Missouri Western District Court
Judge:Roseann Ketchmark
Case #: 4:23-cv-00211
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Mar 29, 2023
Terminated:Oct 23, 2023
Last checked: Friday Oct 13, 2023 3:24 PM CDT
Defendant
Mammoth Creative Co., LLC
Defendant
Mammoth Sports Construction, LLC
Plaintiff
Mammoth Productions, LLC
Represented By
Luke Meriwether
Lathrop Gpm LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 79 minutes ago
Monday, October 23, 2023
11 11 order Order of Dismissal Mon 10/23 12:57 PM
Order of Dismissal without prejudice per10 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal. Signed on October 23, 2023 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Wheeler, LaTandra)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
10 10 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 10/19 11:08 AM
NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Mammoth Productions, LLC (Meriwether, Luke)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
9 9 misc Status Report Thu 09/21 11:49 AM
STATUS REPORT by Mammoth Productions, LLC. (Meriwether, Luke)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 22, 2023
8 8 order Order Tue 08/22 5:01 PM
ORDER (1) advising Plaintiff that no further extensions as to service will be granted absent extraordinary circumstances, and (2) directing Plaintiff to provide a status report on 9/21/2023. Signed on 8/22/2023 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Skelton, Sara)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 08/22 1:05 PM
ORDER granting6 motion for extension of time to serve complaint. Service due on or before 10/26/2023. Signed on 8/22/2023 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Skelton, Sara)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Extension of Time Tue 08/22 11:55 AM
MOTION for extension of time to Serve the Complaint filed by Luke Meriwether on behalf of Mammoth Productions, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/5/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Meriwether, Luke)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 22, 2023
5 5 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 06/22 1:49 PM
ORDER granting4 motion for extension of time to serve complaint. Service due on or before 8/27/2023. Signed on 6/22/2023 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Skelton, Sara)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Extension of Time Thu 06/22 1:07 PM
MOTION for extension of time to Serve the Complaint filed by Luke Meriwether on behalf of Mammoth Productions, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/6/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Meriwether, Luke)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 29, 2023
3 3 15 pgs utility Patent/Trademark Report Wed 03/29 3:59 PM
Report on the filing of an action regarding trademark number(s) unknown. Plaintiff(s): Mammoth Productions, LLC Lead Attorney for Plaintiff(s): Luke Meriwether Lathrop GPM LLP 2345 Grand Avenue Suite 2200 Kansas City, MO 64108-2618 Defendant(s): Mammoth Creative Co., LLC, Mammoth Sports Construction, LLC Lead Attorney for Defendant(s): unknown The civil complaint is attached. (Woods, Gloria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs AO 120 Form
2 2 notice Notice of MAPN Wed 03/29 3:51 PM
NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Woods, Gloria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 MAP General Order
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/29 3:26 PM
COMPLAINT against Mammoth Creative Co., LLC, Mammoth Sports Construction, LLC filed by Luke Meriwether on behalf of Mammoth Productions, LLC. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-8389716. Service due by 6/27/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Meriwether, Luke)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet