City of St. Louis v. Kia America, Inc. et al
Missouri Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Ronnie L White |
Case #: | 4:23-cv-00379 |
Nature of Suit | 355 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 27, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jun 27, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 23, 2023 10:57 AM CDT |
Defendant
Hyundai Motor America, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Kia America, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
City of St. Louis
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, June 29, 2023 | ||
misc
Remark
Thu 06/29 3:07 PM
***REMARK: Case transferred from Missouri Eastern has been opened in Central District of California as case 8:23-cv-01150, filed 06/27/2023. (JWD) |
||
Tuesday, June 27, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
![]() ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Central District of California. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. Signed by Tiffaney D. Pete on 6/27/23. (JWD) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
![]() ORDER LIFTING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-8) regarding MDL 3052 by Clerk of the Panel. Signed by Tiffaney D. Pete on 6/12/23. (JWD) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
![]() ENTRY of Appearance by James Russell Jackson for Plaintiff City of St. Louis. (Jackson, James) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
![]() MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney re attorney/firm Gabriel Gore by Plaintiff City of St. Louis. (Gore, Gabriel) |
|
order
A Docket Text Order
Wed 05/24 4:32 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:9 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney re attorney/firm Gabriel Gore by Plaintiff City of St. Louis (Gore, Gabriel); ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on May 24, 2023. (JAU) |
||
Monday, April 24, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by City of St. Louis Kia America, Inc. waiver signed on 4/17/2023, answer due 6/16/2023. (Dowd, Edward) |
|
7 | 7
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by City of St. Louis Hyundai Motor America, Inc. waiver signed on 4/17/2023, answer due 6/16/2023. (Dowd, Edward) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
![]() ENTRY of Appearance by Gabriel E. Gore for Plaintiff City of St. Louis. (Gore, Gabriel) |
|
5 | 5
![]() ENTRY of Appearance by Rebecca McLaughlin for Plaintiff City of St. Louis. (McLaughlin, Rebecca) |
|
4 | 4
![]() DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff City of St. Louis. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Dowd, Edward) |
|
3 | 3
![]() NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff City of St. Louis Process Server: HPS Process Service Investigations (JBH) |
|
2 | 2
![]() NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff City of St. Louis Process Server: HPS Process Service Investigations (JBH) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against defendant Hyundai Motor America, Inc., Kia America with receipt number AMOEDC-9859372, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by City of St. Louis.(Dowd, Edward) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
misc
Case Opening Notification
Mon 03/27 1:06 PM
Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Ronnie L. White. 2 Summons(es) issued and emailed to Edward L. Dowd, Jr.. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible.[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (JBH) |