Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Hope T Cannon
Case #: 3:23-cv-06779
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Mar 28, 2023
Case in other court:California Central, 8:22-cv-02326
Last checked: Friday Oct 13, 2023 10:30 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Plaintiff
CHRISTIAN BAKER
Represented By
JOSEPH PAUL BAKHOS
Law Office Of Joseph Bakhos - Santa Ana Ca
contact info
Joseph Bakhos
Law Office Of Joseph Bakhos
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Terminated: 02/21/2023
Defendant
DOES
Terminated: 04/17/2023


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 17, 2023
26 26 cmp Refiled Short Form Complaint - MDL cases only Mon 04/17 1:26 PM
AMENDED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, 3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC filed by CHRISTIAN BAKER. (BAKHOS, JOSEPH) Modified on 4/17/2023 to correct civil event "Amended Complaint." (djb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 28, 2023
25 25 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 03/28 9:14 AM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 17 ORDER GOVERNING ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT AND SHORT FORM COMPLAINT FOR FILED CASES. Any Plaintiff whose case becomes part of this MDL after the date of this Order, either by a direct filing and assignment to this Court (if permitted by subsequent order of the Court) or by transfer from another district or from another judge in this district, must file a Short Form Complaint within 20 days from the date of transfer or, if originally filed in this district, assignment to this Court. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/16/2019. (Amended (Short Form) Complaint due by 4/17/2023 .) (djb)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Tue 03/28 9:10 AM
NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION as to Attorney of Record, Joseph Bakhos. (djb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice Regarding Electronic Filing Requirement
23 23 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Tue 03/28 9:07 AM
Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 8:22-cv-02326. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Monday, March 27, 2023
22 22 Conditional Transfer Order - 193 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2885, transferring case to USDC, Northern District of Florida and assigned to Honorable M. Casey Rodgers. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (es) [Transferred from California Central on 3/28/2023.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 09, 2023
21 21 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DEEMING MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT13 AND MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE AS WITHDRAWN16 AND GRANTING MOTION TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT20 by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Accordingly, the pending motion for default judgment, (Dkt. 13), and motion to transfer venue, (Dkt. 16), are deemed WITHDRAWN, and the hearing dates for the motions scheduled for March 13, 2023, are VACATED. Plaintiffs motion to set aside the entry of default against Defendant 3M Company, (Dkt. 20), is GRANTED, and the Clerks entry of default against 3M, (Dkt. 11), is accordingly VACATED. (see document for further information) (bm) [Transferred from California Central on 3/28/2023.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
20 20 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Set Aside Default Re: Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form11 . filed by plaintiff Christian Baker. Motion set for hearing on 3/13/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Bakhos, Joseph) [Transferred from California Central on 3/28/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Plaintiffs Counsel Joseph Bakhos,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 21, 2023
19 19 ORDER15 by Judge Cormac J. Carney: It is Ordered and Adjudged that AEARO TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, is dismissed without prejudice. (bm) [Transferred from California Central on 3/28/2023.]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 17, 2023
18 18 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): There is a pending Motion filed 2/8/23 against Aearo Technologies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb) [Transferred from California Central on 3/28/2023.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 16, 2023
17 17 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Florida 16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. Lacking Notice of Motion In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb) [Transferred from California Central on 3/28/2023.]
Related: [-]
16 16 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of Florida filed by plaintiff Christian Baker. Motion set for hearing on 3/13/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Bakhos, Joseph) [Transferred from California Central on 3/28/2023.]
Related: [-]
15 15 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by plaintiff Christian Baker pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) without prejudice as to AEARO Technologies, LLC. (Bakhos, Joseph) [Transferred from California Central on 3/28/2023.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 09, 2023
14 14 (IN CHAMBERS) SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Cormac J. Carney. On the Court's own motion, the MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendants 3M COMPANY, a business entity; AEARO TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, a limited liability company13 previously set for 2/27/2023 at 1:30 PM is continued to 3/13/2023 at 1:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 3/28/2023.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 08, 2023
13 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendants 3M COMPANY, a business entity; AEARO TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, a limited liability company filed by plaintiff Christian Baker. Motion set for hearing on 2/27/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Bakhos, Joseph) [Transferred from California Central on 3/28/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 07, 2023
12 12 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney. On 02/06/2023, the clerk entered default11 as to the defendants. Plaintiff is hereby directed to file a motion for default judgment within one week of this order. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 3/28/2023.]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 06, 2023
11 11 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to 3M COMPANY, a business entity;, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, a limited liability company (twdb) [Transferred from California Central on 3/28/2023.]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 03, 2023
10 10 APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant 3M Company, AEARO Technologies, LLC filed by plaintiff Christian Baker. Application set for hearing on 3/6/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Bakhos, Joseph) [Transferred from California Central on 3/28/2023.]
Related: [-]
9 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Christian Baker, upon Defendant 3M Company served on 1/10/2023, answer due 1/31/2023; AEARO Technologies, LLC served on 1/10/2023, answer due 1/31/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Trudy Desbiens - Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned.(Bakhos, Joseph) [Transferred from California Central on 3/28/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 As to AEARO TECHNOLOGIES, LLC
Thursday, December 29, 2022
8 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants 3M Company, AEARO Technologies, LLC. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 3/28/2023.]
Related: [-]
7 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 3/28/2023.]
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 3/28/2023.]
Related: [-]
5 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 3/28/2023.]
Related: [-]
4 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Christian Baker.(Bakhos, Joseph) [Transferred from California Central on 3/28/2023.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 As to Aearo
3 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Christian Baker, identifying 3M COMPANY, a business entity; AEARO TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, a limited liability company. (Bakhos, Joseph) [Transferred from California Central on 3/28/2023.]
Related: [-]
2 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Christian Baker. (Bakhos, Joseph) [Transferred from California Central on 3/28/2023.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34542771 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Christian Baker. (Attorney Joseph Bakhos added to party Christian Baker(pty:pla))(Bakhos, Joseph) [Transferred from California Central on 3/28/2023.]
Related: [-]