Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Case #: 5:23-cr-00122
Case Filed:Mar 22, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Mar 25, 2023 3:18 AM EDT
Defendant
CHRISTOPHER SCHWEIKERT (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
SHERRI A. STEPHAN
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/25/2023 4:47 AM EDT
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
1 1 INDICTMENT as to CHRISTOPHER SCHWEIKERT (1) count(s) 1-7, 8, 9. (mac) (mac).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Designation Form
Att: 2 (3/23/2023) INDICTMENT,
Att: 3 (3/23/2023) INFO SHEET
2 2 MOTION AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF BENCH WARRANT AS TO CHRISTOPHER SCHWEIKERT. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS on 3/22/23.3/23/23 Entered and Copies E-Mailed. (mac)
Related: [-]