Maryland District Court
Judge:Stephanie A Gallagher
Case #: 1:19-cv-03375
Nature of Suit375 Other Statutes - False Claims Act
Cause31:3729 False Claims Act - Liability
Case Filed:Nov 25, 2019
Terminated:Mar 20, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Mar 30, 2023 11:07 PM EDT
Defendant
Bel Air Underground Services, Inc.
Defendant
Wayne Kacher, Jr.
Defendant
Maryland Broadband Cooperative
Defendant
W. Patrick Mitchell
Defendant
Pro Comm E.L.S. LLC
Plaintiff
State of Maryland
Represented By
Jay Paul Holland
Joseph Greenwald And Laake PA
contact info
Plaintiff
United States Of America
Represented By
Kelly M Marzullo
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Jay Paul Holland
Joseph Greenwald And Laake PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
order Order Tue 05/21 3:51 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER approving98 Modified Consent to Dismissal. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 5/21/2024. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]