Illinois Central District Court
Judge:Sara Darrow
Referred: Jonathan E Hawley
Case #: 4:23-cv-04048
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 27, 2023
Terminated:Sep 22, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Sep 23, 2023 11:00 AM CDT
Defendant
Cook County Public Defender
Defendant
Timothy Evans
Defendant
Kerry Kennedy
Defendant
Kathaleen Lanahan
Defendant
Sharone Mitchell, Jr.
Defendant
Maria Munoz
Defendant
Office of Presiding Judge
Defendant
Unidentified Presiding Judge Staff
Defendant
Angela Unknown
Defendant
Nader Zugayer
Plaintiff
Kevin Keeler
5840 W. 104th St Unit 315
Oak Lawn, IL 60453


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, September 22, 2023
order Order Fri 09/22 9:24 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on September 22, 2023. Pro se Plaintiff Keeler filed a5 Status Report indicating he wishes to voluntarily dismiss this case. Plaintiff requests the Court "voluntarily dismiss the instant case in its entirety without any conditions and to request agreement of the parties and so stipulate that any civil matters between the parties although encountering substantial rough terrain, do not after all rise to a level requiring the litigation of a federal case."5 para 18. No other party has filed an appearance in this matter nor has any party served an answer or motion for summary judgment, so the requested stipulation is unnecessary. Therefore, the Court construes the5 Status Report as a notice of voluntary dismissal. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). The Clerk is directed to close the case. (KJC)
Related: [-]
misc Remark Fri 09/22 11:47 AM
Remark: Case closed pursuant to Text Order entered on 9/22/2023. (RES)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
5 5 misc Status Report Thu 09/21 1:19 PM
STATUS REPORT TO THE COURT AS PER DIRECTION OF CHIEF JUDGE SARA DARROW by Kevin Keeler. (TC)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 01, 2023
utility Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 09/01 8:47 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 9/15/2023. (ED)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 31, 2023
misc Mail Returned Thu 08/31 11:08 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable: 8/21/2023 Text Order sent to Kevin Keeler. (JJK)
Related: [-]
order Order Thu 08/31 4:28 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on August 31, 2023. On August 21, 2023, the Court directed pro se Plaintiff Kevin John Keeler to provide a status update by September 1, 2023. See Aug. 21, 2023 Text Order. The Text Order was conventionally mailed to Plaintiff but returned as undeliverable due to an improper address. See Aug. 31, 2023 Not. Mail Returned Undeliverable. The Court sua sponte extends Plaintiff's deadline to September 15, 2023. Failure to meet this new deadline may result in dismissal of Plaintiff's case. (KJC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 22, 2023
utility Set/Reset Deadlines (including Answer ddl) Tue 08/22 9:58 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 9/1/2023. See Text Order entered on 8/21/2023. (RES)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 21, 2023
order Order Mon 08/21 9:37 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on August 21, 2023. Pro se Plaintiff Keeler was previously directed to provide the Court with an update on the status of his state proceedings by June 19, 2023. See4 Apr. 19, 2023 Order 10. He neither updated the Court nor provided explanation for his failure to meet that deadline. The Court sua sponte extends Plaintiff's deadline to September 1, 2023. Failure to meet this new deadline may result in dismissal of Plaintiff's case. See Krivak v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., 2 F.4th 601, 606 (7th Cir. 2021) ("Disregarding court orders and deadlines is a risky course...."). (MLM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 20, 2023
utility Set/Reset Deadlines (including Answer ddl) Thu 04/20 11:00 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 6/19/2023. (RES)
Related: [-]
utility Case Stayed Thu 04/20 11:26 AM
Case Stayed pursuant to4 Order. (RES)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 19, 2023
4 4 10 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 04/19 3:53 PM
ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on April 19, 2023. Plaintiff Kevin John Keeler's2 petition to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. His1 complaint is DISMISSED IN PART. The request for injunctive relief is DISMISSED. The remainder of the case is STAYED pending resolution of Keeler's state case. The outcome of Keeler's state case may affect the viability of his claims in this case. See Heck v. Humphrey, 512 U.S. 477, 486-87 (1994) (precluding actions for money damages where doing so would necessarily imply the invalidity of an underlying conviction). Therefore, once the stay is lifted, the Court will conduct another merit review of the complaint. Keeler is DIRECTED to provide the Court with an update on the status of his state proceedings every 60 days. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this case. Keeler's first status report is due June 19, 2023. (AV)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 31, 2023
3 3 notice Notice of Change of Address Fri 03/31 1:49 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Kevin Keeler (RES)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 27, 2023
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 03/27 3:04 PM
PETITION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Kevin Keeler. Responses due by 4/10/2023 (JRK)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/27 2:54 PM
COMPLAINT against Cook County Public Defender, Timothy Evans, Kerry Kennedy, Kathaleen Lanahan, Sharone Mitchell, Jr, Maria Munoz, Office of Presiding Judge, Unidentified Presiding Judge Staff, Angela Unknown, Nader Zugayer, filed by Kevin Keeler.(JRK)
Related: [-]