New York Northern District Court
Case #: 1:23-mj-00183
Case Filed:Mar 31, 2023
Last checked: Monday Apr 03, 2023 3:17 AM EDT
Defendant
David Dingman (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Rachel L Williams
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/03/2023 3:22 AM EDT
Friday, March 31, 2023
Case unsealed as to David Dingman (tab)
Related: [-]
Case sealed as to David Dingman (tab)
Related: [-]
Case unsealed as to David Dingman (tab)
Related: [-]
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel: Initial Appearance as to David Dingman held on 3/31/2023. The Defendant is advised of his rights and the maximum penalties are stated. Defendant is given a copy of the Complaint. The Defendant indicates that he is intending on retaining counsel and that is in the works. The Court inquires briefly of his financial status and ability to retain counsel. Defendant is directed to contact the Court if he will need to seek court appointed counsel. The Court issues the oral Rule 5(f) Reminder of Prosecutorial Obligation Order. A continuation of the Initial Appearance is set for Tuesday, 4/4/2023 @ 1:30 PM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel, to allow defendant to appear with counsel and be interviewed by Pretrial Services. The Court issues a standard Order setting conditions of release with the added condition under (7)(l). Defendant is released. (Court Reporter FTR recorded)[2:08pm-2:14pm] (tab)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs CRIMINAL COMPLAINT Related [+] as to David Dingman (1). (tab)
Related: [-] dacted
4 4 2 pgs MOTION to Seal Case by USA as to David Dingman. (tab)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs ORDER granting4 Motion to Seal Case as to David Dingman (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 3/31/2023.(tab)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Public Order
6 6 3 pgs ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS OF RELEASE as to David Dingman (1) ROR with standard and special condition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 3/31/2023. (tab)
Related: [-]