California Eastern District Court
Judge:Ana De Alba
Referred: Helena M Barch-Kuchta
Case #: 1:23-cv-00475
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1443(1) Rent, Lease & Ejectment
Case Filed:Mar 28, 2023
Terminated:Apr 05, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Sep 24, 2023 5:26 AM PDT
Defendant
Peter Dupuis
1200 Creekside Drive #1324
Folsom, CA 95630
Plaintiff
Overlook at Blue Ravine LLC
Represented By
Dana R. Wares
Kimball Tirey & St. John LLP
contact info

GPO Apr 05 2023
ORDER TRANSFERRING Case to the Sacramento Division of the Eastern District of California, signed by District Judge Ana de Alba on 4/4/2023. New Case Number 2:23-cv-00633-DB. Old Case Number 1:23-cv-00475-ADA-HBK.(Marrujo, C)

Docket last updated: 81 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
4 4 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Case Transferred Out - Divisional Wed 04/05 9:21 AM
ORDER TRANSFERRING Case to the Sacramento Division of the Eastern District of California, signed by District Judge Ana de Alba on 4/4/2023. New Case Number 2:23-cv-00633-DB. Old Case Number 1:23-cv-00475-ADA-HBK.(Marrujo, C)
Related: [-]
service Service by Mail Wed 04/05 9:22 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:4 Order, Case Transferred Out - Divisional served on Peter Dupuis. (Marrujo, C)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 28, 2023
3 3 notice Notice of Interested Parties Tue 03/28 2:31 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PARTIES by Peter Dupuis. (Maldonado, C)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion In Forma Pauperis Tue 03/28 2:30 PM
MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Peter Dupuis. (Maldonado, C)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 03/28 2:29 PM
NOTICE of REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Sacramento, Case number 22UD05986 filed by Peter Dupuis.(Maldonado, C)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet