Utah District Court
Case #: 1:23-cr-00016
Case Filed:Mar 01, 2023
Last checked: Friday Mar 31, 2023 2:19 AM MDT
Defendant
James William Howell (1)
Represented By
Benjamin A. Hamilton
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Notice Party
Caroline J. Bye-Routh
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Ryan Nelson Holtan
Us Attorney Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/31/2023 3:04 AM MDT
Tuesday, February 21, 2023
1 1 5 pgs COMPLAINT as to James William Howell (1). Assigned to Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. (jl) [2:23-mj-00161-CMR]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 23, 2023
3 3 ORDER SETTING HEARING OR TRIAL as to James William Howell. Initial Appearance set for 2/28/2023 at 01:00 PM in Rm 8.400 before Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 2/23/2023.(lam) [2:23-mj-00161-CMR]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 27, 2023
4 4 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum by USA as to James William Howell.(Holtan, Ryan) [2:23-mj-00161-CMR]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
5 5 DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting 4 Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum as to James William Howell (1) Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 2/27/23. No attached document. (ksm) [2:23-mj-00161-CMR]
Related: [-]
6 6 5 pgs MOTION for Detention by USA as to James William Howell. (Holtan, Ryan) [2:23-mj-00161-CMR]
Related: [-]
7 7 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued as to James William Howell for 2/28/2023 1:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. (alf) [2:23-mj-00161-CMR]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 28, 2023
8 8 **SEALED DOCUMENT** PRETRIAL SERVICES REPORT as to James William Howell (mec) [2:23-mj-00161-CMR]
Related: [-]
9 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero: Initial Appearance, Attorney Appointment and Detention Hearing as to James William Howell held on 2/28/2023. Defendant present and in custody. Defendant requests counsel. Financial Affidavit submitted. The court appoints FPD counsel, Benjamin Hamilton. The defendant waives formal reading of the complaint. Rights and penalties explained. Arraignment is set for 3/2/2023 at 02:45 PM in Rm 8.400 before Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg. Govt moves for Detention. Arguments were heard from both sides. For the reasons stated on the record, the defendant is released on Order Setting Conditions of Release. ( Arraignment set for 3/2/2023 at 02:45 PM in Rm 8.400 before Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg.) Attorney for Plaintiff: Ryan Holtan, Attorney for Defendant: Benjamin Hamilton, FPD. USPO Wyatt Standworth Court Reporter: Electronic.(Time Start: 01:00:00, Time End: 1:15:00, Room 8.400.) Related [+] [2:23-mj-00161-CMR]
Related: [-] b
10 10 DOCKET TEXT ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to James William Howell Benjamin A. Hamilton for James William Howell appointed. No attached document. Representation shall continue for any post-sentencing activities initiated by the US Probation Office. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 2/28/2023 Related [+] [2:23-mj-00161-CMR]
Related: [-] b
11 11 Receipt for Surrender of Passport as to James William Howell. issued by USA (haa) [2:23-mj-00161-CMR]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to James William Howell NOTE: Any future review of detention will remain with the magistrate judge who entered the first detention order, even if an order of referral to a different magistrate judge is entered on this defendant's case Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 2/28/2023 Related [+] [2:23-mj-00161-CMR]
Related: [-] b
21 21 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 2/28/2023, filed on 3/7/2023 in case as to James William Howell. (ks)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
14 14 2 pgs INDICTMENT as to James William Howell (1) count(s) 1, 2. Assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. (jl)
Related: [-]