Tennessee Eastern District Court
Case #: 3:23-mj-02056
Case Filed:Feb 24, 2023
Terminated:Feb 28, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Mar 26, 2023 3:30 AM EDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Russ Swafford
Doj-Usao
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Eric Bradford (4)
Terminated: 02/28/2023
Represented By
Kimberly A Parton
Law Office Of Kimberly A Parton
contact info
Defendant
Kenneth Briggs (1)
Terminated: 02/28/2023
Represented By
Stephen G McGrath
Stephen G. Mcgrath
contact info
Defendant
Paul Briggs (2)
Terminated: 02/28/2023
Represented By
Russell T Greene
Russell T. Greene, Attorney At Law
contact info
Defendant
Ricardo Briggs (3)
Terminated: 02/28/2023
Represented By
Nakeisha C Jackson
Federal Defender Services Of Eastern Tennessee, Inc. (knox)
contact info
Defendant
Sylvester Neal, III (5)
Terminated: 02/28/2023
Represented By
Forrest L Wallace
Law Office Of Forrest Wallace
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/02/2024 7:47 PM EDT
Friday, February 24, 2023
Arrest Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook in case as to Kenneth Briggs, Paul Briggs, Ricardo Briggs, Eric Bradford, Sylvester Neal, III. (JAN)
Related: [-]
1 1 MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to Kenneth Briggs, Paul Briggs, Ricardo Briggs, Eric Bradford, Sylvester Neal, III. (JAN)
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER granting 1 Motion to Seal Case as to Kenneth Briggs (1), Paul Briggs (2), Ricardo Briggs (3), Eric Bradford (4), Sylvester Neal III (5). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on February 24, 2023. (JAN)
Related: [-]
3 3 SEALED COMPLAINT as to Kenneth Briggs (1), Paul Briggs (2), Ricardo Briggs (3), Eric Bradford (4), Sylvester Neal, III (5).(JAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook: Initial Appearance on Complaint as to Kenneth Briggs, Paul Briggs, and Ricardo Briggs held on 2/27/2023. Detention Hearing set for 3/7/2023 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 3A - Knoxville, before Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook for Defendants Ricardo Briggs and Paul Briggs. Preliminary Hearing set for 3/7/2023 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 3A - Knoxville, before Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook as to all three defendants. (Court Reporter DCR)Defendants remanded to custody. (RLK) (Main Document 4 replaced on 2/27/2023) (RLK).
Related: [-]
5 5 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Kenneth Briggs. Approved by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on February 24, 2023. (RLK)
Related: [-]
6 6 CJA 20 as to Kenneth Briggs: Appointment of Attorney Stephen McGrath. ( Updated CJA Information should be obtained by accessing the CJA Panel Information Section of the ED/TN web site located at http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/cja ) Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on February 24, 2023. (RLK) Modified on 2/27/2023 (RLK).
Related: [-]
7 7 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Paul Briggs. Approved by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on February 24, 2023. (RLK)
Related: [-]
8 8 CJA 20 as to Paul Briggs: Appointment of Attorney Russell Greene. ( Updated CJA Information should be obtained by accessing the CJA Panel Information Section of the ED/TN web site located at http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/cja ) Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on February 24, 2023. (RLK)
Related: [-]
9 9 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Ricardo Briggs. Approved by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on February 24, 2023. (RLK)
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL DEFENDER as to Ricardo Briggs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on February 24, 2023. (RLK)
Related: [-]
11 11 WAIVER of Detention Hearing by Kenneth Briggs (RLK)
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Kenneth Briggs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on February 24, 2023. (RLK)
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING DETENTION HEARING as to Paul Briggs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on February 24, 2023. (RLK)
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING DETENTION HEARING as to Ricardo Briggs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on February 24, 2023. (RLK)
Related: [-]
15 15 DUE PROCESS PROTECTIONS ACT ORDER as to Kenneth Briggs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on February 24, 2023. (RLK)
Related: [-]
16 16 DUE PROCESS PROTECTIONS ACT ORDER as to Paul Briggs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on February 24, 2023. (RLK)
Related: [-]
17 17 DUE PROCESS PROTECTIONS ACT ORDER as to Ricardo Briggs Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on February 24, 2023. (RLK)
Related: [-]
18 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook: Initial Appearance on Complaint as to Eric Bradford and Sylvester Neal, III held on 2/24/2023. Detention Hearing set for 3/7/2023 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 3A - Knoxville, before Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook for Defendant Sylvester Neal. Preliminary Hearing for both defendants set for 3/7/2023 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 3A - Knoxville, before Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook. (Court Reporter DCR)Defendant remanded to custody. (RLK)
Related: [-]
19 19 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Eric Bradford. Approved by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on February 24, 2023. (RLK)
Related: [-]
20 20 CJA 20 as to Eric Bradford: Appointment of Attorney Kimberly Parton. ( Updated CJA Information should be obtained by accessing the CJA Panel Information Section of the ED/TN web site located at http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/cja ) Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on February 24, 2023. (RLK)
Related: [-]
21 21 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Sylvester Neal, III. Approved by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on February 24, 2023. (RLK)
Related: [-]
22 22 CJA 20 as to Sylvester Neal, III: Appointment of Attorney Forrest Wallace. ( Updated CJA Information should be obtained by accessing the CJA Panel Information Section of the ED/TN web site located at http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/cja ) Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on February 24, 2023. (RLK)
Related: [-]
23 23 WAIVER of Detention Hearing by Eric Bradford (RLK)
Related: [-]
24 24 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Eric Bradford. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on February 24, 2023. (RLK)
Related: [-]
25 25 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING DETENTION HEARING as to Sylvester Neal, III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on February 24, 2023. (RLK)
Related: [-]
26 26 DUE PROCESS PROTECTIONS ACT ORDER as to Eric Bradford. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on February 24, 2023. (RLK)
Related: [-]
27 27 DUE PROCESS PROTECTIONS ACT ORDER as to Sylvester Neal, III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill E McCook on February 24, 2023. (RLK)
Related: [-]