116
|
|
116
misc
Notice of Filing Transcript
Mon 01/08 5:53 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERNECE proceeding held on 12/7/2023 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
Related: [-]
|
115
|
|
115
misc
Transcript
Mon 01/08 5:50 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERNECE held on 12/7/2023 before Judge Edgardo Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Paula Horovitz, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/29/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/8/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/8/2024..(McGuirk, Kelly)
Related: [-]
|
114
|
|
114
misc
Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 01/05 11:22 AM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Daiichi Sankyo Europe GmbH and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Esperion Therapeutics, Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Snyder, Orin)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 01/05 9:30 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Orin Snyder. RE-FILE Document No. 113 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the stipulation of voluntary dismissal was not signed (ink signatures) by all parties who have appeared;. Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed (scanned signature image) PDF. (nd)
Related: [-]
|
113
|
|
113
2
pgs
misc
Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 01/04 11:03 AM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Daiichi Sankyo Europe GmbH and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Esperion Therapeutics, Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Snyder, Orin)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 01/04 9:26 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Orin Snyder. RE-FILE Document No. 112 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the stipulation of voluntary dismissal was not signed (ink signatures) by all parties who have appeared;. Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed (scanned signature image) PDF. (nd)
Related: [-]
|
112
|
|
112
misc
Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 01/03 4:32 PM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - SIGNATURE ERROR - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Daiichi Sankyo Europe GmbH and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Esperion Therapeutics, Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Snyder, Orin) Modified on 1/4/2024 (nd).
Related: [-]
|