Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Stephen J Murphy, III
Referred: Elizabeth A Stafford
Case #: 2:23-cv-10760
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1983 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2023
Terminated:May 06, 2025
Last checked: Friday Oct 13, 2023 4:10 PM EDT
Defendant
John Doe
Defendant
Naphcare Inc
2090 Columbiana Rd
Birmingham, AL 35216
Represented By
Jonathan C. Lanesky
Chapman Law Group
contact info
Defendant
Wayne, County of
Represented By
Nicholas Pillow
Chapman Law Group
contact info
Anthony Monticciolo
Wayne County Corporation Counsel
contact info
Jonathan C. Lanesky
Chapman Law Group
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenneth Stimmel
Represented By
Matthew Boehringer
The Mark Sisson Law
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
The Andrew C. Baird Detention Facility
Terminated: 08/03/2023
Defendant
Wayne County Jail Division 1
Terminated: 08/03/2023
Defendant
Wayne County Sheriff
Terminated: 08/03/2023
Represented By
Anthony Monticciolo
Wayne County Corporation Counsel
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
41 41 order Judgment* Tue 05/06 3:27 PM
JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (RLou)
Related: [-]
40 40 5 pgs order Order Tue 05/06 3:21 PM
ORDER Dismissing Case With Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (RLou)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
39 39 order Show Cause Thu 05/01 2:10 PM
ORDER to Show Cause. Show Cause Response due by 5/5/2025 . Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (RLou)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
38 38 1 pgs order Order Mon 03/03 8:54 AM
ORDER Requiring Joint Status Report. Joint Status Report due by 3/7/2025 . Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (RLou)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
37 37 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Wed 02/05 4:25 PM
STIPULATED ORDER Amending Deadlines. ( Discovery due by 3/10/2025 , Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 3/28/2025 , Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/1/2025 at 2:00 AM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III , Jury Trial set for 10/14/2025 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III ). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (RLou)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
36 36 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Thu 12/05 3:58 PM
STIPULATED ORDER Extending Deadlines. ( Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 3/10/2025 , Discovery due by 3/28/2025 , Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/1/2025 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III , Jury Trial set for 10/14/2025 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III ). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (RLou)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
35 35 1 pgs order Order Mon 12/02 5:08 PM
ORDER Requiring Joint Status Report. Joint Status Report due by 1/7/2025 . Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (RLou)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
34 34 notice Correction Wed 07/24 11:57 AM
NOTICE of Correction re 7/24/2024 Minute Entry for Scheduling Conference. (RLou)
Related: [-]
33 33 order Stipulation and Order Wed 07/24 11:48 AM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (RLou)
Related: [-]
32 32 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Wed 07/24 11:46 AM
STIPULATED ORDER Extending Discovery Deadlines. ( Discovery due by 12/31/2024 , Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 2/7/2025 , Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/2/2025 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III , Jury Trial set for 7/15/2025 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III ). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (RLou)
Related: [-]
minutes Scheduling Conference Wed 07/24 11:50 AM
[DOCKET ERROR - FILED IN INCORRECT CASE] Minute Entry for remote proceedings before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III: Scheduling Conference held on 7/24/2024. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (RLou) Modified on 7/24/2024 (RLou)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
31 31 order Stipulation and Order Wed 06/05 11:50 AM
STIPULATED ORDER Regarding Medical Records. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (RLou)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
30 30 order Scheduling Order Wed 03/13 3:48 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/29/2024 , Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 12/9/2024 , Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/30/2025 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III , Jury Trial set for 5/14/2025 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III . Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. Related [+] (RLou)
Related: [-] fer to image for additional dates
minutes Scheduling Conference Wed 03/13 3:47 PM
Minute Entry for remote proceedings before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III: Scheduling Conference held on 3/13/2024. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (RLou)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
29 29 respm Response to Motion Thu 02/29 4:09 PM
RESPONSE to22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Response to SHOW CAUSE, RULE 26 filed by Kenneth Stimmel. (Boehringer, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
28 28 notice Notice - Other Wed 02/28 4:57 PM
NOTICE by Naphcare Inc Response to show cause order (Pillow, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
27 27 order Show Cause Wed 02/28 3:41 PM
ORDER to Show Cause. Show Cause Response due by 3/1/2024 . Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (RLou)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Report - Free Wed 02/28 9:53 AM
JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN UNDER RULE 26(f) REPORT by Naphcare Inc (Pillow, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 02/27 5:06 PM
Reset Conference: Scheduling Conference RESET for 3/13/2024 at 10:15 AM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III (RLou)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
25 25 9 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 02/07 2:53 PM
ORDER Requiring Joint Discovery Plan and Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference ( Scheduling Conference set for 2/28/2024 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Stephen J. Murphy III ). Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (RLou)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
24 24 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 12/14 5:01 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Naphcare Inc. (Lanesky, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
23 23 7 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 11/30 12:25 PM
ORDER Denying22 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint and Denying as Moot19 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (RLou)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
22 22 motion Dismiss Thu 09/14 6:12 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Naphcare Inc, Wayne, County of. (Lanesky, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
21 21 service Summons Issued* Wed 09/06 3:14 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *Naphcare Inc* (SSch)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 31, 2023
20 20 cmp Civil Case - Complaint, Amended Thu 08/31 11:53 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Kenneth Stimmel against John Doe, Wayne, County of, Naphcare Inc. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Boehringer, Matthew)
Related: [-]
service Request for Additional Summons Thu 08/31 11:54 AM
REQUEST for SUMMONS for Naphcare Inc. (Boehringer, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2023
19 19 motion Dismiss Thu 08/17 10:27 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Wayne, County of. (Lanesky, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 15, 2023
18 18 misc Attorney Appearance Tue 08/15 1:05 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Nicholas Pillow appearing on behalf of Wayne, County of (Pillow, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Attorney Appearance Tue 08/15 12:38 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jonathan C. Lanesky appearing on behalf of Wayne, County of (Lanesky, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2023
16 16 cmp Civil Case - Complaint, Amended Mon 08/14 12:49 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Kenneth Stimmel against Wayne, County of. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Boehringer, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 03, 2023
15 15 order Amending Case Caption Thu 08/03 10:33 AM
STIPULATED ORDER amending the caption to reflect the proper defendants and setting aside order of default. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (TTho)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
14 14 notice Appearance Tue 08/01 11:51 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Monticciolo on behalf of Wayne County Sheriff. (Monticciolo, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 25, 2023
13 13 order Clerks Entry of Default* Tue 07/25 8:20 AM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Wayne County Jail Division 1* (DPer)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Clerks Entry of Default* Tue 07/25 8:20 AM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *The Andrew C. Baird Detention Facility* (DPer)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Clerks Entry of Default* Tue 07/25 8:19 AM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Wayne County Sheriff* (DPer)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 24, 2023
10 10 petition Request for Clerks Entry of Default Mon 07/24 3:48 PM
REQUEST FOR CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to The Andrew C. Baird Detention Facility, Wayne County Jail Division 1, Wayne County Sheriff by Kenneth Stimmel. (Boehringer, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 19, 2023
9 9 order Show Cause - Failure to Prosecute* Wed 07/19 10:01 AM
ORDER for Plaintiff to Show Cause Why This Case Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute. Show Cause Response due by 7/26/2023 . Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (RLou)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 12, 2023
8 8 respoth Response to Order to Show Cause Wed 07/12 10:55 AM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Kenneth Stimmel. (Boehringer, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 11, 2023
7 7 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Tue 07/11 3:25 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Wayne County Jail Division 1 served on 6/26/2023, answer due 7/17/2023. (Boehringer, Matthew)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Tue 07/11 3:19 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. The Andrew C. Baird Detention Facility served on 6/26/2023, answer due 7/17/2023. (Boehringer, Matthew)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Tue 07/11 3:15 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Wayne County Sheriff served on 6/26/2023, answer due 7/17/2023. (Boehringer, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 06, 2023
4 4 order Show Cause - Failure to Prosecute* Thu 07/06 9:02 AM
ORDER for Plaintiff to Show Cause Why This Case Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute. Show Cause Response due by 7/14/2023 . Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (RLou)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 04, 2023
3 3 order Reassignment/Disqualification Tue 04/04 1:14 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Linda V. Parker and Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti to District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford. (SSch)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 03, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued* Mon 04/03 3:50 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *The Andrew C. Baird Detention Facility, Wayne County Jail Division 1, Wayne County Sheriff* (NAhm)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Complaint Mon 04/03 2:40 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Kenneth Stimmel against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9298199 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne County - County Where Action Arose: Wayne County - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne County. [ Previously dismissed case: Eastern District of Michigan Southern Division, 2:23-cv-10285, Judge Stephen J. Murphy III] [ Possible companion case(s): Eastern District of Michigan Southern Division, 2:23-cv-10285, Judge Stephen J. Murphy III ] (Boehringer, Matthew)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Mon 04/03 3:51 PM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (NAhm)
Related: [-]