Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Hope T Cannon
Case #: 3:23-cv-07410
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2023
Terminated:May 05, 2023
Last checked: Friday Oct 13, 2023 11:36 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Plaintiff
STEVE SEEKER
Represented By
JASON BENJAMIN WOLF
Parafinczuk & Wolf - Fort Lauderdale Fl
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 05, 2023
4 4 30+ pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 05/09 12:56 PM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibits A and B are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with a court order. Active-duty plaintiffs and non-veterans are hereby granted leave to file a motion to reopen their case which must be accompanied by a statement clarifying their status with respect to military service. Any motion to reopen on this basis must be filed only on the individual docket for a plaintiff's case by June 5, 2023. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the main MDL docket and on the individual dockets and close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/5/2023. (erl)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 03, 2023
3 3 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Mon 04/03 1:43 PM
NOTICE of Designated Forum- PAED by STEVE SEEKER (WOLF, JASON)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 04/03 1:42 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (WOLF, JASON)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 04/03 1:41 PM
COMPLAINT AND TRIAL JURY DEMAND against 3M COMPANY, filed by STEVE SEEKER. (WOLF, JASON)
Related: [-]