Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-10001

Maryland Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Nancy V Alquist
Case #: 1:23-ap-00080
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Mar 24, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Troy Capital, LLC
Protas, Spivok, & Collins, LLC 4330 East West Hwy., #900
Bethesda, MD 20814
Represented By
Troy Capital, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Heather K. Jones
4003 Lyndale Avenue
Baltimore, MD 21213
Represented By
James R. Logan
James R. Logan P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Wednesday, June 07, 2023
court Close Adversary Case Wed 06/07 1:17 PM
Adversary Case 1:23-ap-80 Closed. (Walston, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
5 5 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 06/06 10:29 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Heather K. Jones. (Logan, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 29, 2023
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - AP (Auto-Docket) Thu 03/30 12:23 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/29/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Tuesday, March 28, 2023
3 3 apmisc Certificate of Service Tue 03/28 4:33 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons Filed by James R. Logan Related [+]. (Logan, James)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Heather K. Jones
Monday, March 27, 2023
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 03/27 4:49 PM
Summons Issued on Troy Capital, LLC Date Issued 3/27/2023, Answer Due 4/26/2023 Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 6/7/2023 at 02:00 PM by videoconference or teleconference. For hearing access information see www.mdb.uscourts.gov/hearings or call 410-962-2688. (Walston, Daniel)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Heather K. Jones
Friday, March 24, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint (Case Opening) Fri 03/24 1:23 PM
Adversary case 23-00080 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by James R. Logan on behalf of Heather K. Jones against Troy Capital, LLC. The filing fee is EXEMPT - Plaintiff is the debtor in the Bankruptcy case. (Logan, James)
Related: [-]