Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Solomon Oliver, Jr
Case #: 1:14-cv-02268
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Case Filed:Oct 10, 2014
Terminated:Aug 15, 2017
Last checked: Monday May 11, 2015 2:23 AM EDT
Defendant
Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.
N56 W17000 Ridgewood Drive
Menomonee Falls, WI 53051
Represented By
Lisa B. Forbes
Vorys, Sater, Seymour & Pease - Cleveland
contact info
Heather M. Lutz
Vorys, Sater, Seymour & Pease - Cleveland
contact info
Plaintiff
Susan Gentille
4912 Ritter Road
Bellville, OH 44813
Represented By
Caryn M. Groedel
Law Office Of Caryn M. Groedel
contact info
Chastity L. Christy
Law Office Of Caryn M. Groedel
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
William Schutte
Terminated: 03/12/2015
8125 Thackeray Ct.
Broadview Heights, OH 44147
Represented By
Lisa B. Forbes
Vorys, Sater, Seymour & Pease - Cleveland
contact info
Heather M. Lutz
Vorys, Sater, Seymour & Pease - Cleveland
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, August 15, 2017
99 99 order Order Dismissing Case Tue 08/15 4:53 PM
Stipulation and Order of Case Dismissal with prejudice. Related document98 . Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 8/15/2017. (R,Sh)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2017
98 98 notice Notice of Dismissal Mon 08/14 4:47 PM
Stipulated Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) (A)(ii) filed by Susan Gentille. (Groedel, Caryn)
Related: [-]