Texas Southern District Court
Judge:David Hittner
Case #: 4:23-cv-01194
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Mar 30, 2023
Last checked: Friday Oct 13, 2023 1:48 PM CDT
Conflict Check Party
STORE Capital Acquisitions, LLC
Conflict Check Party
STORE Capital Corporation
Conflict Check Party
BAH Texas Hospitality, Inc.
Conflict Check Party
Royal Hospitality Corp.
Conflict Check Party
Royal Investment Holdings, LLC
Defendant
Royal Texas, LLC
Represented By
Gary Duane Sarles
Sarles Ouimet PLLC
contact info
J. Robert MacNaughton
Porter & Powers PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Triangle Capital Properties, LLC
Represented By
Gary Duane Sarles
Sarles Ouimet PLLC
contact info
J. Robert MacNaughton
Porter & Powers PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
STORE Master Funding XXIX, LLC
Represented By
Craig Solomon Ganz
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Michael Stephen Myers
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info

GPO May 14 2024
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 21 MOTION DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CONTINUE SUMMARY JUDGMENT CONSIDERATION UNDER RULE 56(D), AND MOTION FOR NEW SCHEDULING ORDER (Signed by Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo) Parties notified. (clf4)

Docket last updated: 03/31/2023 1:23 AM CDT
Thursday, March 30, 2023
1 1 12 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-29681928) filed by STORE Master Funding XXIX, LLC.(Ganz, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed.(Ganz, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons to Defendant Royal Texas, LLC
3 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by STORE Master Funding XXIX, LLC identifying STORE Capital Acquisitions, LLC and STORE Capital Corporation as Corporate Parent, filed.(Ganz, Craig)
Related: [-]