Arkansas Eastern District Court
Judge:Brian S Miller
Case #: 4:23-cv-00291
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Case Filed:Mar 30, 2023
Last checked: Friday Oct 13, 2023 4:09 AM CDT
Defendant
Den-Tex Central Inc
Represented By
William C. Frye
Frye Law Firm, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Kirklin Thompson
Represented By
Stewart Whaley
Wh Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
22 22 1 pgs order Order Staying Case ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 01/30 4:22 PM
ORDER granting18 Den-Tex Central Inc.'s motion to compel arbitration and stay proceedings; staying this case pending the outcome of arbitration proceedings; and denying as moot20 Thompson's motion for a meeting with the judges assigned to this case. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/30/2024. (ljb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
21 21 respm Response to Motion Thu 01/25 8:58 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re20 MOTION for Order to Speak to Judges filed by All Defendants.(Frye, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Original Signed Arbitration Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit Original Signed Acknowledgment
Monday, January 22, 2024
20 20 1 pgs motion Order Mon 01/22 2:44 PM
MOTION for Order to Speak to the Judges about a Matter in the Case filed by Kirklin Thompson. (fjg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
19 19 brief Brief in Support Thu 01/11 2:27 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re18 Motion to Compel, filed by Den-Tex Central Inc. (jak)
Related: [-]
utility Notice of Docket Correction Thu 01/11 2:28 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re18 MOTION to Compel. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to remove reference to the brief in support filed as an attachment in error. The brief in support was filed by the clerk's office as a separate document at entry19 . (jak)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
18 18 motion Compel Wed 01/10 3:48 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Den-Tex Central Inc(Frye, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Arbitration Agreement,
Att: 2 Brief ISO
Monday, November 27, 2023
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Mon 11/27 1:55 PM
NOTICE of Filing Questions for Clerk Regarding Entry of Default by Kirklin Thompson. (fjg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 11/21 1:45 PM
ORDER granting14 Den-Tex Central Inc.'s unopposed motion for extension of time and the parties have until 1/10/2024 to file their Federal Rule of Civil Procedure Rule 26 initial disclosures. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/21/2023. (ljb)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
15 15 order Scheduling Order Mon 11/20 4:33 PM
FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for sometime during the week of 3/17/2025 at 9:30 a.m. in Little Rock Courtroom #2D before Judge Brian S. Miller. Joinder of Parties due by 9/23/2024; Discovery due by 10/23/2024; Motions due by 11/18/2024; Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 2/14/2025. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 11/20/2023. (ljb)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Document Mon 11/20 4:17 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Initial Disclosures by All Defendants (Frye, William)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Mon 11/20 4:00 PM
Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Kirklin Thompson. (ajj)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Fri 11/17 9:49 AM
ORDER granting11 Motion to Withdraw as counsel; and directing Kirklin Thompson to either obtain new counsel or file notice that he plans to proceed pro se by 12/17/2023. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/17/2023. (csf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
11 11 motion Withdraw as Attorney Tue 11/14 11:53 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Kirklin Thompson (Whaley, Stewart)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
10 10 order Initial Scheduling Order Tue 09/12 2:39 PM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 11/20/2023; Rule 26(f) Report due by 12/4/2023; Bench Trial proposed for sometime during the week of 3/17/2025 at 9:30 a.m. in Little Rock Courtroom #2D before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 9/12/2023. (ljb)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 09/12 2:22 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to1 Complaint by Den-Tex Central Inc.(Frye, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Arbitration Agreement
Monday, September 11, 2023
8 8 service Acknowledgment of Service Mon 09/11 9:18 AM
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to1 Complaint Service accepted by William C. Frye, counsel for Defendant, on 8/31/23 Acknowledgement filed by Kirklin Thompson. (Whaley, Stewart)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 31, 2023
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Set Aside Default Thu 08/31 11:10 AM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part6 Den-Tex Central Inc.'s motion to set aside the clerk's entry of default and dismiss; setting aside the default, denying the motion to dismiss, and directing Kirklin Thompson to accomplish service on Den-Tex within 45 days of this order. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/31/2023. (kdr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
6 6 motion Set Aside Default Tue 08/29 2:18 PM
MOTION to Set Aside Default Judgment by Den-Tex Central Inc(Frye, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-SOS Registered Agent,
Att: 2 Exhibit B-AOS,
Att: 3 Exhibit C-Dec Support LaFreeda,
Att: 4 Exhibit D-Aff Cavitt,
Att: 5 Document Brief
Tuesday, August 22, 2023
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/22 10:41 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by William C. Frye on behalf of All Defendants (Frye, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 02, 2023
4 4 order Clerks Entry of Default Wed 08/02 9:01 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Den-Tex Central Inc. (kdr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 13, 2023
3 3 motion Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 07/13 9:05 AM
MOTION for Entry of Default Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default by All Plaintiffs (Whaley, Stewart)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
2 2 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 05/03 9:37 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kirklin Thompson. Den-Tex Central Inc served on 4/4/2023. (Whaley, Stewart)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 30, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/30 1:54 PM
COMPLAINT against Den-Tex Central Inc, filed by Kirklin Thompson. Filing Fee of $402.00 paid. Receipt Number LIT1585. Summons issued(kdr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet