New Mexico District Court
Case #: 2:23-cr-00413
Case Filed:Mar 30, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Apr 02, 2023 1:31 AM MDT
Defendant
Alfonso Salcido Herrera, Jr. (1)
Represented By
Brock Benjamin
Brock M Benjamin
contact info
Interested Party
US Probation and Pretrial Services
Represented By
Brenda Richardson
U.S. Probation/pretrial
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Joni Autrey Stahl
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Matilda McCarthy Villalobos
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/02/2023 2:22 AM MDT
Friday, December 02, 2022
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Alfonso Salcido Herrera, Jr (1). (vh) [2:22-mj-01787-KRS]
Related: [-]
2 2 ARREST Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar as to Alfonso Salcido Herrera, Jr. Two certified copies of Complaint and ARREST Warrant delivered to USMS by interoffice mail box. Copy of Complaint and ARREST Warrant placed in USPPS mail box by CRD. (vh) [2:22-mj-01787-KRS]
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum by USA as to Alfonso Salcido Herrera, Jr. (Villalobos, Matilda) [2:22-mj-01787-KRS]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 05, 2022
Attorney update in case as to Alfonso Salcido Herrera, Jr. Attorney Joni Autrey Stahl for USA added. (cer) [2:22-mj-01787-KRS]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 06, 2022
4 4 ORDER FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD PROSEQUENDUM FOR CUSTODY OF DEFENDANT UNTIL COMPLETION OF FEDERAL CASE by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea granting3 Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum as to Alfonso Salcido Herrera Jr. (1) (cer)[2:22-mj-01787-KRS]
Related: [-]
5 5 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued as to Alfonso Salcido Herrera, Jr for 12/16/2022 at 9:00am via Zoom Video Conference in the Sierra Blanca Courtroom. (cer) [2:22-mj-01787-KRS]
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Alfonso Salcido Herrera, Jr: Initial Appearance set for 12/16/2022 at 09:00 AM in Las Cruces - 340 Sierra Blanca Courtroom (North Tower) - Remote before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. (cer) NOTE: 1. This proceeding will be held via Zoom Video/Web Conferencing with all participants appearing remotely; the Zoom ID and Passcode will be provided separately to the participants email address of record. 2. Participants should connect to the proceeding 15 minutes prior its scheduled start time to allow time for trouble-shooting of any connectivity issues. 3. To ensure the record is of the best quality participants are encouraged to utilize a headset to reduce static and background noise; if not using a headset participants must ensure the audio feed at their location is muted when not speaking. *** REMINDER: Recording or broadcasting of this hearing is prohibited. *** [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [2:22-mj-01787-KRS]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 09, 2022
Case unsealed as to Alfonso Salcido Herrera, Jr (rh) [2:22-mj-01787-KRS]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Alfonso Salcido Herrera, Jr (rh) [2:22-mj-01787-KRS]
Related: [-]
Set/Reset Hearings as to Alfonso Salcido Herrera, Jr: Initial Appearance set for 12/12/2022 at 09:05 AM in Las Cruces - 340 Sierra Blanca Courtroom (North Tower) - Remote before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. (rh) [2:22-mj-01787-KRS]
Related: [-]
7 7 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 12/09/2022 as to Alfonso Salcido Herrera, Jr. (cer) [2:22-mj-01787-KRS]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 12, 2022
8 8 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar: Initial Appearance as to Alfonso Salcido Herrera, Jr held on 12/12/2022. Related [+] (vh) [2:22-mj-01787-KRS]
Related: [-] cording Info: LCR Sierra Blanca
9 9 Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States' obligation to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, and orders it to do so. Failing to do so in a timely manner may result in consequences, including but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, or sanctions by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar (vh) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [2:22-mj-01787-KRS]
Related: [-]
10 10 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Alfonso Salcido Herrera, Jr: Preliminary/Detention Hearing set for 12/20/2022 at 09:00 AM in Las Cruces - 340 Sierra Blanca Courtroom (North Tower) - Remote before Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. (rh) NOTE: 1. This proceeding will be held via Zoom Video/Web Conferencing with all participants appearing remotely; the Zoom ID and Passcode will be provided separately to the participants email address of record. 2. Participants should connect to the proceeding 15 minutes prior its scheduled start time to allow time for trouble-shooting of any connectivity issues. 3. To ensure the record is of the best quality participants are encouraged to utilize a headset to reduce static and background noise; if not using a headset participants must ensure the audio feed at their location is muted when not speaking. *** REMINDER: Recording or broadcasting of this hearing is prohibited. *** [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [2:22-mj-01787-KRS]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 13, 2022
Attorney update in case as to Alfonso Salcido Herrera, Jr. Attorney Brock Benjamin for Alfonso Salcido Herrera, Jr added. (ac) [2:22-mj-01787-KRS]
Related: [-]
11 11 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Brock Benjamin appearing for Alfonso Salcido Herrera, Jr (Benjamin, Brock) [2:22-mj-01787-KRS]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 15, 2022
12 12 AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING (IN-PERSON) as to Alfonso Salcido Herrera, Jr: Preliminary/Detention Hearing set for 12/20/2022 at 10:30 AM in Las Cruces - 340 Sierra Blanca Courtroom (North Tower) before Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. (vrr) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [2:22-mj-01787-KRS]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 19, 2022
U.S. Probation and Pretrial Services added as interested party.(Richardson, Brenda) [2:22-mj-01787-KRS]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 20, 2022
15 15 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea: Preliminary/Detention Hearing as to Alfonso Salcido Herrera, Jr held on 12/20/2022 Related [+] (cer) [2:22-mj-01787-KRS]
Related: [-] cording Info: LCR-Sierra Blanca
16 16 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Alfonso Salcido Herrera, Jr by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea (cer) [2:22-mj-01787-KRS]
Related: [-]
17 17 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing/Grand Jury Presentment within 75 days for a total of 105 days pursuant to 18:3161 by Alfonso Salcido Herrera, Jr (cer) [2:22-mj-01787-KRS]
Related: [-]
18 18 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Alfonso Salcido Herrera, Jr by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea (cer) [2:22-mj-01787-KRS]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 03, 2023
19 19 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. The first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judge. Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judge's initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar no longer assigned to this case. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (rh) [2:22-mj-01787-KRS]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 27, 2023
20 20 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. The first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judge. Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judge's initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter no longer assigned to this case. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (vrr) [2:22-mj-01787-KRS]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 06, 2023
21 21 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Alfonso Salcido Herrera, Jr: Change of Plea Hearing set for 3/30/2023 at 02:00 PM in Las Cruces - 460 Organ Courtroom (South Tower) before Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. [ Interpreter Needed ](rh) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [2:22-mj-01787-KRS]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 30, 2023
22 22 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Kenneth J. Gonzales. The first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judge. Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judge's initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Judge Unassigned no longer assigned to this case. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kls)
Related: [-]
23 23 INFORMATION as to Alfonso Salcido Herrera, Jr (1) count(s) 1. (jn)
Related: [-]
24 24 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Alfonso Salcido Herrera, Jr (jn)
Related: [-]
25 25 CONSENT TO PLEA BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Alfonso Salcido Herrera, Jr (jn)
Related: [-]
26 26 PLEA AGREEMENT as to Alfonso Salcido Herrera, Jr (jn)
Related: [-]
27 27 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth: Plea Hearing as to Alfonso Salcido Herrera, Jr held on 3/30/2023, Plea entered by Alfonso Salcido Herrera Jr. (1) Guilty Count 1. Related [+] (Interpreter: Marcela Renna/Armida Hernandez) (jn)
Related: [-] cording Info: LCR - Organ