed 11/13 4:31 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:26. via Certified Mail (#70223330000126922187 remailed to Arlington, Texas address) Wed Nov 13 16:31:28 CST 2024 (crt)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
26 26 5 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw Mon 10/21 2:03 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED THAT Charles Siegel and the firm Waters Kraus Paul & Siegel are hereby withdrawn from representation of relator, Travis Autery. (ECF No.25 ). IT IS ORDERED THAT Relator Autrey shall file a notice of appearance of counsel for Relator on or before Friday, 12/6/2024. Failure to file such notice of appearance of counsel for Relator on or before Friday, 12/6/2024 shall result in the dismissal of this proceeding without prejudice. IT IS ORDERED THAT in the interest of judicial economy and based upon the Court's discretion this case is hereby STAYED and ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED until 12/6/2024. 3. IT IS ORDERED THAT, apart from the filing discussed hereabove regarding Relator's counsel, the Parties shall not make filings into this proceeding except without express leave of Court. The Clerk shall transmit to the Parties a true copy of this order. The Clerk shall transmit this order to Relator Autrey by certified mail. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 10/21/2024) (kcr)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Mon 10/21 2:14 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:26. via Certified Mail (#70223330000126922262 sent to Arlington, Texas address and #70223330000126922279 sent to Wills Point, Texas address) Mon Oct 21 14:14:16 CDT 2024 (crt)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
25 25 motion Withdraw Fri 04/26 2:27 PM
Amended MOTION to Withdraw filed by Travis Autery (Siegel, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 2 1 pgs Exhibit(s) B,
Att: 3 66 pgs Exhibit(s) C,
Att: 4 1 pgs Proposed Order proposed ORDER
Thursday, February 01, 2024
24 24 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw Thu 02/01 4:21 PM
ORDER denying23 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Relator. The Court ORDERS Charles Siegel and the firm of Waters Kraus & Paul to attempt to contact the client at least four more times before filing an amended motion to withdraw. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 2/1/2024) (agc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 22, 2023
23 23 motion Withdraw Thu 06/22 7:42 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel for Relator filed by Travis Autery (Siegel, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration(s) Declaration of Caitlyn E. Silhan,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Friday, March 24, 2023
22 22 3 pgs order Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure Fri 03/24 4:47 PM
ORDER: The Amended Complaint in the above-referenced action shall be unsealed after the date of this Order and served upon Defendants by Relator. The Clerk is therefore instructed to submit a JS-6 form to the Administrative Office, thereby removing this case from the statistical records. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 3/24/2023) (oyh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 29, 2022
21 21 5 pgs Ex Parte Notice of Election to Decline Intervention filed by The State of Texas. (ygl)
Related: [-]
20 20 6 pgs Ex Parte Declination Notice filed by United States of America. (ygl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 10, 2022
16 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Ace Medical Services LLC, Aprea Group LLC, Argyle Fire District, Bexar County Emergency Services District 7 Fire & Rescue, Bulverde Spring Branch Emergency Services, Calhoun County Emergency Medical Services, City of Seabrook, City of Atlanta, City of Bedford, City of Bellaire, City of Big Spring, City of Bonham, City of Bowie, City of Brady Fire & EMS Department, City of Buda, City of Bulverde, City of Carrollton, City of Celina, City of Cleburne, City of College Station, City of Colleyville, City of Coppell Fire Department, City of Corinth, City of Deer Park, City of Denison, City of Dickinson, City of El Campo, City of Everman, City of Farmers Branch, City of Freeport, City of Georgetown, City of Glenn Hights, City of Grapevine, City of Groveton, City of Hamilton, City of Highland Village, City of Humble, City of Keene, City of Keller Fire Rescue, City of Kennedale, City of Krum, City of Lancaster, City of Leon Valley, City of Mansfield EMS, City of Marble Falls, City of Marshall, City of Mathis, City of Mineral Wells, City of Murphy, City of Palmview, City of Pilot Point, City of Port Aransas, City of Port Isabel, City of Roanoke, City of Rowlett, City of Sachse, City of San Augustine, City of Sanger, City of Sinton, City of South Padre Island, City of Southlake, City of Spearman, City of Stinnett, City of Sugar Land, City of The Colony, City of University Park, City of Van Alstyne, City of Victoria, City of Watauga, City of Whitewright, City of Wolfforth, Comal County Emergency Services District 2, Comanche County EMS, County of Crockett, County of Cooke, County of Erath, County of Hardeman, Eastland Memoral Hospital District, Emergicon LLC, Friendswood Volunteer Fire Department, Galveston County Emergency Services District #2, Goliad County, Grace Ambulance Transport LLC, Granbury/Hood County EMS Inc, Hardin County Emergency Services District #2, Hays County Emergency Services District 8, Hopkins County Hospital District, Intercity Ambulance for Emergency Medical Transport LLC, Jackson County Hospital District EMS, Jacksonville Fire Department, La Salle County, Martin County Hopital District, Nacogdoches County Hospital District, Nueces County Emergency Services District #1, Parker County Hospital District, Pecos County EMS, Republic EMS LTD, Robertson County EMS Inc, Sabine County Hospital District, Sacred Cross EMS INC, San Marcos Hays County Emergency Medical Services District #1, Santa Fe Fire & Rescue Inc, Somervell County, Teague Hospital District, The State of Texas, Town of Addison, Town of Fairview, Town of Flower Mound, Town of Little Elm, Town of Pantego, Town of Prosper, Town of Sunnyvale, Travis County Emergency Services District #1, Tri Couty Emergency Medical Services Inc, Christopher Turner, United States of America, Walker County, Wise County filed by Travis Autery. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (ygl)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 21, 2022
15 15 Ex Parte Notice of Substitution of Counsel by AUSA. Andrew Stricker Robbins-DOJ for United States of America added, Kimberly R McCoy-DOJ terminated. (ygl)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 12, 2021
11 11 ORDER granting10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Counsel Taryn E. Ourso is terminated as counsel of record for Plaintiff-Relator Travis Autery in this action. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 4/12/2021) (ykp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 08, 2021
10 10 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff-Relator filed by Travis Autery (ykp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, August 13, 2020
3 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Travis Autery. (oyh)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 10, 2020
2 2 43 pgs COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Ace Medical Services LLC, Aprea Group LLC, Argyle Fire District, Bexar County Emergency Services District 7 Fire & Rescue, Bulverde Spring Branch Emergency Services, Calhoun County Emergency Medical Services, City of Seabrook, City of Atlanta, City of Bedford, City of Bellaire, City of Big Spring, City of Bonham, City of Bowie, City of Brady Fire & EMS Department, City of Buda, City of Bulverde, City of Carrollton, City of Celina, City of Cleburne, City of College Station, City of Colleyville, City of Coppell Fire Department, City of Corinth, City of Deer Park, City of Denison, City of Dickinson, City of El Campo, City of Everman, City of Farmers Branch, City of Freeport, City of Georgetown, City of Glenn Hights, City of Grapevine, City of Groveton, City of Hamilton, City of Highland Village, City of Humble, City of Keene, City of Keller Fire Rescue, City of Kennedale, City of Krum, City of Lancaster, City of Leon Valley, City of Mansfield EMS, City of Marble Falls, City of Marshall, City of Mathis, City of Mineral Wells, City of Murphy, City of Palmview, City of Pilot Point, City of Port Aransas, City of Port Isabel, City of Roanoke, City of Rowlett, City of Sachse, City of San Augustine, City of Sanger, City of Sinton, City of South Padre Island, City of Southlake, City of Spearman, City of Stinnett, City of Sugar Land, City of The Colony, City of University Park, City of Van Alstyne, City of Victoria, City of Watauga, City of Whitewright, City of Wolfforth, Comal County Emergency Services District 2, Comanche County EMS, County of Crockett, County of Cooke, County of Erath, County of Hardeman, Eastland Memoral Hospital District, Emergicon LLC, Friendswood Volunteer Fire Department, Galveston County Emergency Services District #2, Goliad County, Grace Ambulance Transport LLC, Granbury/Hood County EMS Inc, Hardin County Emergency Services District #2, Hays County Emergency Services District 8, Hopkins County Hospital District, Intercity Ambulance for Emergency Medical Transport LLC, Jackson County Hospital District EMS, Jacksonville Fire Department, La Salle County, Martin County Hopital District, Nacogdoches County Hospital District, Nueces County Emergency Services District #1, Parker County Hospital District, Pecos County EMS, Republic EMS LTD, Robertson County EMS Inc, Sabine County Hospital District, Sacred Cross EMS INC, San Marcos Hays County Emergency Medical Services District #1, Santa Fe Fire & Rescue Inc, Somervell County, Teague Hospital District, Town of Addison, Town of Fairview, Town of Flower Mound, Town of Little Elm, Town of Pantego, Town of Prosper, Town of Sunnyvale, Travis County Emergency Services District #1, Tri Couty Emergency Medical Services Inc, Christopher Turner, Walker County, Wise County filed by Travis Autery. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number DC125840) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (oyh)
Related: [-]
1 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh)
Related: [-]