Florida Southern District Court
Case #: 1:23-cr-20138
Case Filed:Mar 27, 2023
Terminated:Mar 01, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 28, 2023 3:18 AM EDT
Defendant
Diana Fletcher (1)
Represented By
Todd C Yoder
Markus/moss PLLC
contact info
Robert Feitel
Law Office Of Robert Feitel, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Michael C. Olmsted
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Yara Dodin
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/09/2024 8:23 PM EST
Thursday, February 23, 2023
1 1 MOTION to Seal by USA as to Diana Fletcher. (br) Modified on 2/24/2023 (br). [1:23-mj-02365-AOR]
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs ORDER granting1 Motion to Seal as to Diana Fletcher (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 2/23/2023. See attached document for full details. (br) [1:23-mj-02365-AOR]
Related: [-]
3 3 17 pgs COMPLAINT as to Diana Fletcher (1). (br) [1:23-mj-02365-AOR]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 03, 2023
5 5 MOTION to UNSEAL COMPLAINT by USA as to Diana Fletcher. (kan) [1:23-mj-02365-AOR]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER granting5 Motion to UNSEAL COMPLAINT as to Diana Fletcher (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis on 3/3/2023. See attached document for full details. (kan) [1:23-mj-02365-AOR]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 09, 2023
Attorney update in case as to Diana Fletcher. Attorney Robert Feitel for Diana Fletcher added (pt) [1:23-mj-02365-AOR]
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Todd C Yoder appearing for Diana Fletcher . Attorney Todd C Yoder added to party Diana Fletcher(pty:dft). (Yoder, Todd) [1:23-mj-02365-AOR]
Related: [-]
8 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Robert Feitel. Filing Fee $ 200.00. Receipt # AFLSDC-16412119 by Diana Fletcher. Responses due by 3/23/2023(Yoder, Todd) [1:23-mj-02365-AOR]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Cert. of Good Standing
Friday, March 10, 2023
SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 9 restricted/sealed until further notice. (amb) [1:23-mj-02365-AOR]
Related: [-]
SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 10 restricted/sealed until further notice. (amb) [1:23-mj-02365-AOR]
Related: [-]
SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 11 restricted/sealed until further notice. (sl) [1:23-mj-02365-AOR]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 13, 2023
12 12 PAPERLESS ORDER Granting8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Robert Feitel as to Diana Fletcher (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 3/13/2023. (sl) [1:23-mj-02365-AOR]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
13 13 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION in case as to Diana Fletcher 10 SEALED MOTION FOR PRETRIAL RELEASE UPON CONDITIONS : Status Conference re: Motion Hearing set for 3/16/2023 02:00 PM in Miami Division before MIA Duty Magistrate Judge. (kan) [1:23-mj-02365-AOR]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2023
14 14 Minute Order for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Eduardo I Sanchez: Status Conference re: Sealed Motion Hearing as to Diana Fletcher held on 3/16/2023. Defendant not present. Motion to be addressed when Defendant makes an Initial Appearance in this District. (Digital 14:40:02) Signed by US Magistrate Judge Eduardo I Sanchez on 3/16/2023. (aw) Modified on 3/17/2023 (aw). [1:23-mj-02365-AOR]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 15 restricted/sealed until further notice. (amb) [1:23-mj-02365-AOR]
Related: [-]
SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 16 restricted/sealed until further notice. (amb) [1:23-mj-02365-AOR]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 23, 2023
17 17 PAPERLESS ORDER as to Diana Fletcher re 16 SEALED MOTION DEFENDANT DIANA FLETCHER'S MOTION TO WAIVE HER APPEARANCE AT BOND HEARING. The Undersigned strikes Defendant's under-seal motion because it violates the Local Rules by not including a pre-filing conferral certificate. The motion is not designated as a joint or unopposed motion and the lack of the required certificate means that the Court does not know the United States' position on the motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 3/23/2022. (JG) [1:23-mj-02365-AOR]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 24, 2023
SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 18 restricted/sealed until further notice. (sl) [1:23-mj-02365-AOR]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 27, 2023
19 19 5 pgs INFORMATION as to Diana Fletcher (1) count 1 and Forfeiture. (jbs) Modified text on 3/29/2023 (jbs).
Related: [-]