Alabama Northern District Court
Judge:R David Proctor
Case #: 2:23-cv-00408
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Case Filed:Mar 30, 2023
Terminated:Dec 18, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 18, 2024 7:20 AM CST
Defendant
Gabriel Bernarde
Represented By
Richard M Elias
Elias LLC
contact info
Defendant
Aidan Lau
Represented By
Richard M Elias
Elias LLC
contact info
Defendant
Fraser John Perring
Represented By
Richard M Elias
Elias LLC
contact info
Defendant
Viceroy Research, LLC
Represented By
Richard M Elias
Elias LLC
contact info
J Ken Thompson
contact info
Movant
Cassandra Marshall
129 Wixford Way
Alabaster, AL 35007
Plaintiff
Medical Properties Trust, Inc.
Represented By
Sijin Choi
Wachtell, Lipton, Rosen & Katz
contact info
William Savitt
Wachtell Lipton Rosen & Katz
contact info
Nathaniel D. Cullerton
Wachtell Lipton Rosen & Katz
contact info
Wesley B Gilchrist
Lightfoot Franklin & White LLC
contact info
Corey Worcester
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP
contact info
Rebecca Kay Hall
Loftin Holt Hall & Hargett
contact info
Charles M. Melman
Wachtell, Lipton, Rosen & Katz
contact info
Kelsey Anne Borenzweig
Wachtell Lipton Rosen & Katz
contact info
Meghan Salvati Cole
Lightfoot Franklin & White LLC
contact info
Sarah Kathleen Eddy
Wachtell Lipton Rosen & Katz
contact info
Adabelle Ekechukwu
Wachtell Lipton Rosen & Katz
contact info
Jomaire A Crawford
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Jomaire Crawford
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Michael L Bell
Lightfoot Franklin & White LLC
contact info

GPO Jun 29 2023
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/29/2023. (KAM)
GPO Jun 30 2023
AMENDED MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/30/2023. (KAM)
GPO Sep 01 2023
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 09/01/2023. (RMM)
GPO Jan 12 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 1/12/2024. (KAM)

Docket last updated: 12/19/2024 11:03 AM CST
Thursday, March 30, 2023
Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number AALNDC-4307323 (ALND receipt# B-4516). related document1 COMPLAINT against Gabriel Bernarde, Aidan Lau, Fraser John Perring, Viceroy Research, LLC, filed by Medical Properties Trust, Inc..(JLC). (Bell, Michael) Modified on 3/31/2023 (AKD).
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Gabriel Bernarde, Aidan Lau, Fraser John Perring, Viceroy Research, LLC, filed by Medical Properties Trust, Inc..(JLC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 75 pgs Exhibit 1 Part 1,
Att: 2 57 pgs Exhibit 1 Part 2,
Att: 3 4 pgs Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Medical Properties Trust, Inc. (JLC)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT; Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge John H England, III. Magistrate Judge Nicholas A Danella no longer assigned to the case. Please use case number 2:23-CV-0408-JHE on all subsequent pleadings. (JLC)
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE OF CONSENT to a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AKD)
Related: [-]