Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Judge:Pamela Pepper
Case #: 2:23-cv-00412
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Mar 29, 2023
Last checked: Friday Oct 13, 2023 10:53 AM CDT
Defendant
CST Worldwide
1400 Dragon Street
Dallas, TX 75222
Defendant
Emergency Fire and Water Restoration
6451 Industrial Loop
Greendale, WI 53129
Plaintiff
Conor Braverman
1810 Cameron Drive
Madison, WI 53711
Represented By
Briane F Pagel, Jr
Lawton & Cates Sc
contact info
Plaintiff
Mel Braverman
405 Woody Lane
Monona, WI 53716
Represented By
Briane F Pagel, Jr
Lawton & Cates Sc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
40 40 order Text Only Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 08/06 10:25 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 8/6/2024. The court ordered that by the end of the day on August 2, 2024, the parties were to confer and file a joint amended Rule 26(f) report. Dkt. No. 38. Plaintiffs' counsel informed the court that he had attempted to reach opposing counsel regarding the amended report but had been unsuccessful. Dkt. No. 39-1. The plaintiffs filed their proposed Rule 26(f) report at the deadline. Dkt. No. 39. The court will adopt the plaintiffs' proposed schedule. The court ORDERS that the deadline for the parties to exchange Rule 26(a) disclosures is 8/29/2024. The deadline for the parties to amend pleadings and join parties is 9/5/2024. The deadline for the plaintiffs to disclose expert witnesses and reports is 12/5/2024. The deadline for the defendant to disclose expert witnesses and reports is 2/13/2025. The deadline for the parties to disclose rebuttal expert witnesses and reports is 3/6/2025. Discovery is due by 5/17/2025. Dispositive motions are due by 6/15/2025; the response and reply deadlines mandated by Civil L.R. 7, 56 (E.D. Wis.) apply. The court will not set final pretrial conference and trial dates until after dispositive motions have been decided. Note: there is no document linked to this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
39 39 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Plan Fri 08/02 3:21 PM
Proposed Supplemental REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by All Plaintiffs.(Pagel, Briane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Letter with Proposed Supplemental Rule 26(f) Report
Monday, July 01, 2024
38 38 minutes Motion Hearing Order on Motion to Stay Tue 07/02 4:25 PM
Court Minutes and Order RE:25 Motion to stay proceedings and compel arbitration against EFWR held on 7/1/2024 before Chief Judge Pamela Pepper. The court ORDERS that the proceedings in this case are STAYED as to the plaintiffs claims against defendants Emergency Fire and Water Restoration and First Onsite Property Restoration and ORDERS that the plaintiffs and EFWR must participate in arbitration. The court ORDERS that the plaintiffs FDCPA claim against defendant CST Worldwide is SEVERED from the other claims in the complaint, and that the proceedings as to that claim are not stayed. The court ORDERS that the plaintiffs and defendant CST Worldwide must confer file an updated, joint Rule 26(f) plan by the end of the day on August 2, 2024. (kgw)
Related: [-]
37 37 audio Audio docketing digital upload Mon 07/01 12:39 PM
Audio of motion hearing held on 07/01/2024 at 10:00 a.m.; File Size (43.8 MB) (kgw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
36 36 motion Withdraw Tue 06/25 9:47 AM
MOTION to Withdraw by CST Worldwide. (Beilke, Kristin)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Attorney - Notice Parties Wed 06/26 8:32 AM
Attorney Kristin K Beilke terminated. (amb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
35 35 respm Reply Brief in Support of Motion Thu 05/02 3:05 PM
REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Emergency Fire and Water Restoration, First Onsite Property Restoration re25 First MOTION to Stay Defendants Emergency Fire and Water Restoration, LLC and First Onsite Property Restoration's Reply Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration . (Meuler, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2024
34 34 misc Attachments Thu 04/18 2:12 PM
ATTACHMENTS by All Plaintiffs re31 Brief in Opposition to Motion. (Pagel, Briane)
Related: [-]
33 33 misc Declaration Thu 04/18 2:07 PM
DECLARATION of Connor Braverman(Pagel, Briane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Copy of Contract,
Att: 2 Exhibit B: Attorney Sparer Terms and Conditions
32 32 respm Response to Motion Thu 04/18 2:05 PM
RESPONSE to Motion filed by CST Worldwide re25 First MOTION to Stay . (Beilke, Kristin)
Related: [-]
31 31 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Thu 04/18 2:03 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re25 First MOTION to Stay . (Pagel, Briane)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
30 30 order Text Only Order 1 - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Tue 04/02 3:39 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 4/2/2024 re29 parties' Stipulation Regarding Arbitration Motion. The court APPROVES the parties' stipulation and GRANTS their request to postpone the scheduling conference. The court ORDERS that the scheduling conference currently set for April 3, 2024 is REMOVED from the court's calendar. The court SETS a hearing for oral disposition on the defendant's motion to stay and compel arbitration for 7/1/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 222, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Chief Judge Pamela Pepper. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
29 29 misc Stipulation Mon 04/01 2:33 PM
STIPULATION RE: Arbitration Motion by All Plaintiffs. (Pagel, Briane)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
28 28 misc Declaration Thu 03/28 5:15 PM
DECLARATION of Christopher M. Meuler(Meuler, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit B - Email to Atty. Pagel dated 1.25.2024,
Att: 2 Exhibit C - Letter to Atty. Pagel dated. 2.22.2024
27 27 misc Declaration Thu 03/28 5:11 PM
DECLARATION of Penelope Kochanski(Meuler, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - 2021 Agreement
26 26 respm Brief in Support of Motion Thu 03/28 5:08 PM
BRIEF in Support filed by Emergency Fire and Water Restoration, First Onsite Property Restoration re25 First MOTION to Stay Proceedings and Compel Arbitration . (Meuler, Christopher)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Stay Thu 03/28 5:04 PM
First MOTION to Stay by Emergency Fire and Water Restoration, First Onsite Property Restoration. (Meuler, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
24 24 misc Letter Wed 03/20 4:13 PM
LETTER from Attorney Briane Pagel RE: Joint Rule 26 Report . (Pagel, Briane)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Plan Wed 03/20 4:11 PM
Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by All Plaintiffs. (Pagel, Briane)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
22 22 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Mon 01/08 1:55 PM
ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 1/8/2024. Scheduling Conference set for 4/3/2024 at 4:00 PM in Courtroom 222, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI 53202 before Chief Judge Pamela Pepper. Rule 26 discovery plan due by 3/20/2024. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
21 21 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 01/05 1:37 PM
ANSWER to10 Amended Complaint by Emergency Fire and Water Restoration, First Onsite Property Restoration.(Meuler, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
20 20 misc Disclosure Statement Mon 12/18 3:52 PM
DISCLOSURE Statement by CST Worldwide. (Beilke, Kristin)
Related: [-]
19 19 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 12/18 3:51 PM
ANSWER to10 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by CST Worldwide.(Beilke, Kristin)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 12/18 3:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin K Beilke on behalf of CST Worldwide. Attorney(s) appearing: Kristin K. Beilke (Beilke, Kristin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
17 17 order Text Only Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 11/28 11:40 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 11/28/2023 re16 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. The court APPROVES the parties' stipulation. The court ORDERS that the time for defendants Emergency Fire and Water Restoration and First Onsite Property Restoration to respond to the plaintiff's amended complaint is EXTENDED until the end of the day on January 5, 2024. Note: there is no document linked to this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
16 16 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 11/27 4:16 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Emergency Fire and Water Restoration, First Onsite Property Restoration. (Meuler, Christopher)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/27 4:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon A Allen on behalf of Emergency Fire and Water Restoration, First Onsite Property Restoration. Attorney(s) appearing: Shannon A. Allen and Christopher M. Meuler (Allen, Shannon)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Disclosure Statement Mon 11/27 4:04 PM
DISCLOSURE Statement by Emergency Fire and Water Restoration, First Onsite Property Restoration. (Meuler, Christopher)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/27 3:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M Meuler on behalf of Emergency Fire and Water Restoration, First Onsite Property Restoration. Attorney(s) appearing: Christopher M.Meuler and Shannon A. Allen (Meuler, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 11/07 4:03 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Emergency Fire and Water Restoration served on 11/6/2023. (Pagel, Briane)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 11/07 4:01 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. First Onsite Property Restoration served on 11/6/2023. (Pagel, Briane)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
9 9 misc Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 11/02 1:25 PM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs for new party, First Onsite Property Restoration (Pagel, Briane)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Thu 11/02 2:25 PM
Summons Issued as to First Onsite Property Restoration. (amb)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 11/02 2:22 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Mel Braverman, Conor Braverman.(amb)
Related: [-]
8 8 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 10/16 10:02 AM
ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 10/16/2023.5 Plaintiffs' motion to amend complaint GRANTED.5 Plaintiffs' motion to enlarge time for service GRANTED; plaintiffs to serve amended complaint on defendants within 60 days. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 23, 2023
7 7 misc Letter Fri 06/23 2:42 PM
LETTER from Attorney Briane F. Pagel Re: Status of Plaintiffs' Pending Motion to Amend Complaint and Enlarge Time for Service of Process . (Pagel, Briane)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 08, 2023
6 6 misc Declaration Thu 06/08 3:04 PM
DECLARATION of Attorney Briane F. Pagel in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Complaint and Enlarge Time for Service of Process on Defendants (Pagel, Briane)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Amend/Correct Thu 06/08 3:03 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint & Motion to Enlarge Time for Service of Process on Defendants by All Plaintiffs.(Pagel, Briane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint Proposed Amended Complaint
Thursday, April 20, 2023
4 4 misc Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Thu 04/20 3:00 PM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pagel, Briane)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 30, 2023
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Thu 03/30 11:07 AM
NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available[LINK:here.] Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Thu 03/30 11:28 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants (jcl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 29, 2023
3 3 misc Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 03/29 3:41 PM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs (Pagel, Briane)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 03/29 3:41 PM
REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs (Pagel, Briane)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/29 3:40 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Mel Braverman, Conor Braverman. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number CWIEDC-4362647)(Pagel, Briane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet