California Northern District Court
Judge:Richard Seeborg
Referred: Peter H Kang
Case #: 3:23-cv-01428
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Mar 27, 2023
Terminated:Apr 11, 2024
Case in other court:Superior Court of Alameda, 23CV028120
Last checked: Saturday Sep 23, 2023 7:18 AM PDT
Defendant
DOES 1 through 20, inclusive
Represented By
Salvador P Simao
Constangy, Brooks, Smith & Prophete, Llp.
contact info
Defendant
Walmart, Inc.
Represented By
David Alan Yudelson
Constangy, Brooks, Smith, Prophete LLP
contact info
Salvador P Simao
Constangy, Brooks, Smith & Prophete, Llp.
contact info
Nicole Espin
Constangy, Brooks, Smith & Prophete, Llp.
contact info
Plaintiff
Karla Patten
Represented By
Nathalie Meza Contreras
Mosley & Associates
contact info
Walter Mosley
Mosley And Associates
contact info
Carlos E Montoya
Walter & Associates
contact info

GPO Mar 18 2024
STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 4/18/2024 at 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 4/11/2024. Signed by Chief Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/18/2024. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2024)
GPO Apr 11 2024
STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 23 OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/11/2024. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2024)

Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, April 11, 2024
24 24 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Terminate Civil Case Thu 04/11 6:16 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 23 OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/11/2024. (cl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 04/11 4:14 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Walmart, Inc.. (Simao, Salvador)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
22 22 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 03/18 2:41 PM
STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 4/18/2024 at 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 4/11/2024. Signed by Chief Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/18/2024. (cl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
21 21 notice Notice (Other) Fri 03/15 4:43 PM
NOTICE by Karla Patten OF SETTLEMENT(Mosley, Walter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
Monday, August 28, 2023
20 20 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Mon 08/28 3:42 PM
ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg GRANTING 19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Salvador P. Simao. (jlg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Pro Hac Vice Mon 08/28 8:42 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $317, receipt number ACANDC-18589234) filed by DOES 1 through 20, inclusive, Walmart, Inc.(Simao, Salvador)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing
Friday, August 11, 2023
18 18 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Fri 08/11 1:14 PM
ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg Granting 17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Nicole D. Espin. (cl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 08/11 11:11 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18537636.) filed by WALMART, INC..(Espin, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
16 16 order Order Tue 08/01 1:49 PM
[IN-CHAMBERS] TEXT ONLY ORDER: This case has been referred to Judge Kang in connection with all further discovery matters as referenced in Judge Seeborg's Case Management Scheduling Order. [Dkt. 14]. Accordingly, the Parties shall review and be familiar with Judge Kang's Standing Order for Discovery, which is now applicable to this matter, which is available on the Court's website. Signed by Judge Peter H. Kang on 08/01/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (phklc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 27, 2023
15 15 utility Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Discovery Thu 07/27 3:09 PM
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang for Discovery. (ejk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
14 14 3 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Discovery Order Referring Case to Private ADR ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 07/27 12:00 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/18/2024 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Case Management Statement due by 4/11/2024. Jury Selection/Trial set for 10/7/2024 at 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Pretrial Conference set for 9/25/2024 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Signed by Chief Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/27/2023. (cl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
13 13 minutes Case Management Conference - Initial Thu 07/27 10:56 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard Seeborg: Initial Case Management Conference held via Zoom on 7/27/2023. Court to issue Case Management Scheduling Order. Total Time in Court: 6 minutes. Court Reporter: Not Reported or Recorded. Plaintiff Attorney: Carlos Montoya. Defendant Attorney: David Yudelson. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/27/2023)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Private ADR Thu 07/27 12:08 PM
CASE REFERRED to Private ADR. (cmf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 24, 2023
12 12 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Mon 07/24 10:05 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY ZOOM. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/27/2023 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/rs] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at rscrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than July 26, 2023 at 12:00 pm. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) .(cl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 13, 2023
11 11 misc Case Management Statement Thu 07/13 2:35 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and [Proposed] Order filed by KARLA PATTEN. (Montoya, Carlos)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 06, 2023
10 10 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Thu 07/06 3:36 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 7/20/2023. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 7/13/2023 is continued to 7/27/2023 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 08, 2023
9 9 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Thu 06/08 12:59 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options(Montoya, Carlos)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
Monday, April 24, 2023
8 8 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Mon 04/24 8:36 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/13/2023 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 7/6/2023. All parties shall appear by videoconference using log-in instructions the Court will provide in advance. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 21, 2023
7 7 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 04/21 12:41 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 4/21/2023. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Fri 04/21 11:11 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (tshlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 19, 2023
5 5 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 04/19 3:29 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by WALMART, INC... (Yudelson, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 28, 2023
4 4 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Tue 03/28 1:05 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See [LINK:General Order 71] . Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 6/22/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/29/2023 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 27, 2023
3 3 service Certificate/Proof of Service Mon 03/27 4:26 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by WALMART, INC. re1 Notice of Removal, (Yudelson, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Mon 03/27 3:32 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/10/2023. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Notice of Removal Mon 03/27 3:10 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of Alameda. Their case number is 23CV028120. (Filing fee $402 receipt number BCANDC-18111936). Filed byWALMART, INC..(Yudelson, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 72 pgs Declaration David A. Yudelson,
Att: 3 Declaration Katherine May,
Att: 4 Disclosure Statement