Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Victoria M Calvert
Referred: Catherine M Salinas
Case #: 1:23-cv-01305
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Mar 28, 2023
Terminated:Aug 31, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Sep 24, 2023 8:22 AM EDT
Defendant
Rent Recovery Solutions, LLC
Represented By
Jonathan K. Aust
Bedard Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Harold Petgrave
Represented By
Jeffrey Wilson
Jw Law Firm, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, August 31, 2023
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Thu 08/31 1:16 PM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING11 Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii) (dnb)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 08/31 1:18 PM
Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas terminated from case. (dnb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
11 11 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 08/29 11:01 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Harold Petgrave. (Wilson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
10 10 discov Certificate of Service Wed 05/31 4:07 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Defendant's First Set of Discovery Requests to Plaintiff by Rent Recovery Solutions, LLC.(Aust, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
9 9 order Scheduling Order Tue 05/30 9:27 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery ends on 9/25/2023. Motions due by 10/25/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on May 30, 2023. (lwb)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 26, 2023
8 8 discov Initial Disclosures Fri 05/26 2:59 PM
Initial Disclosures by Harold Petgrave.(Wilson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Fri 05/26 12:49 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Harold Petgrave. (Wilson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 25, 2023
6 6 discov Initial Disclosures Thu 05/25 9:26 AM
Initial Disclosures by Rent Recovery Solutions, LLC.(Aust, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
5 5 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 05/24 3:28 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Harold Petgrave. (Wilson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2023
4 4 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 04/27 2:18 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rent Recovery Solutions, LLC. (Aust, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 04/27 2:17 PM
ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT by Rent Recovery Solutions, LLC. Discovery ends on 9/25/2023.(Aust, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 28, 2023
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Wed 03/29 10:13 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Rent Recovery Solutions, LLC. (nmb)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 03/29 10:12 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Harold Petgrave. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-12489581)(nmb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet