Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Hope T Cannon
Case #: 3:23-cv-07130
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Mar 30, 2023
Terminated:Aug 07, 2023
Last checked: Friday Oct 13, 2023 11:00 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Plaintiff
KIM FAY
Represented By
JASON BENJAMIN WOLF
Parafinczuk & Wolf - Fort Lauderdale Fl
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, March 30, 2023
3 3 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Thu 03/30 10:07 AM
NOTICE of Designated Forum- IL by KIM FAY (WOLF, JASON)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 03/30 10:07 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (WOLF, JASON)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/30 10:06 AM
COMPLAINT AND TRIAL JURY DEMAND against 3M COMPANY, filed by KIM FAY. (WOLF, JASON)
Related: [-]