Mir et al v. Jaddou
Nebraska District Court | |
Judge: | Joseph F Bataillon |
Case #: | 4:23-cv-03046 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 05:551 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 03, 2023 |
Terminated: | Dec 29, 2023 |
Last checked: Friday Oct 13, 2023 5:05 AM CDT |
Defendant
Ur Jaddou
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Muhammad Arif
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Farooq Aslam
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
BF
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jose Manuel Becerra Torres
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chaitali Brahmbhatt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Selene Castro Cardiel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sonia Veronica Chavez Moreno
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Keri Colleen Cooper Sabillon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DH
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sai Nischal Dasari
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alexis M. De La Cruz Castro
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jose De La Cruz Ortiz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rodrigo De Oliveira
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Biren Noorddin Dodhiya
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Parin Dodhiya
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karla Dominguez Espinoza
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maria De Los Angeles Duran Elias
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sohni Farooq
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rosalio Felix Guzman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Enrique Felix Torres
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pablo Ferreira
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sandro Garcia Martinez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laura Garza
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Milton Ricardo Herrera Monterroso
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Salma Iqbal
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aryan Kabani
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Meera Kalimata Tanikella
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arf Karedia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sajjad Khoja
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lien Le
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ha Eun Lee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Flavita Lobo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jesica Auxiliadora Marenco Alguera
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karla Mendoza
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rashid Mir
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Luciano Miranda Rosas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mahmood Mohammad
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Camilo Munoz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Asha Kolagunda Nagappa Shetty
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vishnu Priya Narra
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mayur Nayak
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vishal Nayak
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dung Ngoc Thi Nguyen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Huy Nguyen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sagar Palande
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karthik Panyala
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edith Perez Lara
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RM
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sakshi Rai
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricio Ramirez Sanchez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shiva Leela Rathod
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Eduardo Reyes Lopez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Martha Candelaria Reyes Mendieta
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Luz Maria Reyes Torres
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Francis Andreaa Ruiz Marenco
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SRH
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sofiyan Samnani
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jorge Sanchez Herrera
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Manpreet Singh
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Layza Tonelotti
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aleem Vadhwania
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Noorallah Vadhwania
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shelina Vadhwania
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jaahnavi Vajje
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lanny Vazquez Lopez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Osbaldo Vazquez Reyes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Luis Antonio Yanez Aguirre
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marco Alejandro Yanez Aguirre
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marco Antonio Yanez Alba
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kattia Zuniga
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sonal Kayum Kabani
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kayum Samshudinbhai Kayum
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
AD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
AG
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
AJSD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
AM
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
AP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
AVRS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Beronica Alvarado
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Milton Amador
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yesenia Araujo Domingues
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Erasmo Arriaga
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bhumibahen Barot
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leslie Zureidy Benitez Angeles
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robinson Andres Benitez Gonzalez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yadira Marlen Berrones Nieto
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pooja Bhatt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Julio Cesar Bonilla Garcia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CAMQ
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maryi Cabrera
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Flor Virginia Carrillo Morales
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Denisse Abato Castillo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rocio Coronado
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Emiliano Cruz Dominguez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bayarmaa Dambadorj
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ayman Daredia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rounak Daredia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sadiq Daredia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Norma Angelica Delgado Chavez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marco Antonio Delgado Nieves
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rahim Dhanani
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Reshma Dhanani
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
EE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bold Enkhtuya
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hector Flores
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alejandro Flores Canela
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GM
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elsa Galindo de Leon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Julio Garcia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nilam Ghanshyambhai
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Margarito Gomez Martinez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Odilia Gomez Quiquivix
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ruth Angeles Guadarrama
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Abilene Gutierrez Solorzano
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Erasmo Guzman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Luis Hernandez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jiandan Hu
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nawaz Jiwani
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
KG
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Abdul Aziz Khoja
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Darshak Kikani
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LERS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sintia Jackeline Lemus Cardoza
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yuval Lerman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Erika Judith Llamas Soltero
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Armando Lovera
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karla Maldonado
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alvaro Malta
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Moises Moises Martinez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pratik Matkar
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Benjamin Ramon Matus
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bianka Massiel Matus Fonseca
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shivani Nilesh Mehta
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jose Luis Mendoza
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Solanki Miteshkumar
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yesica Liliana Muela Pando
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Murad Jafarali Mukhida
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rita Murad Mukhida
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NT
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rahim Noorani
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Enkhbayar Nyamsambuu
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Akshay Patel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alpeshkumar Patel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aratiben Patel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arpitkumar Patel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ashaben Patel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Belaben Patel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bharatkumar Patel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bhoomi Dikshep Patel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bhupeshkumar Patel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deepal Patel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Devang Patel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dikshep Mahendrabhai Patel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ghansyambhai Patel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Janakkumar Patel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jayeshkumar Patel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jignashaben Patel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jignesh Kumar Patel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jitendrakumar Patel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kanaiyalal Patel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nareshkumar Patel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Navin Patel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Niravkumar Patel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nishaben Patel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Prayagkumar Patel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
PremalKumar Jagdishbhai Patel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Princekumar Mahendrabhai Patel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rajendrakumar Keshavlal Patel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ravikumar Patel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ritaben Patel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sanjaykumar Patel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vimlaben Patel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ingrid Perez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Manuela Perez Garcia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Martha Perez Gonzalez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Abraham B Poac Ochoa
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chandrika Prajapati
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Heenaben Prajapati
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jayeshkumar Prajapati
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jaykumar Nitinkumar Prajapati
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Naina Ishwarbhai Prajapati
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nitinkumar Narayanbhai Prajapati
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ved Nitinkumar Prajapati
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maria Magdalena Quesada Duran
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Miguel Angel Reategui Diaz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rushil Reji
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Reyes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eutiquio Reyes Garcia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mario Fernando Reyes Zuniga
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maria Rivera
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lorena Rodriguez Hernandez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Luis Alfonso Ruiz Reatiga
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SBS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Yalill de Jesus Salazar Feria
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Monica Sanchez Arteaga
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bertha Sanchez Godinez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carlos Gerardo Sanchez Martinez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ganchimeg Sanjaa
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anish Sayani
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Salima Sayani
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ana Karen Silva Montoya
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Oscar Suarez Zamudio
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nourien Surani
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hila Ofer Tanamy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jiteshkumar Tawar
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Semina Tawar
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nolvia Elizabeth Torres Iriarte
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cristopher Torres Ramos
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Monica Torres Ramos
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maria Vazquez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Salvador Ventura
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roland Villamor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ZS
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Friday, December 29, 2023 | ||
41 | 41
![]() ORDER OF DISMISSAL: This matter comes before the Court on the parties' Stipulation of Dismissal under specific terms agreed to by the parties. Filing No. 40. The Court, being advised in the premises, finds that such an Order is proper. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that this action be dismissed in accordance with the parties' agreed-upon terms pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB) |
|
Friday, December 22, 2023 | ||
40 | 40
![]() UNOPPOSED STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL by Attorney Tia L. Hockenberry on behalf of Defendant Ur Jaddou.(Hockenberry, Tia) |
|
Thursday, December 21, 2023 | ||
39 | 39
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading
Thu 12/21 10:44 AM
TEXT ORDER granting38 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Although the motion is opposed, the Court finds Defendant has demonstrated good cause for a short extension of the answer deadline. As such, the deadline for Defendant to file an answer is extended to January 5, 2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN) |
|
Wednesday, December 20, 2023 | ||
38 | 38
![]() MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Tia L. Hockenberry on behalf of Defendant Ur Jaddou.(Hockenberry, Tia) |
|
Friday, December 08, 2023 | ||
37 | 37
![]() MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Defendant's motion to dismiss, Filing No. 24, is granted in part and denied in part as set forth herein. Plaintiffs Darshak Kikani, Biren Noorddin Dodhiya, Parin Dodhiya, B.D., Julio Garcia, Eutiquio Garcia, A.G., and Emiliano Cruz Dominguez are dismissed from the case. Defendant is ordered to answer the remaining Plaintiffs claims in their Amended Complaint within 14 days of the date of this order. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB) |
|
Wednesday, December 06, 2023 | ||
36 | 36
![]() NOTICE of Partial Voluntary Dismissal by Attorney Bradley B. Banias on behalf of Plaintiffs Bhoomi Dikshep Patel, Dikshep Mahendrabhai Patel, Princekumar Mahendrabhai Patel, Kevin Eduardo Reyes Lopez, Kattia Zuniga (Banias, Bradley) |
|
Friday, December 01, 2023 | ||
35 | 35
![]() RESPONSE regarding Notice (Other)34 by Attorney Bradley B. Banias on behalf of Plaintiffs AD, AG, AJSD, AM, AP, AVRS, Beronica Alvarado, Milton Amador, Yesenia Araujo Domingues, Muhammad Arif, Erasmo Arriaga, Farooq Aslam, BD, BF, Bhumibahen Barot, Jose Manuel Becerra Torres, Leslie Zureidy Benitez Angeles, Robinson Andres Benitez Gonzalez, Yadira Marlen Berrones Nieto, Pooja Bhatt, Julio Cesar Bonilla Garcia, Chaitali Brahmbhatt, CAMQ, Maryi Cabrera, Flor Virginia Carrillo Morales, Denisse Abato Castillo, Selene Castro Cardiel, Sonia Veronica Chavez Moreno, Keri Colleen Cooper Sabillon, Rocio Coronado, Emiliano Cruz Dominguez, DH, DN, Bayarmaa Dambadorj, Ayman Daredia, Rounak Daredia, Sadiq Daredia, Sai Nischal Dasari, Alexis M. De La Cruz Castro, Jose De La Cruz Ortiz, Rodrigo De Oliveira, Norma Angelica Delgado Chavez, Marco Antonio Delgado Nieves, Rahim Dhanani, Reshma Dhanani, Biren Noorddin Dodhiya, Parin Dodhiya, Karla Dominguez Espinoza, Maria De Los Angeles Duran Elias, EE, Bold Enkhtuya, Sohni Farooq, Rosalio Felix Guzman, Enrique Felix Torres, Pablo Ferreira, Hector Flores, Alejandro Flores Canela, GM, Elsa Galindo de Leon, Julio Garcia, Sandro Garcia Martinez, Laura Garza, Nilam Ghanshyambhai, Margarito Gomez Martinez, Odilia Gomez Quiquivix, Ruth Angeles Guadarrama, Abilene Gutierrez Solorzano, Erasmo Guzman, Luis Hernandez, Milton Ricardo Herrera Monterroso, Jiandan Hu, Salma Iqbal, JP, Nawaz Jiwani, KG, Aryan Kabani, Sonal Kayum Kabani, Meera Kalimata Tanikella, Arf Karedia, Kayum Samshudinbhai Kayum, Abdul Aziz Khoja, Sajjad Khoja, Darshak Kikani, LERS, Lien Le, Ha Eun Lee, Sintia Jackeline Lemus Cardoza, Yuval Lerman, Erika Judith Llamas Soltero, Flavita Lobo, Armando Lovera, MN, Karla Maldonado, Alvaro Malta, Jesica Auxiliadora Marenco Alguera, Moises Moises Martinez, Pratik Matkar, Benjamin Ramon Matus, Bianka Massiel Matus Fonseca, Shivani Nilesh Mehta, Jose Luis Mendoza, Karla Mendoza, Rashid Mir, Luciano Miranda Rosas, Solanki Miteshkumar, Mahmood Mohammad, Yesica Liliana Muela Pando, Murad Jafarali Mukhida, Rita Murad Mukhida, Camilo Munoz, NT, Asha Kolagunda Nagappa Shetty, Vishnu Priya Narra, Mayur Nayak, Vishal Nayak, Dung Ngoc Thi Nguyen, Huy Nguyen, Rahim Noorani, Enkhbayar Nyamsambuu, PP, Sagar Palande, Karthik Panyala, Akshay Patel, Alpeshkumar Patel, Aratiben Patel, Arpitkumar Patel, Ashaben Patel, Belaben Patel, Bharatkumar Patel, Bhoomi Dikshep Patel, Bhupeshkumar Patel, Deepal Patel, Devang Patel, Dikshep Mahendrabhai Patel, Ghansyambhai Patel, Janakkumar Patel, Jayeshkumar Patel, Jignashaben Patel, Jignesh Kumar Patel, Jitendrakumar Patel, Kanaiyalal Patel, Nareshkumar Patel, Navin Patel, Niravkumar Patel, Nishaben Patel, Prayagkumar Patel, PremalKumar Jagdishbhai Patel, Princekumar Mahendrabhai Patel, Rajendrakumar Keshavlal Patel, Ravikumar Patel, Ritaben Patel, Sanjaykumar Patel, Vimlaben Patel, Ingrid Perez, Manuela Perez Garcia, Martha Perez Gonzalez, Edith Perez Lara, Abraham B Poac Ochoa, Heenaben Prajapati, Jayeshkumar Prajapati, Jaykumar Nitinkumar Prajapati, Naina Ishwarbhai Prajapati, Chandrika Prajapati, Nitinkumar Narayanbhai Prajapati, Ved Nitinkumar Prajapati, Maria Magdalena Quesada Duran, RM, Sakshi Rai, Patricio Ramirez Sanchez, Shiva Leela Rathod, Miguel Angel Reategui Diaz, Rushil Reji, Elizabeth Reyes, Eutiquio Reyes Garcia, Kevin Eduardo Reyes Lopez, Martha Candelaria Reyes Mendieta, Luz Maria Reyes Torres, Mario Fernando Reyes Zuniga, Maria Rivera, Lorena Rodriguez Hernandez, Francis Andreaa Ruiz Marenco, Luis Alfonso Ruiz Reatiga, SBS, SP, SRH, Yalill de Jesus Salazar Feria, Sofiyan Samnani, Monica Sanchez Arteaga, Bertha Sanchez Godinez, Jorge Sanchez Herrera, Carlos Gerardo Sanchez Martinez, Ganchimeg Sanjaa, Anish Sayani, Salima Sayani, Ana Karen Silva Montoya, Manpreet Singh, Oscar Suarez Zamudio, Nourien Surani, Hila Ofer Tanamy, Jiteshkumar Tawar, Semina Tawar, Layza Tonelotti, Nolvia Elizabeth Torres Iriarte, Cristopher Torres Ramos, Monica Torres Ramos, Aleem Vadhwania, Noorallah Vadhwania, Shelina Vadhwania, Jaahnavi Vajje, Maria Vazquez, Lanny Vazquez Lopez, Osbaldo Vazquez Reyes, Salvador Ventura, Roland Villamor, Luis Antonio Yanez Aguirre, Marco Alejandro Yanez Aguirre, Marco Antonio Yanez Alba, ZS, Kattia Zuniga.(Banias, Bradley) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, November 22, 2023 | ||
34 | 34
![]() NOTICE of SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by Attorney Tia L. Hockenberry on behalf of Defendant Ur Jaddou(Hockenberry, Tia) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, November 09, 2023 | ||
33 | 33
![]() NOTICE of Waiting List Adjudication by Attorney Tia L. Hockenberry on behalf of Defendant Ur Jaddou(Hockenberry, Tia) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, November 08, 2023 | ||
32 | 32
order
Order - Text Only
Wed 11/08 9:51 AM
TEXT ORDER: Plaintiffs' motion for oral argument, Filing No.30 , is denied. The Court will issue a decision on the pending motion to dismiss in due course. Ordered by Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (AEV) |
|
Tuesday, November 07, 2023 | ||
31 | 31
![]() RESPONSE regarding MOTION Oral Argument or, in the alternative, an Expedited Decision 30 by Attorney Tashiba M. Peoples on behalf of Defendant Ur Jaddou.(Peoples, Tashiba) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, November 06, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
![]() MOTION Oral Argument or, in the alternative, an Expedited Decision by Attorney Bradley B. Banias on behalf of Plaintiffs AD, AG, AJSD, AM, AP, AVRS, Beronica Alvarado, Milton Amador, Yesenia Araujo Domingues, Muhammad Arif, Erasmo Arriaga, Farooq Aslam, BD, BF, Bhumibahen Barot, Jose Manuel Becerra Torres, Leslie Zureidy Benitez Angeles, Robinson Andres Benitez Gonzalez, Yadira Marlen Berrones Nieto, Pooja Bhatt, Julio Cesar Bonilla Garcia, Chaitali Brahmbhatt, CAMQ, Maryi Cabrera, Flor Virginia Carrillo Morales, Denisse Abato Castillo, Selene Castro Cardiel, Sonia Veronica Chavez Moreno, Keri Colleen Cooper Sabillon, Rocio Coronado, Emiliano Cruz Dominguez, DH, DN, Bayarmaa Dambadorj, Ayman Daredia, Rounak Daredia, Sadiq Daredia, Sai Nischal Dasari, Alexis M. De La Cruz Castro, Jose De La Cruz Ortiz, Rodrigo De Oliveira, Norma Angelica Delgado Chavez, Marco Antonio Delgado Nieves, Rahim Dhanani, Reshma Dhanani, Biren Noorddin Dodhiya, Parin Dodhiya, Karla Dominguez Espinoza, Maria De Los Angeles Duran Elias, EE, Bold Enkhtuya, Sohni Farooq, Rosalio Felix Guzman, Enrique Felix Torres, Pablo Ferreira, Hector Flores, Alejandro Flores Canela, GM, Elsa Galindo de Leon, Julio Garcia, Sandro Garcia Martinez, Laura Garza, Nilam Ghanshyambhai, Margarito Gomez Martinez, Odilia Gomez Quiquivix, Ruth Angeles Guadarrama, Abilene Gutierrez Solorzano, Erasmo Guzman, Luis Hernandez, Milton Ricardo Herrera Monterroso, Jiandan Hu, Salma Iqbal, JP, Nawaz Jiwani, KG, Aryan Kabani, Sonal Kayum Kabani, Meera Kalimata Tanikella, Arf Karedia, Kayum Samshudinbhai Kayum, Abdul Aziz Khoja, Sajjad Khoja, Darshak Kikani, LERS, Lien Le, Ha Eun Lee, Sintia Jackeline Lemus Cardoza, Yuval Lerman, Erika Judith Llamas Soltero, Flavita Lobo, Armando Lovera, MN, Karla Maldonado, Alvaro Malta, Jesica Auxiliadora Marenco Alguera, Moises Moises Martinez, Pratik Matkar, Benjamin Ramon Matus, Bianka Massiel Matus Fonseca, Shivani Nilesh Mehta, Jose Luis Mendoza, Karla Mendoza, Rashid Mir, Luciano Miranda Rosas, Solanki Miteshkumar, Mahmood Mohammad, Yesica Liliana Muela Pando, Murad Jafarali Mukhida, Rita Murad Mukhida, Camilo Munoz, NT, Asha Kolagunda Nagappa Shetty, Vishnu Priya Narra, Mayur Nayak, Vishal Nayak, Dung Ngoc Thi Nguyen, Huy Nguyen, Rahim Noorani, Enkhbayar Nyamsambuu, PP, Sagar Palande, Karthik Panyala, Akshay Patel, Alpeshkumar Patel, Aratiben Patel, Arpitkumar Patel, Ashaben Patel, Belaben Patel, Bharatkumar Patel, Bhoomi Dikshep Patel, Bhupeshkumar Patel, Deepal Patel, Devang Patel, Dikshep Mahendrabhai Patel, Ghansyambhai Patel, Janakkumar Patel, Jayeshkumar Patel, Jignashaben Patel, Jignesh Kumar Patel, Jitendrakumar Patel, Kanaiyalal Patel, Nareshkumar Patel, Navin Patel, Niravkumar Patel, Nishaben Patel, Prayagkumar Patel, PremalKumar Jagdishbhai Patel, Princekumar Mahendrabhai Patel, Rajendrakumar Keshavlal Patel, Ravikumar Patel, Ritaben Patel, Sanjaykumar Patel, Vimlaben Patel, Ingrid Perez, Manuela Perez Garcia, Martha Perez Gonzalez, Edith Perez Lara, Abraham B Poac Ochoa, Heenaben Prajapati, Jayeshkumar Prajapati, Jaykumar Nitinkumar Prajapati, Naina Ishwarbhai Prajapati, Chandrika Prajapati, Nitinkumar Narayanbhai Prajapati, Ved Nitinkumar Prajapati, Maria Magdalena Quesada Duran, RM, Sakshi Rai, Patricio Ramirez Sanchez, Shiva Leela Rathod, Miguel Angel Reategui Diaz, Rushil Reji, Elizabeth Reyes, Eutiquio Reyes Garcia, Kevin Eduardo Reyes Lopez, Martha Candelaria Reyes Mendieta, Luz Maria Reyes Torres, Mario Fernando Reyes Zuniga, Maria Rivera, Lorena Rodriguez Hernandez, Francis Andreaa Ruiz Marenco, Luis Alfonso Ruiz Reatiga, SBS, SP, SRH, Yalill de Jesus Salazar Feria, Sofiyan Samnani, Monica Sanchez Arteaga, Bertha Sanchez Godinez, Jorge Sanchez Herrera, Carlos Gerardo Sanchez Martinez, Ganchimeg Sanjaa, Anish Sayani, Salima Sayani, Ana Karen Silva Montoya, Manpreet Singh, Oscar Suarez Zamudio, Nourien Surani, Hila Ofer Tanamy, Jiteshkumar Tawar, Semina Tawar, Layza Tonelotti, Nolvia Elizabeth Torres Iriarte, Cristopher Torres Ramos, Monica Torres Ramos, Aleem Vadhwania, Noorallah Vadhwania, Shelina Vadhwania, Jaahnavi Vajje, Maria Vazquez, Lanny Vazquez Lopez, Osbaldo Vazquez Reyes, Salvador Ventura, Roland Villamor, Luis Antonio Yanez Aguirre, Marco Alejandro Yanez Aguirre, Marco Antonio Yanez Alba, ZS, Kattia Zuniga.(Banias, Bradley) |
|
Friday, October 20, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
![]() NOTICE of WAITING LIST ADJUDICATION by Attorney Tia L. Hockenberry on behalf of Defendant Ur Jaddou(Hockenberry, Tia) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, October 13, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Nolvia Elizabeth Torres Iriarte, Mario Fernando Reyes Zuniga, Manpreet Singh, Sajjad Khoja, Arayn Kabani, Sonal Kabani, Kayum Kabani and Arf Karedia by Attorney Bradley B. Banias on behalf of Plaintiffs Aryan Kabani, Sonal Kayum Kabani, Arf Karedia, Sajjad Khoja, Mario Fernando Reyes Zuniga, Manpreet Singh, Nolvia Elizabeth Torres Iriarte (Banias, Bradley) |
|
Tuesday, September 12, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
![]() REPLY BRIEF in support of Brief,25 , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION 24 by Attorney Tia L. Hockenberry on behalf of Defendant Ur Jaddou.(Hockenberry, Tia) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Tuesday, September 05, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
![]() RESPONSE regarding Brief,25 , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION 24 by Attorney Bradley B. Banias on behalf of Plaintiffs AD, AG, AJSD, AM, AP, AVRS, Beronica Alvarado, Milton Amador, Yesenia Araujo Domingues, Muhammad Arif, Erasmo Arriaga, Farooq Aslam, BD, BF, Bhumibahen Barot, Jose Manuel Becerra Torres, Leslie Zureidy Benitez Angeles, Robinson Andres Benitez Gonzalez, Yadira Marlen Berrones Nieto, Pooja Bhatt, Julio Cesar Bonilla Garcia, Chaitali Brahmbhatt, CAMQ, Maryi Cabrera, Flor Virginia Carrillo Morales, Denisse Abato Castillo, Selene Castro Cardiel, Sonia Veronica Chavez Moreno, Keri Colleen Cooper Sabillon, Rocio Coronado, Emiliano Cruz Dominguez, DH, DN, Bayarmaa Dambadorj, Ayman Daredia, Rounak Daredia, Sadiq Daredia, Sai Nischal Dasari, Alexis M. De La Cruz Castro, Jose De La Cruz Ortiz, Rodrigo De Oliveira, Norma Angelica Delgado Chavez, Marco Antonio Delgado Nieves, Rahim Dhanani, Reshma Dhanani, Biren Noorddin Dodhiya, Parin Dodhiya, Karla Dominguez Espinoza, Maria De Los Angeles Duran Elias, EE, Bold Enkhtuya, Sohni Farooq, Rosalio Felix Guzman, Enrique Felix Torres, Pablo Ferreira, Hector Flores, Alejandro Flores Canela, GM, Elsa Galindo de Leon, Julio Garcia, Sandro Garcia Martinez, Laura Garza, Nilam Ghanshyambhai, Margarito Gomez Martinez, Odilia Gomez Quiquivix, Ruth Angeles Guadarrama, Abilene Gutierrez Solorzano, Erasmo Guzman, Luis Hernandez, Milton Ricardo Herrera Monterroso, Jiandan Hu, Salma Iqbal, JP, Nawaz Jiwani, KG, Aryan Kabani, Sonal Kayum Kabani, Meera Kalimata Tanikella, Arf Karedia, Kayum Samshudinbhai Kayum, Abdul Aziz Khoja, Sajjad Khoja, Darshak Kikani, LERS, Lien Le, Ha Eun Lee, Sintia Jackeline Lemus Cardoza, Yuval Lerman, Erika Judith Llamas Soltero, Flavita Lobo, Armando Lovera, MN, Karla Maldonado, Alvaro Malta, Jesica Auxiliadora Marenco Alguera, Moises Moises Martinez, Pratik Matkar, Benjamin Ramon Matus, Bianka Massiel Matus Fonseca, Shivani Nilesh Mehta, Jose Luis Mendoza, Karla Mendoza, Rashid Mir, Luciano Miranda Rosas, Solanki Miteshkumar, Mahmood Mohammad, Yesica Liliana Muela Pando, Murad Jafarali Mukhida, Rita Murad Mukhida, Camilo Munoz, NT, Asha Kolagunda Nagappa Shetty, Vishnu Priya Narra, Mayur Nayak, Vishal Nayak, Dung Ngoc Thi Nguyen, Huy Nguyen, Rahim Noorani, Enkhbayar Nyamsambuu, PP, Sagar Palande, Karthik Panyala, Akshay Patel, Alpeshkumar Patel, Aratiben Patel, Arpitkumar Patel, Ashaben Patel, Belaben Patel, Bharatkumar Patel, Bhoomi Dikshep Patel, Bhupeshkumar Patel, Deepal Patel, Devang Patel, Dikshep Mahendrabhai Patel, Ghansyambhai Patel, Janakkumar Patel, Jayeshkumar Patel, Jignashaben Patel, Jignesh Kumar Patel, Jitendrakumar Patel, Kanaiyalal Patel, Nareshkumar Patel, Navin Patel, Niravkumar Patel, Nishaben Patel, Prayagkumar Patel, PremalKumar Jagdishbhai Patel, Princekumar Mahendrabhai Patel, Rajendrakumar Keshavlal Patel, Ravikumar Patel, Ritaben Patel, Sanjaykumar Patel, Vimlaben Patel, Ingrid Perez, Manuela Perez Garcia, Martha Perez Gonzalez, Edith Perez Lara, Abraham B Poac Ochoa, Heenaben Prajapati, Jayeshkumar Prajapati, Jaykumar Nitinkumar Prajapati, Naina Ishwarbhai Prajapati, Chandrika Prajapati, Nitinkumar Narayanbhai Prajapati, Ved Nitinkumar Prajapati, Maria Magdalena Quesada Duran, RM, Sakshi Rai, Patricio Ramirez Sanchez, Shiva Leela Rathod, Miguel Angel Reategui Diaz, Rushil Reji, Elizabeth Reyes, Eutiquio Reyes Garcia, Kevin Eduardo Reyes Lopez, Martha Candelaria Reyes Mendieta, Luz Maria Reyes Torres, Mario Fernando Reyes Zuniga, Maria Rivera, Lorena Rodriguez Hernandez, Francis Andreaa Ruiz Marenco, Luis Alfonso Ruiz Reatiga, SBS, SP, SRH, Yalill de Jesus Salazar Feria, Sofiyan Samnani, Monica Sanchez Arteaga, Bertha Sanchez Godinez, Jorge Sanchez Herrera, Carlos Gerardo Sanchez Martinez, Ganchimeg Sanjaa, Anish Sayani, Salima Sayani, Ana Karen Silva Montoya, Manpreet Singh, Oscar Suarez Zamudio, Nourien Surani, Hila Ofer Tanamy, Jiteshkumar Tawar, Semina Tawar, Layza Tonelotti, Nolvia Elizabeth Torres Iriarte, Cristopher Torres Ramos, Monica Torres Ramos, Aleem Vadhwania, Noorallah Vadhwania, Shelina Vadhwania, Jaahnavi Vajje, Maria Vazquez, Lanny Vazquez Lopez, Osbaldo Vazquez Reyes, Salvador Ventura, Roland Villamor, Luis Antonio Yanez Aguirre, Marco Alejandro Yanez Aguirre, Marco Antonio Yanez Alba, ZS, Kattia Zuniga.(Banias, Bradley) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, August 22, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
![]() BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION 24 by Attorney Tia L. Hockenberry on behalf of Defendant Ur Jaddou.(Hockenberry, Tia) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
Att: 12
![]() |
||
Att: 13
![]() |
||
24 | 24
![]() MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION by Attorney Tia L. Hockenberry on behalf of Defendant Ur Jaddou.(Hockenberry, Tia) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
![]() REASSIGNMENT ORDER - A consent to exercise jurisdiction by the United States Magistrate Judge has not been filed. See 28 U.S.C. § 636(c); NECivR 73.1(a). Accordingly, pursuant to NECivR 73.1(a), IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to Senior District Judge Joseph F. Batallion for disposition and is assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson for judicial supervision.Ordered by Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. (TCL) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
![]() RESTRICTED AUDIO FILE (5.8 MB) regarding Telephone Conference, 21 held on 6/29/2023 at 11:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). (SLP) |
|
21 | 21
minutes
Telephone Conference ~Util - Set/Reset All Deadlines Order on Motion to Seal Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading
Thu 06/29 12:31 PM
TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for telephone conference held with counsel for the parties on June 29, 2023, before Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. Discussion and argument held regarding pending motions. For the reasons discussed on the record during the call, Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading15 is granted, in part. Defendant shall have an extension of time to August 22, 2023 , to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the amended complaint. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss9 is denied as moot. Defendant's Motion to File Under Seal7 is granted; however, as agreed by the parties, restricted access is adequate protection for similar documents going forward. (SMN) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
![]() CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONC. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (TCL) |
|
19 | 19
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Tashiba M. Peoples on behalf of Defendant Ur Jaddou (Peoples, Tashiba) |
|
18 | 18
order
Order on Email Motion
Wed 06/28 11:37 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 17 Text Email Motion. A telephone conference is set for June 29, 2023, at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. Counsel shall use the case conference instructions filed under separate order to participate in the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (JLM) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Email
Wed 06/28 11:35 AM
TEXT EMAIL MOTION by counsel for defendant requesting a telephone conference to discuss pending motions. (JLM) |
|
Sunday, June 25, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
![]() RESPONSE regarding MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading 15 by Attorney Bradley B. Banias on behalf of Plaintiffs AD, AG, AJSD, AM, AP, AVRS, Beronica Alvarado, Milton Amador, Yesenia Araujo Domingues, Muhammad Arif, Erasmo Arriaga, Farooq Aslam, BD, BF, Bhumibahen Barot, Jose Manuel Becerra Torres, Leslie Zureidy Benitez Angeles, Robinson Andres Benitez Gonzalez, Yadira Marlen Berrones Nieto, Pooja Bhatt, Julio Cesar Bonilla Garcia, Chaitali Brahmbhatt, CAMQ, Maryi Cabrera, Flor Virginia Carrillo Morales, Denisse Abato Castillo, Selene Castro Cardiel, Sonia Veronica Chavez Moreno, Keri Colleen Cooper Sabillon, Rocio Coronado, Emiliano Cruz Dominguez, DH, DN, Bayarmaa Dambadorj, Ayman Daredia, Rounak Daredia, Sadiq Daredia, Sai Nischal Dasari, Alexis M. De La Cruz Castro, Jose De La Cruz Ortiz, Rodrigo De Oliveira, Norma Angelica Delgado Chavez, Marco Antonio Delgado Nieves, Rahim Dhanani, Reshma Dhanani, Biren Noorddin Dodhiya, Parin Dodhiya, Karla Dominguez Espinoza, Maria De Los Angeles Duran Elias, EE, Bold Enkhtuya, Sohni Farooq, Rosalio Felix Guzman, Enrique Felix Torres, Pablo Ferreira, Hector Flores, Alejandro Flores Canela, GM, Elsa Galindo de Leon, Julio Garcia, Sandro Garcia Martinez, Laura Garza, Nilam Ghanshyambhai, Margarito Gomez Martinez, Odilia Gomez Quiquivix, Ruth Angeles Guadarrama, Abilene Gutierrez Solorzano, Erasmo Guzman, Luis Hernandez, Milton Ricardo Herrera Monterroso, Jiandan Hu, Salma Iqbal, JP, Nawaz Jiwani, KG, Aryan Kabani, Sonal Kayum Kabani, Meera Kalimata Tanikella, Arf Karedia, Kayum Samshudinbhai Kayum, Abdul Aziz Khoja, Sajjad Khoja, Darshak Kikani, LERS, Lien Le, Ha Eun Lee, Sintia Jackeline Lemus Cardoza, Yuval Lerman, Erika Judith Llamas Soltero, Flavita Lobo, Armando Lovera, MN, Karla Maldonado, Alvaro Malta, Jesica Auxiliadora Marenco Alguera, Moises Moises Martinez, Pratik Matkar, Benjamin Ramon Matus, Bianka Massiel Matus Fonseca, Shivani Nilesh Mehta, Jose Luis Mendoza, Karla Mendoza, Rashid Mir, Luciano Miranda Rosas, Solanki Miteshkumar, Mahmood Mohammad, Yesica Liliana Muela Pando, Murad Jafarali Mukhida, Rita Murad Mukhida, Camilo Munoz, NT, Asha Kolagunda Nagappa Shetty, Vishnu Priya Narra, Mayur Nayak, Vishal Nayak, Dung Ngoc Thi Nguyen, Huy Nguyen, Rahim Noorani, Enkhbayar Nyamsambuu, PP, Sagar Palande, Karthik Panyala, Akshay Patel, Alpeshkumar Patel, Aratiben Patel, Arpitkumar Patel, Ashaben Patel, Belaben Patel, Bharatkumar Patel, Bhoomi Dikshep Patel, Bhupeshkumar Patel, Deepal Patel, Devang Patel, Dikshep Mahendrabhai Patel, Ghansyambhai Patel, Janakkumar Patel, Jayeshkumar Patel, Jignashaben Patel, Jignesh Kumar Patel, Jitendrakumar Patel, Kanaiyalal Patel, Nareshkumar Patel, Navin Patel, Niravkumar Patel, Nishaben Patel, Prayagkumar Patel, PremalKumar Jagdishbhai Patel, Princekumar Mahendrabhai Patel, Rajendrakumar Keshavlal Patel, Ravikumar Patel, Ritaben Patel, Sanjaykumar Patel, Vimlaben Patel, Ingrid Perez, Manuela Perez Garcia, Martha Perez Gonzalez, Edith Perez Lara, Abraham B Poac Ochoa, Heenaben Prajapati, Jayeshkumar Prajapati, Jaykumar Nitinkumar Prajapati, Naina Ishwarbhai Prajapati, Chandrika Prajapati, Nitinkumar Narayanbhai Prajapati, Ved Nitinkumar Prajapati, Maria Magdalena Quesada Duran, RM, Sakshi Rai, Patricio Ramirez Sanchez, Shiva Leela Rathod, Miguel Angel Reategui Diaz, Rushil Reji, Elizabeth Reyes, Eutiquio Reyes Garcia, Kevin Eduardo Reyes Lopez, Martha Candelaria Reyes Mendieta, Luz Maria Reyes Torres, Mario Fernando Reyes Zuniga, Maria Rivera, Lorena Rodriguez Hernandez, Francis Andreaa Ruiz Marenco, Luis Alfonso Ruiz Reatiga, SBS, SP, SRH, Yalill de Jesus Salazar Feria, Sofiyan Samnani, Monica Sanchez Arteaga, Bertha Sanchez Godinez, Jorge Sanchez Herrera, Carlos Gerardo Sanchez Martinez, Ganchimeg Sanjaa, Anish Sayani, Salima Sayani, Ana Karen Silva Montoya, Manpreet Singh, Oscar Suarez Zamudio, Nourien Surani, Hila Ofer Tanamy, Jiteshkumar Tawar, Semina Tawar, Layza Tonelotti, Nolvia Elizabeth Torres Iriarte, Cristopher Torres Ramos, Monica Torres Ramos, Aleem Vadhwania, Noorallah Vadhwania, Shelina Vadhwania, Jaahnavi Vajje, Maria Vazquez, Lanny Vazquez Lopez, Osbaldo Vazquez Reyes, Salvador Ventura, Roland Villamor, Luis Antonio Yanez Aguirre, Marco Alejandro Yanez Aguirre, Marco Antonio Yanez Alba, ZS, Kattia Zuniga.(Banias, Bradley) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
![]() MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Tia L. Hockenberry on behalf of Defendant Ur Jaddou.(Hockenberry, Tia) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
![]() NOTICE of regarding Amended Complaint,,,,,,11 Third Notice of Additional Plaintiffs by Attorney Bradley B. Banias on behalf of Plaintiffs Nilam Ghanshyambhai, Jitendrakumar Patel, Nishaben Patel, Abraham B Poac Ochoa, Odilia Gomez Quiquivix, Martha Perez Gonzalez, Oscar Suarez Zamudio, Niravkumar Patel, Pooja Bhatt, Rahim Dhanani, Reshma Dhanani, Pratik Matkar, Shivani Nilesh Mehta, Darshak Kikani, Lorena Rodriguez Hernandez, Heenaben Prajapati, Akshay Patel, Bharatkumar Patel, Solanki Miteshkumar, Abilene Gutierrez Solorzano, Alvaro Malta, Ghansyambhai Patel, Arpitkumar Patel, Princekumar Mahendrabhai Patel, Yalill de Jesus Salazar Feria, Jiandan Hu, Janakkumar Patel, Nawaz Jiwani, Yesica Liliana Muela Pando, Erika Judith Llamas Soltero, Armando Lovera, Miguel Angel Reategui Diaz, Roland Villamor, Julio Garcia, Moises Moises Martinez, Rajendrakumar Keshavlal Patel, Kanaiyalal Patel, Flor Virginia Carrillo Morales, Denisse Abato Castillo, Rahim Noorani, Manuela Perez Garcia, Monica Sanchez Arteaga, Julio Cesar Bonilla Garcia, Bertha Sanchez Godinez, Rushil Reji, Ingrid Perez, Erasmo Arriaga (Banias, Bradley) |
|
13 | 13
![]() NOTICE of regarding Amended Complaint,,,,,,11 Second Notice of Additional Plaintiffs by Attorney Bradley B. Banias on behalf of Plaintiffs Ritaben Patel, PP, Nareshkumar Patel, Ashaben Patel, SP, Anish Sayani, Salima Sayani, ZS, Nourien Surani, Abdul Aziz Khoja, Bhupeshkumar Patel, Aratiben Patel, Ravikumar Patel, Belaben Patel, Alejandro Flores Canela, Beronica Alvarado, Dikshep Mahendrabhai Patel, Bhoomi Dikshep Patel, Jayeshkumar Patel, Bhumibahen Barot, Ganchimeg Sanjaa, Bold Enkhtuya, Prayagkumar Patel, Deepal Patel, Emiliano Cruz Dominguez, Rocio Coronado, Erasmo Guzman, Elizabeth Reyes, Eutiquio Reyes Garcia, Elsa Galindo de Leon, Hector Flores, Yuval Lerman, Hila Ofer Tanamy, Yesenia Araujo Domingues, Jose Luis Mendoza, Maria Rivera, Luis Hernandez, Yadira Marlen Berrones Nieto, Marco Antonio Delgado Nieves, Sintia Jackeline Lemus Cardoza, Margarito Gomez Martinez, Nolvia Elizabeth Torres Iriarte, Mario Fernando Reyes Zuniga, Maria Vazquez, Milton Amador, Jayeshkumar Prajapati, Naina Ishwarbhai Prajapati, PremalKumar Jagdishbhai Patel (Banias, Bradley) |
|
12 | 12
![]() NOTICE of regarding Amended Complaint,,,,,,11 First Notice of Additional Plaintiffs by Attorney Bradley B. Banias on behalf of Plaintiffs Jaykumar Nitinkumar Prajapati, Ved Nitinkumar Prajapati, Chandrika Prajapati, Nitinkumar Narayanbhai Prajapati, Alpeshkumar Patel, Jignashaben Patel, AP, Murad Jafarali Mukhida, Rita Murad Mukhida, AM, Luis Alfonso Ruiz Reatiga, Ana Karen Silva Montoya, AVRS, LERS, SBS, Sadiq Daredia, Rounak Daredia, Ayman Daredia, AD, Benjamin Ramon Matus, Maria Magdalena Quesada Duran, Bianka Massiel Matus Fonseca, CAMQ, Norma Angelica Delgado Chavez, Carlos Gerardo Sanchez Martinez, AJSD, Monica Torres Ramos, Cristopher Torres Ramos, Navin Patel, Vimlaben Patel, Devang Patel, Enkhbayar Nyamsambuu, Bayarmaa Dambadorj, EE, Salvador Ventura, Karla Maldonado, GM, Jignesh Kumar Patel, JP, Maryi Cabrera, KG, AG, Robinson Andres Benitez Gonzalez, Ruth Angeles Guadarrama, Leslie Zureidy Benitez Angeles, Jiteshkumar Tawar, Semina Tawar, NT, Sanjaykumar Patel (Banias, Bradley) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
![]() AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant All Defendants, by Attorney Bradley B. Banias on behalf of Shelina Vadhwania, Aleem Vadhwania, Arf Karedia, Parin Dodhiya, Ha Eun Lee, Jose Manuel Becerra Torres, Mayur Nayak, DH, Manpreet Singh, Keri Colleen Cooper Sabillon, Karla Mendoza, Pablo Ferreira, Sakshi Rai, Jaahnavi Vajje, Asha Kolagunda Nagappa Shetty, Biren Noorddin Dodhiya, Meera Kalimata Tanikella, Noorallah Vadhwania, Shiva Leela Rathod, Karthik Panyala, Rodrigo De Oliveira, Selene Castro Cardiel, Laura Garza, Jesica Auxiliadora Marenco Alguera, Chaitali Brahmbhatt, Aryan Kabani, Dung Ngoc Thi Nguyen, DN, Sandro Garcia Martinez, Martha Candelaria Reyes Mendieta, Kayum Samshudinbhai Kayum, Francis Andreaa Ruiz Marenco, Lien Le, Enrique Felix Torres, Camilo Munoz, Sajjad Khoja, Sonia Veronica Chavez Moreno, SRH, Lanny Vazquez Lopez, Marco Antonio Yanez Alba, Muhammad Arif, Kevin Eduardo Reyes Lopez, Vishnu Priya Narra, Milton Ricardo Herrera Monterroso, Salma Iqbal, Rashid Mir, Jose De La Cruz Ortiz, Rosalio Felix Guzman, Alexis M. De La Cruz Castro, Vishal Nayak, Luciano Miranda Rosas, Huy Nguyen, Sofiyan Samnani, Layza Tonelotti, Patricio Ramirez Sanchez, Sonal Kayum Kabani, Marco Alejandro Yanez Aguirre, BD, MN, Jorge Sanchez Herrera, Maria De Los Angeles Duran Elias, Edith Perez Lara, Luz Maria Reyes Torres, Farooq Aslam, RM, Luis Antonio Yanez Aguirre, Karla Dominguez Espinoza, Mahmood Mohammad, Osbaldo Vazquez Reyes, BF, Sagar Palande, Sai Nischal Dasari, Sohni Farooq, Kattia Zuniga, Flavita Lobo(Banias, Bradley) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, June 09, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
![]() ORDER - IT IS ORDERED:If the parties consent to final disposition of the case by the undersigned magistrate judge, on or before June 29, 2023, they shall complete the "CONSENT TO RANDOM ASSIGNMENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE" form located on the court's website at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. After all parties have signed this form, e-mail it in.pdf format to clerk@ned.uscourts.gov. Do not electronically file this form or submit it to chambers. In the absence of timely submitting the attached form in accordance with paragraph (1) of this order, the case will be reassigned to a district judge. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (TCL) |
|
9 | 9
![]() MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION by Attorney Tia L. Hockenberry on behalf of Defendant Ur Jaddou.(Hockenberry, Tia) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
7 | 7
![]() MOTION to file under Seal by Attorney Tia L. Hockenberry on behalf of Defendant Ur Jaddou.(Hockenberry, Tia) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Friday, June 02, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Tia L. Hockenberry on behalf of Defendant Ur Jaddou (Hockenberry, Tia) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant All Defendants.(Banias, Bradley) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, April 04, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Summons Issued as to defendant Ur Jaddou regarding Complaint1 . YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (MKR) |
|
oth_evt
Assignment of Judges
Tue 04/04 11:03 AM
TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (MKR) |
||
Monday, April 03, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons Requested as to Ur Jaddou, Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services regarding Complaint,,,,,,1 . (Banias, Bradley) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4834995), by Attorney Bradley B. Banias on behalf of Shelina Vadhwania, Aleem Vadhwania, Arf Karedia, Parin Dodhiya, Ha Eun Lee, Jose Manuel Becerra Torres, Mayur Nayak, DH, Manpreet Singh, Keri Colleen Cooper Sabillon, Karla Mendoza, Pablo Ferreira, Sakshi Rai, Jaahnavi Vajje, Asha Kolagunda Nagappa Shetty, Biren Noorddin Dodhiya, Meera Kalimata Tanikella, Noorallah Vadhwania, Shiva Leela Rathod, Karthik Panyala, Rodrigo De Oliveira, Selene Castro Cardiel, Laura Garza, Jesica Auxiliadora Marenco Alguera, Chaitali Brahmbhatt, Aryan Kabani, Dung Ngoc Thi Nguyen, DN, Sandro Garcia Martinez, Martha Candelaria Reyes Mendieta, Francis Andreaa Ruiz Marenco, Lien Le, Enrique Felix Torres, Camilo Munoz, Sonia Veronica Chavez Moreno, Sajjad Khoja, SRH, Lanny Vazquez Lopez, Marco Antonio Yanez Alba, Muhammad Arif, Kevin Eduardo Reyes Lopez, Vishnu Priya Narra, Milton Ricardo Herrera Monterroso, Salma Iqbal, Rashid Mir, Jose De La Cruz Ortiz, Rosalio Felix Guzman, Alexis M. De La Cruz Castro, Vishal Nayak, Luciano Miranda Rosas, Huy Nguyen, Sofiyan Samnani, Layza Tonelotti, Patricio Ramirez Sanchez, Marco Alejandro Yanez Aguirre, MN, BD, Jorge Sanchez Herrera, Maria De Los Angeles Duran Elias, Edith Perez Lara, Luz Maria Reyes Torres, Farooq Aslam, RM, Luis Antonio Yanez Aguirre, Karla Dominguez Espinoza, Mahmood Mohammad, Osbaldo Vazquez Reyes, BF, Sagar Palande, Sai Nischal Dasari, Sohni Farooq, Kattia Zuniga, Flavita Lobo(Banias, Bradley) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |