California Central District Court
Judge:Sherilyn Peace Garnett
Referred: Patricia Donahue
Case #: 5:23-cv-00583
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1446 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2023
Terminated:May 09, 2024
Case in other court:Riverside County Superior Court, CVRI2300198
Last checked: Friday Oct 13, 2023 4:06 AM PDT
Defendant
Roadrunner Transportation Services, Inc.
Represented By
Kathy M Huynh
Husch Blackwell LLP
contact info
Tyler Mark Paetkau
Husch Blackwell LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Jose Padilla
Represented By
Michael J S Calvo
James Hawkins Aplc
contact info
James R Hawkins
James Hawkins Aplc
contact info
Ava Issary
James Hawkins Aplc
contact info
Lauren Ashley Falk
James Hawkins Aplc
contact info
Gregory E. Mauro
James Hawkins Aplc
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, May 09, 2024
10 10 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Fri 05/10 10:36 AM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. Plaintiff filed a stipulation of dismissal9 , which is effective to close the case pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). The case is therefore closed. Accordingly, the Court strikes the proposed order as moot, and all pending dates are vacated and taken off calendar.(Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv)
Related: [-]
9 9 stip Dismiss Case Thu 05/09 10:41 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by PLAINTIFF Jose Padilla.(Hawkins, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 12, 2023
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 04/12 3:17 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Roadrunner Transportation Services, Inc. identifying Roadrunner Transportation Services, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Huynh, Kathy)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 10, 2023
7 7 order Transferring Case purs GO 21-01 (Related Case)(CV-34) Mon 04/10 3:09 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:21-cv-04657-SPG-PDx. Case transferred from Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato to Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:23-cv-00583-SPG-PDx. Signed by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (aco)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 04/05 10:32 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 04/05 10:31 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 04/05 10:31 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 03, 2023
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/03 5:23 PM
Notice of Related Case filed by Defendant Roadrunner Transportation Services, Inc.. (Paetkau, Tyler)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 04/03 5:20 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Roadrunner Transportation Services, Inc.. (Paetkau, Tyler)
Related: [-]
1 1 84 pgs notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 04/03 5:18 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside County Superior Court, case number CVRI2300198 Receipt No: ACACDC-35072054 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Roadrunner Transportation Services, Inc.. (Attorney Tyler Mark Paetkau added to party Roadrunner Transportation Services, Inc.(pty:dft))(Paetkau, Tyler)
Related: [-]
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Wed 04/05 10:35 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-50, inclusive, Roadrunner Transportation Services, Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Jose Padilla. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/20/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 04/05 10:38 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jose Padilla, upon Defendant Roadrunner Transportation Services, Inc. served on 3/3/2023, answer due 3/24/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jessie Gastelum, Intake Specialist, CT Corporation System, Registered Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/10/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT G) (ghap)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 04/05 10:41 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jose Padilla, upon Defendant Roadrunner Freight served on 3/6/2023, answer due 3/27/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon LaChaun Vernon, Office Manager in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 3/10/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT G) (ghap) Modified on 4/5/2023 (ghap)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Wed 04/05 10:43 AM
NON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Roadrunner Transportation Services, Inc. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT J)(ghap)
Related: [-]