Texas Southern District Court
Judge:Andrew S Hanen
Case #: 4:23-cv-01233
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Mar 31, 2023
Terminated:Sep 21, 2023
Last checked: Friday Oct 13, 2023 1:53 PM CDT
Conflict Check Party
ARS Account Resolution Services
Conflict Check Party
HCFS
Conflict Check Party
HCFS Health Care Financial Services, LLC
Conflict Check Party
HRRG
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Defendant
Trans Union, LLC
Plaintiff
Maritza Chavarria
Represented By
Gregory Michael Klote
Halvorsen Klote
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Healthcare Revenue Recovery Group, LLC
Terminated: 08/10/2023
Represented By
Kevin T Crocker
Barron Newburger PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/31/2023 6:43 PM CDT
Friday, March 31, 2023
1 1 18 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-29688501) filed by Maritza Chavarria.(Klote, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet