Alabama Southern District Court
Judge:Kristi K Dubose
Referred: P Bradley Murray
Case #: 1:23-cv-00108
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Mar 30, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Change of Address Wed 11/20 3:57 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Kassey Reedy. (fz)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Change of Address Thu 10/31 1:46 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Kassey Reedy. Address updated to: Kilby Correctional Facility. (fz)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Fri 10/25 4:57 PM
Writ of Mandamus filed by Kassey Reedy. Referred to Judge Murray. (fz)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Thu 04/25 3:11 PM
Affidavit of Proof of Nationality by Kassey Reedy. Referred to Judge Murray. (fz)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 27, 2023
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Fri 07/28 12:24 PM
NOTICE of Filing Legal Notice Name Declaration Correction and Publication by Kassey Reedy. Referred to MJ Murray (PSU). (meh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Truth
Friday, June 16, 2023
9 9 notice Notice of Filing Exhibits Thu 06/22 9:10 AM
NOTICE of Understanding and Intent and Claim of Right by Kassey Reedy. Referred to MJ Murray. (meh)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 09, 2023
8 8 answer Response to Habeas Petition Fri 06/09 3:31 PM
RESPONSE to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Sharon Folks. (Owen, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Indictment CC-98-43,
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Plea and Sentence CC-98-43,
Att: 3 Exhibit C-Case Action Summary CC-98-43,
Att: 4 Exhibit D-Rule 32 petition CC-98-43.60,
Att: 5 Exhibit E-Rule 32 hearing CC-98-43.60,
Att: 6 Exhibit F-trial court order CC-98-43.60,
Att: 7 Exhibit G-Case action summary CC-98-43.60,
Att: 8 Exhibit H-Rule 32 petition CC-98-43.61,
Att: 9 Exhibit I-Trial Court order CC-98-43.61,
Att: 10 Exhibit J-Case Action Summary CC-98-43.61,
Att: 11 Exhibit K-Rule 32 petition CC-98-43.62,
Att: 12 Exhibit L-Trial court order CC-98-43.62,
Att: 13 Exhibit M-CCA Memorandum,
Att: 14 Exhibit N- App for Rehearing CC-98-43.62,
Att: 15 Exhibit O- App. for Cert. CC-98-43.62,
Att: 16 Exhibit P-Petition for habeas CC-98-43.63,
Att: 17 Exhibit Q-Trial Court order CC-98-43.63,
Att: 18 Exhibit R-Case action Summary CC-98-43.63,
Att: 19 Exhibit S-Motion for Reconsideration CC-98-43.63,
Att: 20 Exhibit T-Petition for habeas CC-98-43.63,
Att: 21 Exhibit U-Trial court order CC-98-43.63,
Att: 22 Exhibit V-Petition for relief CC-98-43.63,
Att: 23 Exhibit W-Order and Judgement CC-98-43.63,
Att: 24 Exhibit X-Petition for relief to CCA CC-98-43.63,
Att: 25 Exhibit Y-CCA order CC-98-43.63
utility Document Referred Fri 06/09 4:48 PM
REFERRAL OF8 Response to Habeas Petition to Judge Murray. (meh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 09, 2023
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/09 9:09 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Owen on behalf of Sharon Folks (Owen, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 24, 2023
6 6 service Return of Service Executed Fri 04/28 3:14 PM
Return of Service Executed Sharon Folks served on 4/5/2023, answer due 6/4/2023. (fz)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 19, 2023
5 5 misc Mail Returned Fri 04/21 4:46 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to Sharon Folks re3 Order to Serve Order and 2254 Petition. Item resent via USPS on 04/20/23. (cjr)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 17, 2023
4 4 service Return of Service Executed Mon 04/17 8:21 AM
Return of Service Executed. Alabama Attorney General served on 4/10/2023, answer due 6/9/2023. (fz)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
3 3 4 pgs order Order to Serve Order and 2254 Petition Wed 04/05 2:47 PM
Order Directing Clerk to Serve copy of 2254 petition and order on Respondent and Attorney General. Respondent to answer within 60 days of service on AG as further set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 4/5/2023. Copy to Petitioner. (fz) (fz)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (4/5/2023) Certified Banners
Thursday, March 30, 2023
2 2 misc Filing Fee Received Thu 03/30 3:26 PM
Habeas Filing fee: $5.00, receipt number 1062212. (cjr)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Thu 03/30 3:24 PM
2254 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Kassey Reedy. Referred to MJ Murray. (meh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Evidence 1,
Att: 2 Evidence 2,
Att: 3 Evidence 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit A