Nebraska District Court
Judge:John M Gerrard
Referred: Michael D Nelson
Case #: 4:23-cv-03041
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause05:704 Labor Litigation
Case Filed:Mar 29, 2023
Last checked: Friday Oct 13, 2023 5:03 AM CDT
Defendant
Nebraska Book Company, Inc.
Represented By
Margaret C. Hershiser
Koley, Jessen Law Firm
contact info
Patrice D. Ott
Koley, Jessen Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Nebraska Book Holdings, Inc.
Represented By
Margaret C. Hershiser
Koley, Jessen Law Firm
contact info
Patrice D. Ott
Koley, Jessen Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Christopher Degroot
Represented By
Michael C. Iadevaia
Stranch, Jennings Law Firm
contact info
J. Gerard Stranch, IV
Stranch, Jennings Law Firm
contact info
Samuel J. Strauss
Turke, Strauss LLP
contact info
Daniel H. Friedman
Friedman Law Firm
contact info
Lynn A. Toops
Cohen, Malad Law Firm
contact info
Amina A. Thomas
Cohen, Malad Law Firm
contact info
Raina C. Borrelli
Turke, Strauss LLP
contact info

GPO May 02 2023
e rules of the Court. Failure to comply with this order will result in Samuel J. Strauss being removed as counsel of record. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (Copy mailed)(TCL)ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - IT IS ORDERED that on or before May 16, 2023, the attorney listed above shall either comply with the requests set forth in the letters from the Clerk of the Court or show cause by written affidavit why they cannot comply with th
GPO Jun 15 2023
PROTECTIVE ORDER Upon consideration of the parties' joint request for entry of a Protective Order in their Rule 26(f) Report, (Filing No. 36), the Court enters the following Protective Order governing the disclosure of confidential Discovery Material by a Producing Party to a Receiving Party in this Action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LRM)
GPO Feb 02 2024
AMENDED CASE PROGRESSION ORDER Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Deadlines (Filing No. 89) is granted. The status conference set on March 20, 2024, at 11:00 a.m. is cancelled. The status conference to discuss case progression and the parties' interest in settlement is rescheduled before the undersigned magistrate judge on May 29, 2024, at 10:30 a.m. by telephone. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LRM)
GPO Nov 05 2024
THIRD AMENDED CASE PROGRESSION ORDER - The planning conference set for January 29, 2025, is cancelled. The trial and pretrial conference will not be set at this time. A planning conference to discuss case progression, dispositive motions, the parties' interest in settlement, and the trial and pretrial conference settings will be held with the undersigned magistrate judge on March 5, 2025, at 9:30 a.m. by telephone. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
GPO Jan 31 2025
FOURTH AMENDED CASE PROGRESSION ORDER - The planning conference set for March 5, 2025, is cancelled. The trial and pretrial conference will not be set at this time. A planning conference to discuss case progression, dispositive motions, the parties' interest in settlement, and the trial and pretrial conference settings will be held with the undersigned magistrate judge on April 4, 2025, at 9:30 a.m. by telephone. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
GPO Mar 27 2025
tions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LRM)FIFTH AMENDED CASE PROGRESSION ORDER The Text Email Motion to Extend Case Progression Order (Filing No. 131) is granted. The trial and pretrial conference will not be set at this time. A planning conference to discuss case progression, dispositive motions, the parties interest in settlement, and the trial and pretrial conference settings remains scheduled with the undersigned magistrate judge on April 4, 2025, at 9:30 a.m. by telephone. Counsel shall use the conferencing instruc
GPO Apr 25 2025
STIPULATED ORDER certifying a class action, defining certified classes, appointing class representatives and class counsel, and ordering submission of proposed form of notice. Ordered by Senior Judge John M. Gerrard. (DCD)

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, May 16, 2025
143 143 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 05/16 3:59 PM
MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING PROPOSED CLASS NOTICE AND NOTICE PLAN by Attorney Michael C. Iadevaia on behalf of Plaintiffs Christopher DeGroot, Steven Showalter.(Iadevaia, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Class Notice,
Att: 2 Exhibit Proposed Unpaid Vacation Time Notice
142 142 notice Notice (Other) Fri 05/16 3:49 PM
NOTICE of Serving First Supplemental Initial Disclosures by Attorney Jaskirat K. Strandquest on behalf of Defendant Concise Capital Management, LP (Strandquest, Jaskirat)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
141 141 order Order on Motion to Extend Fri 05/09 11:25 AM
TEXT ORDER granting140 Motion to Extend. Ordered by Senior Judge John M. Gerrard. (DCD)
Related: [-]
140 140 motion Extend Fri 05/09 11:01 AM
UNOPPOSED MOTION to Extend Deadline to Submit Proposed Class Notice by Attorney Michael C. Iadevaia on behalf of Plaintiffs Christopher DeGroot, Steven Showalter.(Iadevaia, Michael)
Related: [-]